ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A. et al v. Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Armenian Cultural Foundation
Defendant: ACF Central WUSA, Inc., Rostom Aintablian, Vicken Babikian, Stepan Boyajian, Does 1-10, inclusive, Hovig Saliba and Bedig Kazandjian
Counter Claimant: Vicken Moses, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Daron Kachatourian, Melkon Melkonian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Gev Iskajyan, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Sosikian, Hrayr Garabetian, Zareh Adjemian, Khatchig Tazian, Mike Keleshian, Levon Baronian, Laura Hakobyan, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Chris Keosian, Zanku Armenian, Harmik Baghdassarian and Garo Kailajian
Counter Defendant: ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Mark Fingerman
Case Number: 2:2021cv05594
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
2 Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the Court GRANTS the Stipulation #212 as follows: (1) The above-entitled action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party. (2) The Court retains jurisdiction over this matter in order to enforce that certain Armenian Revolutionary Federation Western Region Binding Settlement Agreement, dated 9/28/2023. (jp)
October 3, 2023 Filing 213 REQUEST to Dismiss Case filed by plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation) (Reeder, Christopher)
October 3, 2023 Filing 212 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), (c) filed by plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation.(Reeder, Christopher)
October 3, 2023 Filing 211 WITHDRAWAL of, Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #56 , filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having been notified by a Notice of Settlement #209 that the case settled, hereby orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for thirty (30) days to vacate this order and to reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been completed. Any outstanding Orders to Show Cause are discharged. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
September 28, 2023 Filing 209 NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 14, 2023 Filing 208 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the first, second, third, fourth, fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, and twelfth of Plaintiffs causes of action #201 filed by Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Attachments: #1 Defendants Response to Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact, #2 Declaration of Raymond B. Kim, #3 Defendants Objections to Plaintiffs Evidence Submitted in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Proposed Order Re Defendants Objections to Plaintiffs Evidence Submitted in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Kim, Raymond)
September 8, 2023 Filing 207 Notice Notice of Errata filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 8, 2023 Filing 206 NOTICE OF LODGING filed EXHIBIT 17 VIDEO OF THEFT AT GLENDALE re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #205 (Reeder, Christopher)
September 8, 2023 Filing 205 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the first, second, third, fourth, fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, and twelfth of Plaintiffs causes of action #201 filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compendium of Exhibits v 1, #2 Exhibit Compendium of Exhibits v 2, #3 Exhibit Compendium of Exhibits v 3, #4 Exhibit Compendium of Exhibits v 4, #5 Exhibit Compendium of Exhibits v 5, #6 Exhibit Compendium of Depositions, #7 Declaration Compendium of Declarations, #8 Supplement PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Reeder, Christopher)
September 7, 2023 Filing 204 opposition in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the first, second, third, fourth, fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, and twelfth of Plaintiffs causes of action #201 filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Reeder, Christopher)
September 7, 2023 Filing 203 Objections In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the first, second, third, fourth, fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, and twelfth of Plaintiffs causes of action #201 Declarations filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH AND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Reeder, Christopher)
September 7, 2023 Filing 202 Objections In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the first, second, third, fourth, fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, and twelfth of Plaintiffs causes of action #201 Exhibits filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH AND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Reeder, Christopher)
August 24, 2023 Filing 201 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the first, second, third, fourth, fifth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, and twelfth of Plaintiffs causes of action filed by defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Compendium of Declarations, #4 Appendix of Exhibits, #5 Proposed Order) (Kim, Raymond)
July 19, 2023 Filing 200 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Wabel Moussly counsel for Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation, Counter Defendant ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. Adding Wabel Moussly as counsel of record for ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A. and Armenian Cultural Foundation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A and Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Attorney Wabel Moussly added to party ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Wabel Moussly added to party ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.(pty:cd), Attorney Wabel Moussly added to party Armenian Cultural Foundation(pty:pla))(Moussly, Wabel)
July 19, 2023 Filing 199 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim, #198 with JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiffs/Counterclaim Defendants ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation.(Reeder, Christopher)
June 26, 2023 Filing 198 SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendants ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation amending Amended Counterclaim,, #159 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Counter Claimants ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., ACF Central WUSA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bylaws, #2 Exhibit B - 3.13.22 ARF Circular Letter No. 001)(Kim, Raymond)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Counter-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #172 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The court GRANTS the Motion as to Counter-Claimants Second, Fifth, Sixth, and Ninth Claims for Relief and DISMISSES these claims with LEAVE TO AMEND. The court DENIES the Motion as to Counter-Claimants' First, Third, Fourth, Seventh, and Eighth Claims for Relief. Should Counter-Claimants wish to file a Second Amended Counter-Claim that comports with this Order, Counter-Claimants shall do so within thirty (30) days of this Order. (jp)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Modify Certain Deadlines Contained in Scheduling Order March 17, 2023 #195 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the court ORDERS the court's 3/17/2023, Order Re Joint Stipulation to Modify Deadlines Contained in the 5/31/2022, Scheduling Order #194 (with changes indicated by italics): Jury Trial set for 1/16/2024 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 11/30/2023 at 8:30 AM. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 6/30/2023. Last Date to Hear Motions: 10/5/2023. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 10/19/2023. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 11/2/2023. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 11/9/2023. (See document for further information). (jp)
April 26, 2023 Filing 195 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule CERTAIN DEADLINES CONTAINED IN SCHEDULING ORDER OF MARCH 17, 2023 (DKT. NO. 194) filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY CERTAIN DEADLINES CONTAINED IN SCHEDULING ORDER)(Reeder, Christopher)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY DEADLINES CONTAINED IN MAY 31, 2022, SCHEDULING ORDER #192 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, Jury Trial set for Tuesday, 8/29/2023 at 08:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for Thursday, 9/10/2023 at 08:30 a.m. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINES. [NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT] (es)
March 13, 2023 Filing 193 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjamin Swenson Tragish counsel for Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. Elan Bloch is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Tragish, Benjamin)
March 9, 2023 Filing 192 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 7/3/2023 filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANDING JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY CERTAIN DEADLINES IN THE MAY 31, 2022 SCHEDULING ORDER (DKT. NO. 121))(Reeder, Christopher)
