Martin Hall v. Stable Road Acquisition Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Martin Hall
Defendant: Stable Road Acquisition Corp., Momentus Inc., SRC-NI Holdings, LLC, Brian Kabot, James Norris and Mikhail Kokorich
Case Number: 2:2021cv05943
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (et)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-05744-JFW-SHKx. Case transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-05943-JFW-SHKx. Signed by Judge John F. Walter. (aco)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Brian Kabot, Mikhail Kokorich, Momentus Inc., James Norris, SRC-NI Holdings, LLC, Stable Road Acquisition Corp. (ghap)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Martin Hall, (Prongay, Robert)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Martin Hall. (Prongay, Robert)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Martin Hall. (Prongay, Robert)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31676852 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Martin Hall. (Attorney Robert Vincent Prongay added to party Martin Hall(pty:pla))(Prongay, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin Hall v. Stable Road Acquisition Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Hall
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stable Road Acquisition Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momentus Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRC-NI Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kabot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikhail Kokorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?