Quality Loan Service Corp. v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Quality Loan Service
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Josephine Hardwell, State of California Franchise Tax Board, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, Estate of Edna Kuffour and Gyapomaa Kosei Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv05842
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 2/21/2022. (dd)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order re Court Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Bench Trial set for 5/17/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dd)
August 17, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1 day, filed by Defendant United States of America.. (Greene, Gavin)
August 11, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing the Official Record of a State-Court Proceeding filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copies of Certified Documents)(Greene, Gavin)
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United States of America, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #3 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #9 , Answer to Complaint #8 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #5 on Josephine Hardwell served on 8-2-2021. (Greene, Gavin)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United States of America, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #3 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #9 , Answer to Complaint #8 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #5 on Estate of Edna Kuffour served on 8-2-2021. (Greene, Gavin)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United States of America, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #3 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #9 , Answer to Complaint #8 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #5 on Gyapomaa Kosei, Inc. served on 8-2-2021. (Greene, Gavin)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United States of America, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #3 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #9 , Answer to Complaint #8 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #5 on City of Los Angeles served on 8-2-2021. (Greene, Gavin)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Answer and Claim of the United States filed by Defendant United States of America.(Greene, Gavin)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Greene, Gavin)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles Stanley Mosk Courthouse, case number 21STCP00971 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Gavin L Greene added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:dft))(Greene, Gavin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quality Loan Service Corp. v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quality Loan Service
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Gavin L Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine Hardwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Edna Kuffour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gyapomaa Kosei Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?