The Guarantee Company of North America USA v. Tetra Tech Inc et al
Plaintiff: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Defendant: Tetra Tech Inc and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
3Rd Party Defendant: WDG CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT SERVICES, INC. DBA WDG CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., Michael P Wyman and Bernadette M, Wyman
Case Number: 2:2021cv05725
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third Party Plaintiff Tetra Tech Inc, upon Third Party Defendant WDG CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT SERVICES, INC. DBA WDG CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc. dba WDG Construction Group, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Smith, Keith)
August 19, 2021 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third Party Plaintiff Tetra Tech Inc, upon Third Party Defendant Michael P Wyman served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael P. Wyman in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Smith, Keith)
August 19, 2021 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third Party Plaintiff Tetra Tech Inc, upon Third Party Defendant Bernadette M, Wyman served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bernadette M. Wyman in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Smith, Keith)
August 13, 2021 Filing 35 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #23 as to Third-Party Defendant Bernadette M, Wyman. (jp)
August 13, 2021 Filing 34 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #23 as to Third-Party Defendant Michael P Wyman. (jp)
August 13, 2021 Filing 33 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint, #23 as to Third-Party Defendant WDG CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT SERVICES, INC. DBA WDG CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. (jp)
August 13, 2021 Filing 32 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #23 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Tetra Tech Inc. (Smith, Keith)
August 13, 2021 Filing 31 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #23 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Tetra Tech Inc. (Smith, Keith)
August 13, 2021 Filing 30 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #23 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Tetra Tech Inc. (Smith, Keith)
August 12, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request on Third-Party Complaint #25 , #26 , #27 . The following error(s) was found: (1) The caption of the summons must match the caption of the Third-Party Complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the Third-Party Complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. (2) Reference is made to a Third-Party Complaint. Please use form AO441. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2021 at 9:00 am. (sw)
August 12, 2021 Filing 27 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #23 filed by Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff Tetra Tech Inc. (Hassan, Omar)
August 12, 2021 Filing 26 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #23 filed by Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff Tetra Tech Inc. (Hassan, Omar)
August 12, 2021 Filing 25 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #23 filed by Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff Tetra Tech Inc. (Hassan, Omar)
August 12, 2021 Filing 24 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Tetra Tech Inc. (Hassan, Omar)
August 12, 2021 Filing 23 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendants WDG CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT SERVICES, INC. DBA WDG CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., MICHAEL P. WYMAN, BERNADETTE M. WYMAN ; Jury Demand, filed by Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff Tetra Tech Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hassan, Omar)
August 12, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tetra Tech Inc, (Hassan, Omar)
August 12, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tetra Tech Inc, (Hassan, Omar)
August 12, 2021 Filing 20 Text Only Entry: The Court has reviewed the Answer #19 , filed by defendant on August 11, 2021. Defendant shall file the mandatory Notice of Interested Parties before 12 noon on August 12, 2021 or the Answer is subject to being stricken. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 11, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Tetra Tech Inc.(Attorney Omar F Hassan added to party Tetra Tech Inc(pty:dft))(Hassan, Omar)
August 6, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Guarantee Company of North America USA, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Randal Unpierre, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Salamirad, Ali)
July 30, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ali Salamirad counsel for Plaintiff The Guarantee Company of North America USA. Adding Ali Salamirad as counsel of record for The Guarantee Company of North America USA, a Michigan corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff The Guarantee Company of North America USA, a Michigan corporation. (Salamirad, Ali)
July 30, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: None #11 by Courtroom Deputy Clerk to Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is stricken. See NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES #14 . (jp)
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #12 by Courtroom Deputy Clerk to Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is stricken. See Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #13 . (jp)
July 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text; missing name of event and text content. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect statute prompt of FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) selected...service was NOT made on the Clerks Office of USDC. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 ***STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. #15 *** SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff The Guarantee Company of North America USA, upon Defendant Tetra Tech Inc served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Salamirad, Ali). Modified on 7/30/2021 (jp).
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 ***STRICKEN PER DKT NO. #16 ]*** (Salamirad, Ali). Modified on 7/30/2021 (jp).
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff The Guarantee Company of North America USA, identifying Intact Financial Corporation. (Polk, Teresa)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Tetra Tech Inc. (car)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA, a Michigan corporation. (Polk, Teresa)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA, a Michigan corporation. (Polk, Teresa)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31634984 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA, a Michigan corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Exhibit F to Complaint) (Attorney Teresa L Polk added to party THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA, a Michigan corporation(pty:pla))(Polk, Teresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Guarantee Company of North America USA v. Tetra Tech Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Represented By: Ali Salamirad
Represented By: Teresa L Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetra Tech Inc
Represented By: Keith E Smith
Represented By: Omar F Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: WDG CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT SERVICES, INC. DBA WDG CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Michael P Wyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bernadette M, Wyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?