March 2, 2023 Filing 191 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Troy H Slome counsel for Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. Adding Troy H. Slome as counsel of record for Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Daron Kachatourian, Melkon Melkonian, Rostom Aintablian, Vicken Moses AKA Vicken Babikian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Gev Iskajyan, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Sosikian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Hovig Saliba, Zareh Adjemian, Khatchig Tazian, Mike Keleshian, Levon Baronian, Laura Hakobyan, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Chris Keosian, Zanku Armenian, Harmik Baghdassarian, Bedig Kazandjian, and Garo Kailajian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Daron Kachatourian, Melkon Melkonian, Rostom Aintablian, Vicken Moses AKA Vicken Babikian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Gev Iskajyan, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Sosikian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Hovig Saliba, Zareh Adjemian, Khatchig Tazian, Mike Keleshian, Levon Baronian, Laura Hakobyan, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Chris Keosian, Zanku Armenian, Harmik Baghdassarian, Bedig Kazandjian, and Garo Kailajian. (Attorney Troy H Slome added to party ACF Central WUSA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Zareh Adjemian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Rostom Aintablian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Zanku Armenian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Harmik Baghdassarian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Levon Baronian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Stepan Boyajian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Hrayr Garabetian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Laura Hakobyan(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Gev Iskajyan(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Daron Kachatourian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Zohrab Kahvedjian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Garo Kailajian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Bedig Kazandjian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Mike Keleshian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Chris Keosian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Karo Khanjian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Knar Kitabjian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Melkon Melkonian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Miganoush Melkonian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Mkhitar Moradian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Vicken Moses(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Hovig Saliba(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Vicken Sosikian(pty:dft), Attorney Troy H Slome added to party Khatchig Tazian(pty:dft))(Slome, Troy)
March 1, 2023 Filing 190 Notice of Electronic Filing re Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #188 , Order on Application for Order re Discovery Matter #189 e-mailed to Elan Bloch bounced due to No longer with firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 23, 2023 Filing 189 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: Order Re: Discovery Dispute on Search Term Protocol #186
February 21, 2023 Filing 188 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ex 1 Joint email, #2 Exhibit ex 2 Letter briefing, #3 Exhibit ex 3 Revised Defendants Search Terms to Plaintiff)(Tragish, Benjamin)
February 21, 2023 Filing 187 BRIEF filed by defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Kim, Raymond)
February 14, 2023 Filing 186 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Pursuant to the Court's Orders (Dkt. Nos. 181, 183, and 185), the Parties have engaged in telephonic discussions and present a briefing schedule on the final outstanding discovery dispute re Defendants' Proposed Search Term Protocol. Each side shall each file a single letter brief by Tuesday, February 21, 2023, with a two-page limit, pursuant to the Parties' proposal. (dml)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO FURTHER MODIFY DEADLINE by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #184 : The deadline to file a joint status report or send a joint email to the Court set forth in the Courts January 30, 2023 Minutes (Dkt. No. 181) and February 6, 2023 Order (Dkt. No. 183) is extended as follows: 1. Former Deadline: February 8, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. 2. New Deadline: February 13, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (see attached order) (jm)
February 8, 2023 Filing 184 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report filed by defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Grace)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File,, #182 . The deadline to file a joint status report or send a joint email to the Court set: New Agreed Deadline is February 8, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. (dml)
February 3, 2023 Filing 182 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report filed by defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Grace)
January 30, 2023 Filing 181 MINUTES RE: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING #179 held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: The Court and the parties discussed the pending discovery disputes. By 12:00 p.m. (noon) on February 6, 2023, the parties shall file a joint status report or send a joint email to the Court indicating whether disputes remain. See Order for details. Court Recorder: CourtSmart. (dml)
January 30, 2023 Filing 180 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the court is Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaim #172 . The court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for February 2, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED/OFF CALENDAR and the court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 26, 2023 Filing 179 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Request for telephonic hearing is set for 1/30/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (dml)
January 12, 2023 Filing 178 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaim #172 filed by Counter Defendant ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Reeder, Christopher)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver Re: Joint Discovery Email
December 29, 2022 Filing 176 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Counterclaim filed by Counter Claimants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Kim, Raymond)
December 29, 2022 Filing 175 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaim #172 filed by Counter Claimants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grace C. Lee in Support of Counter-Claimants Opposition to Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Counterclaim)(Kim, Raymond)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER RE IN CAMERA REVIEW by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The Court has held a number of informal discovery conferences in this case to assist the parties in resolving discovery disputes. One dispute that the Court and parties have discussed for the past several months pertains to Defendants' assertions of privilege. See Order for complete details and ruling. (dml)
December 15, 2022 Filing 173 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Counter Defendant ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)(Reeder, Christopher)
December 15, 2022 Filing 172 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. Motion set for hearing on 2/2/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM UNDER RULE 12(b)(6) AND RULE 9(b), #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF DEMETRIUS LAMBRINOS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM, #3 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM UNDER RULE 12(b)(6) AND RULE 9(b)) (Reeder, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation Regarding Briefing Scheduling for Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Counterclaim #170 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. See document for further information. (jp)
November 29, 2022 Filing 170 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss Defendants' First Amended Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM)(Reeder, Christopher)
November 9, 2022 Filing 169 NOTICE OF LODGING filed for an in camera review pursuant to the Courts October 17, 2022 Order re Telephone Conference,, #161 (Lee, Grace)
November 7, 2022 Filing 168 FURTHER BRIEF filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. regarding Telephone Conference,, #161 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Defendants' Second Revised and Redlined Privilege Log)(Tragish, Benjamin)
November 7, 2022 Filing 167 NOTICE OF LODGING filed for an in camera review pursuant to the Courts October 17, 2022 Order re Telephone Conference,, #161 (Lee, Grace)
November 7, 2022 Filing 166 BRIEF filed by Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Does, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. regarding Telephone Conference,, #161 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10.31.22 Redlined & Supp. Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit 2 - Detailed Estimated Volume, #3 Exhibit 3 - List of Attorneys)(Lee, Grace)
