Hellasandros v. County of Santa Barbara et al
Plaintiff: Santana Hellasandros
Defendant: County of Santa Barbara, Brian Hill, Clifford Anderson, III, Sergeant Dan Tagles, Bill Brown, Sgt. Alexander, Pena, Santa Barbara County, Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Dept., Santa Barbara City, Santa Barbara Police Department, U.S. Drug Enforcement Agency, Tom Miller, Aaron Baker, Brett Mandrell, Deputy Rocha and Deputy Pappas
Case Number: 2:2021cv05806
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Plaintiff is advised that the Court is screening the Complaint in this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Until the Complaint has been screened and the Court orders that service of process may occur, Plaintiff may not proceed with service of process upon defendants. If the Court determines that the Complaint may be served upon defendants, the Court will provide Plaintiff with instructions regarding service of process in a separate order. [See document for details.] (es)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (In Chambers) MINUTE ORDER RE: MOTION TO AMEND CLAIM AND REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, DKT. #8 by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is DENIED. If Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint incorporating the information in the Motion, she is free to do so a single time pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. In addition, to the extent that Plaintiff wishes to include any of "the eighty-four (84) pages [Plaintiff's] daughter Brittany Rivera either mailed or filed electronically[,]" Plaintiff must include these pages herself. Dkt. #8 at 2. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.2.1, representation may not be delegated to any other person-even a spouse, relative, or co-party in the case. Plaintiff's Daughter Brittany Rivera is not a party to the case, meaning that she cannot submit filings on Plaintiff's behalf. [See document for details.] (es)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: Granting REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #7 . It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $24.71 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (es)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend Claim; Request for Counsel filed by plaintiff Santana Hellasandros. (es)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Santana Hellasandros. (es)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 Text Only Entry re Order to Show Cause #4 . Court clerk mailed Plaintiff Request to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support forms (CV-60P). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ev) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Santana Hellasandros. (es)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTES (In Chambers) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PAYFILING FEE OR FILE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: Accordingly, if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order he must: (1) pay the full $402.00 filing fee; (2) file a request to proceed in forma pauperis; or (3) show cause in writing why he is unable to do so. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail Plaintiff a blank copy of the district's form in forma pauperis request form (CV-60). (es)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) (lh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Alexander(Santa Barbara Sheriff's Department Sergeant, individual), Alexander(Santa Barbara Sheriff's Department Sergeant, official capacity), Clifford Anderson, III(Judge, Santa Barbara Superior Court Dept.8, Dept. 10, official capacity), Clifford Anderson, III(Judge Santa Barbara Superior Court Dept. 8, Dept. 10, individual), Aaron Baker, Bill Brown(Santa Barbara County Sheriff, individual), Bill Brown(Santa Barbara County Sheriff, official capacity), County of Santa Barbara, Brian Hill(Judge, Santa Barbara Superior Court Dept. 2, individual), Brian Hill(Judge, Santa Barbara Superior Court Dept. 2, official capacity), Brett Mandrell, Tom Miller, Pappas, Pena(official capacity), Pena(individual), Rocha, Santa Barbara City, Santa Barbara County, Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Dept., Santa Barbara Police Department, Dan Tagles(Santa Barbara Police Department, individual), Dan Tagles(santa Barbara Police Department, official capacity), U.S. Drug Enforcement Agency pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Filed by Plaintiff Santana Hellasandros. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hellasandros v. County of Santa Barbara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santana Hellasandros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Barbara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Anderson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Dan Tagles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Barbara County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Barbara City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Barbara Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Drug Enforcement Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Mandrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?