Anna Luna v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Anna Luna
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv05565
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Conformed Answer of Defendant Ford Motor Company re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) (Vanderhoof, Brian)
July 20, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/9/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT TO NOTICE OF LODGING #11 . (jp)
July 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/8/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2021 at 9:00 am. (sw)
July 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-05565 RGK(KSx). (rn)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-05565 CAS(KSx). (rn)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
July 9, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Anna Luna. Filed in State Court on 6/3/2021 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 9, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, identifying State Street Corporation; Black Rock, Inc.; The Vanguard Group. (Vanderhoof, Brian)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Vanderhoof, Brian)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2021-00555057 Receipt No: ACACDC-31602901 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof, #3 Declaration of Jonathan Won) (Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Vanderhoof, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anna Luna v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Luna
Represented By: David N Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Brian C Vanderhoof
Represented By: Jonathan Won
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?