November 7, 2022 Filing 165 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/1/2022 at 10:15 a.m. re Transcript #164 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dhs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 7, 2022 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/1/2022 at 10:15 a.m. ****Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE HINO-SPAAN at: WEBSITE www.debbiehinospaan.com; E-mail, dhinospaan@yahoo.com before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Additional formats of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available to be purchased at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.** Redaction Request due 11/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2023. (dhs)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM #162 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the court ORDERS the following schedule in the above-captioned case: (1) Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants First Amended Counterclaim is due on or before 12/1/2022; (2) Defendants' Opposition to the Motion is due on or before 12/15/2022; 3. Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of the Motion, if any, is due on or before December 29, 2022. (4) The hearing on the Motion is set on January 19, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 10D. See document for further information. (jp)
October 19, 2022 Filing 162 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Counterclaim,, #159 filed by plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM)(Reeder, Christopher)
October 17, 2022 Filing 161 MINUTES OF RE: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The Court and the parties discussed the pending discovery disputes. By November 7, 2022, the parties shall file simultaneous letter briefs, no longer than 5 single-spaced pages each, with their positions regarding Defendants' assertions of privilege. The Court modifies the stipulated protective order, Dkt. No. 120, to add an "Attorneys Eyes Only" (AEO) designation. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: CS Courtroom 590 10/17/2022. (hr)
October 7, 2022 Filing 160 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING settling #157 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute; Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The Court and the parties discussed the pending discovery disputes. A further telephonic hearing is set for October 17, 2022 at 10 a.m. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 10/07/2022. (hr)
October 7, 2022 Filing 159 FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation amending Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, Counterclaim,, #97 , filed by Counter Claimants ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., ACF Central WUSA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bylaws, #2 Exhibit B - 3.13.22 ARF Circular Letter No. 001)(Attorney Raymond B Kim added to party Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc.(pty:cc))(Kim, Raymond)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend #138 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court GRANTS the Motion. Defendants shall file the First Amended Counterclaim within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. (See document for further information). (jp)
September 29, 2022 Filing 157 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. The parties have requested an informal discovery conference with Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. A telephonic discovery conference is set for October 7, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Call-in information provided via email. (dml)
September 23, 2022 Filing 156 STATUS REPORT Following Minutes Re Telephonic Hearing (DKT 135, 143) filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Tragish, Benjamin)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File,, #154 . The deadline to jointly file a status report regarding the parties' disputed discovery issues and provide availability for a further informal discovery conference is further continued to September 23, 2022. (dml)
September 21, 2022 Filing 154 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report filed by defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Grace)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #152 . The deadline to jointly file a status report regarding the parties' disputed discovery issues and provide availability for a further informal discovery conference is further continued to September 21, 2022. (dml)
September 16, 2022 Filing 152 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report filed by defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation Agreeing to Modify Deadline Contained in July 27, 2022 Order and September 16, 2022 Order)(Lee, Grace)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, #150 . The deadline to jointly file a status report regarding the parties disputed discovery issues and provide availability for a further informal discovery conference is continued to September 16, 2022. (dml)
September 14, 2022 Filing 150 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report filed by plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation Agreeing to Modify Deadline Contained in July 27, 2022 Order (Dkt. No. 143))(Tragish, Benjamin)
September 8, 2022 Filing 149 MINUTES OF Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file First Amended Counterclaim #138 held before Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Motion hearing held on Zoom. The court hears oral argument from the parties. The court takes the Motion under submission. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Christopher Reeder; Attorneys for Defendant: Raymond Kim. Courtroom Deputy: Melissa Kunig; Time in Court: 0:18. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (mku)
September 1, 2022 Filing 148 MINUTES OF Defendant's Motion for Leave to file First Amended Counterclaim #138 before Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Motion hearing held on Zoom. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties meet and confer no later than 9/6/2022 at 5:00 PM. The Court sets a continued hearing on the Motion for Leave to file First Amended Counterclaim #138 on 9/8/2022 at 10:00 AM., via Zoom. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (jp)
September 1, 2022 Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian for Court Reporter. Court will contact Raymond B. Kim at rkim@mdjalaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Lee, Grace)
August 18, 2022 Filing 146 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Counter-Claim #138 filed by Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc.. (Lee, Grace)
August 18, 2022 Filing 145 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Counter-Claim #138 filed by Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Raymond B. Kim with Exhibits A through C)(Lee, Grace)
August 11, 2022 Filing 144 Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Counter-Claim #138 filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation, Counter Defendant ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend to File First Amended Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit 1 to RJN - Verified Petition in Dimejian Matter, #3 Exhibit 2 to RJN - Judgment and Ruling in Dimejian Matter, #4 Exhibit 3 to RJN - Joint Trial Index and Ex. 48 in Dimejian Matter, #5 Exhibit 4 to RJN - Jarchafjian Complaint, #6 Declaration of Benjamin S. Tragish in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Counterclaim, #7 Exhibit 1 to Tragish Decl. - Table of Pending Litigations, #8 Exhibit 2 to Tragish Decl. - Dimejian Hearing Transcript)(Attorney Benjamin Swenson Tragish added to party ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.(pty:cd))(Tragish, Benjamin)
July 29, 2022 Filing 142 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, on its own motion, hereby continues the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file First Amended Counter-Claim #138 currently set for August 25, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. to September 1, 2022 at 10:00 a.m.Counsel is reminded to refer to the list of CLOSED motion dates on Judge Slaughters Procedures and Schedules page prior to filing future motions.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 28, 2022 Filing 141 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Counter-Claim #138 (Attachments: #1 Proposed - First Amended Counterclaim, #2 Redline - First Amended Counterclaim)(Lee, Grace)
July 28, 2022 Filing 140 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re [Proposed] Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Counter-Claim #138 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Grace)
July 28, 2022 Filing 139 DECLARATION of Grace C. Lee in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Counter-Claim #138 filed by Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Grace)
July 28, 2022 Filing 138 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Counter-Claim filed by defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/25/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Clean - First Amended Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redline - First Amended Counterclaim) (Lee, Grace)
