Alber Karamanoukian v. BMW of North America, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Alber Karamanoukian
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC, Valencia B Imports, Inc., Pacific BMW and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv05985
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: On October 29, 2021, the Court denied the parties' second stipulation to extend time. ECF No. 26. The Court then issued an Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. ECF No. 27. The Court warned that a failure to file a timely response would result in dismissal of the action. Plaintiff timely responded #28 . Having considered the response, the Court dismisses the action. The case is dismissed without prejudice. This Order shall constitute notice of entry of judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Pursuant to Local Rule 58-6, the Court orders the Clerk to treat this Order, and its entry on the docket, as an entry of judgment. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
November 2, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukianto Order to Show Cause #27 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service)(Margarian, Hovanes)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order to Show Cause (LOP) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 11/9/2021. (smo)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION AS TO THE TIMING FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SETTING DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #25 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc)
October 26, 2021 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Margarian, Hovanes)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR TIMING TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #23 . Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian and Defendant BMW of North America, LLC stipulate for an order setting deadlines for Plaintiff to file a First Amended Complaint and for BMW to respond thereto. The stipulation does not indicate whether the other parties to the action are amenable to the requested relief. The Court approves of the parties' efforts to avoid motion practice. However, the parties' agreement to a schedule does not alone present good cause to depart from the deadlines for amending the complaint and responding to an amended complaint set by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See Initial Standing Order section 4, ECF No. 9 (requiring "a detailed declaration of the grounds for the requested continuance or extension of time").) The stipulation is Denied. The parties represent that Karamanoukian agreed to file a First Amended Complaint by October 25, 2021. Based on this representation, the Court continues all Defendants' deadlines to respond to the operative Complaint to October 29, 2021. (lc)
September 28, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting the Parties' Stipulation to Set the Time for Plaintiff to File a First Amended Class Action Complaint and Setting BMW of North America, LLC's Deadline to Respond)(Attorney Zourik Zarifian added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Zarifian, Zourik)
August 27, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW of North America, LLC (BMW NA) is a limited liability company, organized under the laws of the State of Delaware, and has its principal place of business in New Jersey. BMW NAs managing member is BMW (US) Holding Corp.; BMW (US) Holding Corp. in turn is a subsidiary of BMW International Holding B.V., a Dutch business entity; BMW International Holding B.V. in turn is a subsidiary of BMW Beteiligungs GmbH & Co. KG, a Germany business entity; BMW Beteiligungs GmbH & Co. KG in turn is a subsidiary of BMW INTEC Beteiligungs GmbH, a German business entity, and BMW Vermgensverwaltungs GmbH, a German business entity; BMW Vermgensverwaltungs GmbH in turn is a subsidiary of BMW INTEC Beteiligungs GmbH; BMW INTEC Beteiligungs GmbH in turn is a subsidiary of Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft (BMW AG), a German business entity. Shares of BMW AG are publicly traded on the Brse Mnchen (the Munich Stock Exchange). (Kizirian, Eric)
August 27, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #19 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is accepted as filed. (smo)
August 27, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation: Extending time to answer (30 days or Less). The incorrect event used did NOT extend any time to answer complaint. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
August 27, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.(Attorney Eric Y. Kizirian added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Kizirian, Eric)
August 19, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian, upon Defendant Valencia B Imports, Inc. served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Margarian, Hovanes)
August 19, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian, upon Defendant Pacific BMW served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sako in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Margarian, Hovanes)
August 19, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian, upon Defendant BMW of North America, LLC served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Margarian, Hovanes)
July 29, 2021 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pacific BMW. (shb)
July 29, 2021 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Valencia B Imports, Inc.. (shb)
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #12 filed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian. (Margarian, Hovanes)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #10 filed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian. (Margarian, Hovanes)
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants BMW of North America, LLC. (shb)
July 26, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #8 filed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian. (Margarian, Hovanes)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon the filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (jgr)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian, (Margarian, Hovanes)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian., Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian. (Margarian, Hovanes)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian. (Margarian, Hovanes)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31684697 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Alber Karamanoukian. (Attorney Hovanes Margarian added to party Alber Karamanoukian(pty:pla))(Margarian, Hovanes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alber Karamanoukian v. BMW of North America, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alber Karamanoukian
Represented By: Armen Margarian
Represented By: Shushanik Margarian
Represented By: Hovanes Margarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Eric Y. Kizirian
Represented By: Zourik Zarifian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valencia B Imports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific BMW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?