July 25, 2022 Filing 137 Reply BRIEF filed by plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. and Request for In Camera Review regarding Brief (non-motion non-appeal),,,,,, #134 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - 21.11.24 Doc 094 Ord Denying 66,85,87 & Granting - Denying 86, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - 21.10.25 Doc 090 Order Deny Mtn to Stay, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - 22.01.18 Order - Dec on Pet, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - 22.02.04 Judgment FLD)(Tragish, Benjamin)
July 25, 2022 Filing 136 Reply BRIEF filed by defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. regarding Brief (non-motion non-appeal),,,,,, #134 . (Lee, Grace)
July 22, 2022 Filing 135 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Application set for hearing on 7/27/2022 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (dml)
July 18, 2022 Filing 134 BRIEF filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. regarding Order #132 , Order on Motion to Compel,,, Order on Application for Order re Discovery Matter,,, Discovery Hearing,, #117 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Supplemental Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Carmen Ohanian, DDS in Support of Plaintiffs' Letter Briefing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Carmen Ohanian, DDS in Support of Plaintiffs' TRO Application, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Levon Kirakosian in Support of Plaintiffs' TRO Application, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Avedik Izmirlian in Support of Plaintiffs' TRO Application, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Arto Keuleyan in Support of Plaintiffs' TRO Application, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Alik Ourfalian in Support of Plaintiffs' TRO Application, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Harut Mgrditchian in Support of Plaintiffs' TRO Application, #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Vahan Bezdikian in Support of Plaintiffs' TRO Application, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Gregor Hovanesian in Support of Plaintiffs' TRO Application, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Harout Madenian in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application, #12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Vatche Zetjian in Support of Plaintiffs' TRO Application, #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Christopher S. Reeder in Support of Plaintiffs' TRO Application, #14 Exhibit 14 - June 16, 2022 Email from Defendants' Counsel, #15 Exhibit 15 - July 8, 2022 Email from Defendants' Counsel)(Tragish, Benjamin)
July 18, 2022 Filing 133 BRIEF filed by defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. regarding Order on Motion to Compel,,, Order on Application for Order re Discovery Matter,,, Discovery Hearing,, #117 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit B - Supplemental Privilege Log, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Email re Chain of Legal Communications, #4 Exhibit D - Email re Slack Communications, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs' Response on Privilege Log, #6 Exhibit F - Joint Email re IDC)(Lee, Grace)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Briefing #131 (dml)
July 11, 2022 Filing 131 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Briefing filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING THIRD JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY DEADLINES CONTAINED IN MAY 24, 2022 ORDER (DKT. NO. 117))(Tragish, Benjamin)
July 8, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Mark Fingerman has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY DEADLINES CONTAINED IN MAY 24, 2022 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Briefing #128 (dml)
July 6, 2022 Filing 128 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Briefing filed by plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY DEADLINES CONTAINED IN MAY 24, 2022 ORDER (DKT. NO. 117))(Tragish, Benjamin)
June 22, 2022 Filing 127 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re: Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Briefing #126 . The Court approves the modified deadlines set forth in the Stipulation. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dml) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 21, 2022 Filing 126 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Briefing filed by plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A..(Tragish, Benjamin)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re Notice of Lodging, #122 (dml)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
June 8, 2022 Filing 123 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Lodging, #122 , Notice of Lodging, #118 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation for Protective Order. Notes: Going forward, please use correct event. Documents accepted as filed. (dml)
June 7, 2022 Filing 122 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion to Compel,,, Order on Application for Order re Discovery Matter,,, Discovery Hearing,, #117 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Order re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information)(Tragish, Benjamin)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 8/1/2023 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 7/20/2023 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: 8/25/2022. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 3/23/2023. Last Date to Hear Motions: 4/27/2023. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 5/11/2023. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 6/29/2023. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 7/6/2023. (See document for further information). (jp)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. re Notice of Lodging #118 . (See Order for Further Details). (kl)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
May 27, 2022 Filing 118 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulated Protective Order re Order on Motion to Compel,,, Order on Application for Order re Discovery Matter,,, Discovery Hearing,, #117 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Lee, Grace)
May 24, 2022 Filing 117 MINUTES AND ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING #116 AND GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL #104 held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The Court and the parties discussed the pending discovery disputes. The Court provides a summary of each issue as discussed at the hearing. 1. Protective order: The parties shall file a stipulated protective order for the undersigned's consideration by Friday, May 27, 2022. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS AND DEADLINES. Court Recorder: XTR System. (dml)
May 18, 2022 Filing 116 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. The parties have requested an informal discovery conference with Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. A telephonic discovery conference is set for May 24, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Call-in information to be provided via email. (dml)
May 12, 2022 Filing 115 STATUS REPORT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation, Counter Defendant ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Tragish, Benjamin)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER #109 by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. See Order for complete details. (dml)
May 10, 2022 Filing 113 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #111 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 9, 2022 Filing 112 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for the disclosure of confidential information in this action #109 filed by Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Lee, Grace)
May 9, 2022 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Benjamin Swenson Tragish on behalf of Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation (Attorney Benjamin Swenson Tragish added to party ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Swenson Tragish added to party Armenian Cultural Foundation(pty:pla))(Tragish, Benjamin)
May 9, 2022 Filing 110 OPPOSITION In Opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for the disclosure of confidential information in this action #109 filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN S. TRAGISH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER)(Reeder, Christopher)
May 6, 2022 Filing 109 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for the disclosure of confidential information in this action filed by defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grace C. Lee, #2 Proposed Order)(Lee, Grace)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Please refer to Order for complete details. (jp)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE: MOTION TO COMPEL #104 by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. For the reasons set forth, the Court defers ruling on the Motion and VACATES the April 27, 2022 hearing. The Court orders Defendants to serve supplemental responses to all discovery at issue in the Motion and complete their production by May 5, 2022. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS AND FURTHER DEADLINES. (dml) (dml)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-064) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Slaughter, Fred W., this case is transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to the calendar of Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-05594-FWS-RAOx. (rn)
April 13, 2022 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel further discovery responses and document production #104 filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (SUPPLEMENTAL) OF BENJAMIN S. TRAGISH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS DOCUMENT PRODUCTION AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY, #2 Proposed Order (AMENDED) RE: PLAINTIFFS ARF DASHNAKTSUTYUN, WESTERN U.S.A., AND ARMENIAN CULTURAL FOUNDATIONS MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY)(Reeder, Christopher)
April 6, 2022 Filing 104 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel further discovery responses and document production filed by plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum JOINT STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS DOCUMENT PRODUCTION AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY (L.R. 37-2), #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN S. TRAGISH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS DOCUMENT PRODUCTION AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY (L.R. 37-2), #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF RAYMOND B. KIM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS DOCUMENT PRODUCTION AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY, #4 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS ARF DASHNAKTSUTYUN, WESTERN U.S.A., AND ARMENIAN CULTURAL FOUNDATION NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)(Reeder, Christopher)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorneys Raymond B Kim, Shaunt T Arevian, Grace C Lee for Defendants, Counter Claimants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc, Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan,r Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian in place and stead of Attorneys Christopher S Reeder; Matthew Windom Rosene; Ned M Gelhaar and Robert A Rabbat #102 . (jp)
February 28, 2022 Filing 102 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Raymond B. Kim, Shaunt T. Arevian, Grave C. Lee in place of attorney Matthew Windom Rosene, Ned M. Gelhaar, Robert A. Rabbat filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Does, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Zareh Adjemian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Zareh Adjemian(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Zanku Armenian(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Zanku Armenian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Harmik Baghdassarian(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Harmik Baghdassarian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Levon Baronian(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Levon Baronian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Laura Hakobyan(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Laura Hakobyan(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Zohrab Kahvedjian(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Zohrab Kahvedjian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Garo Kailajian(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Garo Kailajian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Bedig Kazandjian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Bedig Kazandjian(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Mike Keleshian(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Mike Keleshian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Chris Keosian(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Chris Keosian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Hovig Saliba(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Hovig Saliba(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Khatchig Tazian(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Khatchig Tazian(pty:dft)) (Rosene, Matthew)
January 26, 2022 Filing 101 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, Counterclaim,, #97 with JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A..(Reeder, Christopher)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaim #99 on or before 1/26/2022. See Order for specifics. (jp)
January 3, 2022 Filing 99 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A. answer now due 1/26/2022, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, Counterclaim,, #97 filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elan Bloch in Support of Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaim, #2 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaim)(Reeder, Christopher)
December 16, 2021 Filing 98 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim #97 . The following error(s) was/were found: See title page -The caption for counterclaim has only one counter claimant. It is not clear as to party(s) for counter claimants, as all defendants have been selected and also, there are duplicate(s) selections being made. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
December 15, 2021 Filing 97 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #56 with JURY DEMAND Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A. filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimant Bedig Kazandjian, Knar Kitabjian, Chris Keosian, Melkon Melkonian, Hovig Saliba, Hrayr Garabetian, Does, Miganoush Melkonian, Stepan Boyajian, Zanku Armenian, Daron Kachatourian, Garo Kailajian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Zareh Adjemian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Vicken Moses, Mike Keleshian, Harmik Baghdassarian, Gev Iskajyan, Vicken Sosikian, Mkhitar Moradian, Levon Baronian, Rostom Aintablian, ACF Central WUSA, Inc., Khatchig Tazian, Laura Hakobyan, Karo Khanjian, ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc..(Rabbat, Robert)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #95 , First Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before December 15, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
December 6, 2021 Filing 95 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #56 filed by Defendants Bedig Kazandjian, Knar Kitabjian, Chris Keosian, Melkon Melkonian, Hovig Saliba, Hrayr Garabetian, Does, Miganoush Melkonian, Stepan Boyajian, Zanku Armenian, Daron Kachatourian, Garo Kailajian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Zareh Adjemian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Vicken Moses, Mike Keleshian, Harmik Baghdassarian, Gev Iskajyan, Vicken Sosikian, Mkhitar Moradian, Levon Baronian, Rostom Aintablian, ACF Central WUSA, Inc., Khatchig Tazian, Laura Hakobyan, Karo Khanjian, ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ned M. Gelhaar in Support of Joint Stipulation re Responses to First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Rabbat, Robert)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Dkts. #66 , #85 , and #87 ); and GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #86 ). See Order for specifics. (jp)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTIONS OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motions #66 , #85 , #86 and #87 set for Monday, November 15, 2021 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 1, 2021 Filing 92 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute in Excess of $50,000 #85 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute in Excess of $50,000 #87 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute in Excess of $50,000 #86 filed by Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Does, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Rabbat, Robert)
October 25, 2021 Filing 91 OPPOSITION In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute in Excess of $50,000 #85 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute in Excess of $50,000 #87 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute in Excess of $50,000 #86 filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Reeder, Christopher)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Defendants' Renewed Motion to Stay or Dismiss After Filing of First Amended Complaint (Dkt. #62 ). See Order for specifics. (jp)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #66 set for Monday, October 25, 2021 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The Court, on its own motion, continues the hearing on Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.'s MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) (ECF No. #66 ) to 11/15/2021 at 1:30 p.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr)
October 13, 2021 Filing 87 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute in Excess of $50,000 filed by Defendants Mike Keleshian. Motion set for hearing on 11/15/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants Mike Keleshian, Garo Kailajian, and Khatchig Tazian's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute, #3 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Declaration of Robert A. Rabbat in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and California Anti-SLAPP Statute, #7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Robert A. Rabbat, #8 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Mike Keleshian, Garo Kailajian, and Khatchig Tazian's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute) (Rabbat, Robert)
October 13, 2021 Filing 86 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute in Excess of $50,000 filed by Defendants Bedig Kazandjian. Motion set for hearing on 11/15/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants Bedig Kazandjian and Hovig Saliba's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute, #3 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Declaration of Robert A. Rabbat in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and California Anti-SLAPP Statute, #7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Robert A. Rabbat, #8 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Bedig Kazandjian and Hovig Saliba's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute) (Rabbat, Robert)
October 13, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute in Excess of $50,000 filed by Defendants Zohrab Kahvedjian. Motion set for hearing on 11/15/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defend ants Zohrab Kahvedjian, Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Zanku Armenian, Zareh Adjemian, Chris Keosian, and Laura Hakobyan's Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute, #3 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Declaration of Robert A. Rabbat in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and California Anti-SLAPP Statute, #7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Robert A. Rabbat, #8 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Zohrab Kahvedjian, Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Zanku Armenian, Zareh Adjemian, Chris Keosian, and Laura Hakobyan's Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute) (Rabbat, Robert)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #62 set for October 18, 2021 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 8, 2021 Filing 83 REPLY in Support of Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) #66 and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute filed by Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Does, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and for Award of Attorney's Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute, #2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Rabbat, Robert)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Granting extension of time for newly named Defendants to Respond to First Amended Complaint #81 . Newly Named Defendants' responses to the First Amended Complaint shall be filed on October 13, 2021. (See order for specifics). (et)
October 7, 2021 Filing 81 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #56 filed by Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Does, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ned M. Gelhaar in Support of Joint Stipulation re Responses to First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time for Newly Named Defendants to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Rabbat, Robert)
October 4, 2021 Filing 80 OPPOSITION Opposition to re: Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) #66 filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(b)(6) AND FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES UNDER CALIFORNIA ANTI-SLAPP STATUTE)(Reeder, Christopher)
October 4, 2021 Filing 79 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Related State Court Proceedings NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #62 filed by Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Zareh Adjemian, Rostom Aintablian, Zanku Armenian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Stepan Boyajian, Does, Hrayr Garabetian, Laura Hakobyan, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Hovig Saliba, Vicken Sosikian, Khatchig Tazian. (Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Zareh Adjemian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Zanku Armenian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Harmik Baghdassarian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Levon Baronian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Laura Hakobyan(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Zohrab Kahvedjian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Garo Kailajian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Bedig Kazandjian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Mike Keleshian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Chris Keosian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Hovig Saliba(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Khatchig Tazian(pty:dft))(Rabbat, Robert)
September 28, 2021 Filing 78 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Laura Hakobyan served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ashot Voskanyan, son in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Filing 77 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Garo Kailajian served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Garo Kailajian, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Filing 76 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Chris Keosian served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chris Keosian, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Filing 75 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Zareh Adjemian served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Zareh Adjemian, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Filing 74 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Zanku Armenian served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Manuella Abrahamian, wife in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Filing 73 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Levon Baronian served on 9/19/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Levon Baronian, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Filing 72 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Harmik Baghdassarian served on 9/19/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Harmik Baghdassarian, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Filing 71 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Hovig Saliba served on 9/18/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hilda Saliba, wife in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Filing 70 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Bedig Kazandjian served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marie Kazandjian, wife in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Filing 69 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Zohrab Kahvedjian served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karine H. Kahvedjian, wife in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 28, 2021 Filing 68 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Mike Keleshian served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mike Keleshian, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 27, 2021 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Related State Court Proceedings NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #62 filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 21, 2021 Filing 66 Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Proposed Order) (Rabbat, Robert)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2023 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 3/21/2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
September 16, 2021 Filing 64 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 15, 2021 Filing 63 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #56 as to Defendants Zareh Adjemian, Zanku Armenian, Harmik Baghdassarian, Levon Baronian, Laura Hakobyan, Zohrab Kahvedjian, Garo Kailajian, Bedig Kazandjian, Mike Keleshian, Chris Keosian, Hovig Saliba, Khatchig Tazian. (jp)
September 15, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Related State Court Proceedings , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of D. Steve Cameron, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Proposed Order) (Rabbat, Robert)
September 14, 2021 Filing 61 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #56 filed by plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 14, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #58 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendant's name must appear in the "To:" section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
September 13, 2021 Filing 59 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 weeks, filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation.. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 13, 2021 Filing 58 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #56 filed by plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Reeder, Christopher)
September 10, 2021 Filing 57 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTIONS TO DISMISS OFF CALENDAR. In light of the filing of an amended complaint #56 , the motions #23 and #24 to dismiss, set for hearing on September 20, 2021 are taken off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 7, 2021 Filing 56 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - 06.03.27 ARFD-WUSA ByLaws, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - 18.07.10 Appt of Central Committee, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - ARFWest Circular 53-1 dated 21.12.31, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - 21.02.08 Articles - Fake ARF, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - 21.03.22 SOI - Fake ARF, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 - 21.03.25 SOI - Fake ACF, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 - 21.01.02 SOI - Real ARF, #8 Exhibit Ex 8 - ARFWest Circular 53-3 dated 21.01.03, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 - ARFWest Circular 53-6 dated 21.01.29, #10 Exhibit Ex 10 - ARFWest Circular 53-8 dated 21.02.13, #11 Exhibit Ex 11 -21.04.09 Notice from Imposter CC, #12 Exhibit Ex 12 - 21.06.28 Solicitation Letter, #13 Exhibit Ex 13 - Soliciting Donations (ARF Website), #14 Exhibit Ex 14 - ARFWest Circular 53-31 dated 5-23-21, #15 Exhibit Ex 15 - Estate of Anvian Petition Filings, #16 Exhibit Ex 16 - 21.07.18 Meeting Screenshots, #17 Exhibit Ex 17 - Doc 013-3 D Kachatourian Decl (pages), #18 Exhibit Ex 18 - ARFWest Circular 55-1 dated 21.07.22)(Reeder, Christopher)
September 3, 2021 Filing 55 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Related State Court Proceedings NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #24 filed by Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Rostom Aintablian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Stepan Boyajian, Does, Hrayr Garabetian, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Vicken Sosikian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Steve Cameron in Support of Motion to Stay or Dismiss)(Rabbat, Robert)
September 2, 2021 Filing 54 DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF IMPENDING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT AND NO REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute #23 filed by Defendant Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc.. (Rabbat, Robert)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #11 ). See Order for specifics. (jp)
August 26, 2021 Filing 52 OPPOSITION In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Related State Court Proceedings NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #24 filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dan P. Sedor)(Reeder, Christopher)
August 26, 2021 Filing 51 OBJECTION Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute #23 filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 50 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc. served on 7/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melkon Melkonian, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Correction of Docket #32 (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 49 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc. served on 7/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melkon Melkonian, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Correction of Docket #31 (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Vicken Moses served on 7/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vicken Moses, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Correction of Docket #30 (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 47 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Stepan Boyajian served on 7/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Stepan Boyajian, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Correction of Docket #29 (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Mkhitar Moradian served on 7/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mkhitar Moradian, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Correction of Docket #28 (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Hrayr Garabetian served on 7/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Emma Garabetian, wife in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. Correction of Docket #27 & #33 (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule and Resetting Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Dkt. No. 23) and Notice of Motion to Stay or Dismiss (Dkt. No. 24) #41 . The hearing on Defendants Motions #23 and #24 is RESCHEDULE to 9/20/2021 at 1:30 PM. See Order for specifics. (jp)
August 20, 2021 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Knar Kitabjian served on 7/21/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Knar Kitabjian, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Rostom Aintablian served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, resident in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 41 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Related State Court Proceedings NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #24 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute #23 filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Reeder in Support of Joint Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule, #2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule)(Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 40 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Vicken Sosikian served on 7/18/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hourig Sosikian, wife in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Karo Khanjian served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Khanjian, wife in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Miganoush Melkonian served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Miganoush Melkonian, Self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Daron Kachatourian served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daron Kachatourian, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Melkon Melkonian served on 7/11/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melkon Melkonian, self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Gev Iskajyan served on 7/11/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, relative/resident in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armenian Cultural Foundation, ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc. served on 7/11/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melkon Melkonian, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon HRAYR GARABETIAN in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc. served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc. served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Vicken Moses served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Stepan Boyajian served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Mkhitar Moradian served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., upon Defendant Hrayr Garabetian served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Reeder, Christopher)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dd)
August 16, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc.. (Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Rostom Aintablian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Stepan Boyajian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Hrayr Garabetian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Gev Iskajyan(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Daron Kachatourian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Karo Khanjian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Knar Kitabjian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Melkon Melkonian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Miganoush Melkonian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Mkhitar Moradian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Vicken Moses(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party Vicken Sosikian(pty:dft))(Rabbat, Robert)
August 16, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Related State Court Proceedings , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proposed Order) (Rabbat, Robert)
August 16, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6), NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Under California Anti-SLAPP Statute filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rabbat, Robert)
August 6, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Windom Rosene on behalf of Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Rostom Aintablian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Stepan Boyajian, Does, Hrayr Garabetian, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Vicken Sosikian (Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party ACF Central WUSA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Rostom Aintablian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Stepan Boyajian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Hrayr Garabetian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Gev Iskajyan(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Daron Kachatourian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Karo Khanjian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Knar Kitabjian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Melkon Melkonian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Miganoush Melkonian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Mkhitar Moradian(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Vicken Moses(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Windom Rosene added to party Vicken Sosikian(pty:dft))(Rosene, Matthew)
August 6, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ned M Gelhaar on behalf of Defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Rostom Aintablian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Stepan Boyajian, Does, Hrayr Garabetian, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Vicken Sosikian (Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party ACF Central WUSA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Rostom Aintablian(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Stepan Boyajian(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Hrayr Garabetian(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Gev Iskajyan(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Daron Kachatourian(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Karo Khanjian(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Knar Kitabjian(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Melkon Melkonian(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Miganoush Melkonian(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Mkhitar Moradian(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Vicken Moses(pty:dft), Attorney Ned M Gelhaar added to party Vicken Sosikian(pty:dft))(Gelhaar, Ned)
August 2, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Declaration of O. Dimejian)(Gelhaar, Ned)
August 2, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Declaration of M. Tatikian)(Gelhaar, Ned)
August 2, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Declaration of S. Tatikian)(Gelhaar, Ned)
August 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Declaration of T. Mitilian)(Gelhaar, Ned)
August 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Declaration of K. Abajian)(Gelhaar, Ned)
August 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Declaration of A. Kaloustian)(Gelhaar, Ned)
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for TRO)(Gelhaar, Ned)
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to ARMENIAN REVOLUTIONARY FEDERATION WUSA, INC., ACF CENTRAL WUSA, INC., ACF CHAPTERS WUSA, INC., DARON KACHATOURIAN, MELKON MELKONIAN, ROSTOM AINTABLIAN, VICKEN MOSES (aka VICKEN BABIKIAN), KARO EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #11 filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of A. Kaloustian, #2 Declaration Declaration of M. Melkonian, #3 Declaration Declaration of D. Kachatourian, #4 Declaration Declaration of M. Keleshian, #5 Declaration Declaration of K. Tazian, #6 Declaration Declaration of G. Kailajian, #7 Declaration Declaration of D. Steve Cameron, #8 Declaration Declaration of K. Abajian, #9 Declaration Declaration of T. Mitilian, #10 Declaration Declaration of S. Tatikian, #11 Declaration Declaration of M. Tatikian, #12 Declaration Declaration of O. Dimejian, #13 Declaration Declaration of K. Khanjian)(Rabbat, Robert)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LODGING filed July 28, 2021 re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to ARMENIAN REVOLUTIONARY FEDERATION WUSA, INC., ACF CENTRAL WUSA, INC., ACF CHAPTERS WUSA, INC., DARON KACHATOURIAN, MELKON MELKONIAN, ROSTOM AINTABLIAN, VICKEN MOSES (aka VICKEN BABIKIAN), KARO EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #11 (Reeder, Christopher)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to ARMENIAN REVOLUTIONARY FEDERATION WUSA, INC., ACF CENTRAL WUSA, INC., ACF CHAPTERS WUSA, INC., DARON KACHATOURIAN, MELKON MELKONIAN, ROSTOM AINTABLIAN, VICKEN MOSES (aka VICKEN BABIKIAN), KARO KHANJIAN, KNAR KITABJIAN, GEV ISKAJYAN, MIGANOUSH MELKONIAN, MKHITAR MORADIAN, VICKEN SOSIKIAN, STEPAN BOYAJIAN, AND HRAYR GARABETIAN , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Plantiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration Declaration of Carmen Ohanian in Support of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration Declaration of Levon Kirakosian in Support of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration Declaration of Avedik Izmirlian in Support of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #5 Declaration Declaration of Arto Keuleyan in Supportof Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #6 Declaration Declaration of Alik Ourfalian in Support of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #7 Declaration Declaration of Harut Mgrditchian in Support of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #8 Declaration Declaration of Vahan Bezdikian in Support of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #9 Declaration Declaration of Gregor Hovanesian in Support of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #10 Declaration Declaration of Harout Madenian in Support of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #11 Declaration Declaration of Vatche Zetjian in Support of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #12 Declaration Declaration of Chris Reeder in Support of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #13 Declaration Declaration of Dan Sedor in Support of Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #14 Proposed Order TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION) (Reeder, Christopher)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendant ACF Central WUSA, Inc..(Attorney Robert A Rabbat added to party ACF Central WUSA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rabbat, Robert)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dd)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants ACF Central WUSA, Inc., ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc., Rostom Aintablian, Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc., Stepan Boyajian, Hrayr Garabetian, Gev Iskajyan, Daron Kachatourian, Karo Khanjian, Knar Kitabjian, Melkon Melkonian, Miganoush Melkonian, Mkhitar Moradian, Vicken Moses, Vicken Sosikian. (esa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation, identifying ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Attorney Christopher S Reeder added to party Armenian Cultural Foundation(pty:pla))(Reeder, Christopher)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Reeder, Christopher)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A., Armenian Cultural Foundation. (Reeder, Christopher)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31607076 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12) (Attorney Christopher S Reeder added to party ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.(pty:pla))(Reeder, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A. et al v. Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Vicken Moses
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Armenian Revolutionary Federation WUSA, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ACF Chapters WUSA, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Daron Kachatourian
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Melkon Melkonian
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Karo Khanjian
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Knar Kitabjian
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Gev Iskajyan
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Miganoush Melkonian
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mkhitar Moradian
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Vicken Sosikian
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Hrayr Garabetian
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Zareh Adjemian
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Khatchig Tazian
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mike Keleshian
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Levon Baronian
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Laura Hakobyan
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Zohrab Kahvedjian
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Chris Keosian
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Zanku Armenian
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Harmik Baghdassarian
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Garo Kailajian
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: ARF Dashnaktsutyun, Western U.S.A.
Represented By: Dan P Sedor
Represented By: Elan Bloch
Represented By: Vatche Zetjian
Represented By: Christopher S Reeder
Represented By: Benjamin Swenson Tragish
Represented By: Wabel Moussly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armenian Cultural Foundation
Represented By: Dan P Sedor
Represented By: Elan Bloch
Represented By: Vatche Zetjian
Represented By: Christopher S Reeder
Represented By: Benjamin Swenson Tragish
Represented By: Wabel Moussly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACF Central WUSA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Represented By: Troy H Slome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rostom Aintablian
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Represented By: Troy H Slome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicken Babikian
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Represented By: Troy H Slome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stepan Boyajian
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Represented By: Troy H Slome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Ned M Gelhaar
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Ned M. Gelhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hovig Saliba
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Troy H Slome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedig Kazandjian
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Represented By: Raymond B Kim
Represented By: Grace C Lee
Represented By: Matthew Windom Rosene
Represented By: Shaunt T Arevian
Represented By: Troy H Slome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Mark Fingerman
Represented By: Mark Edward Fingerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?