Ed Hull v. Anna Mallios et al
Plaintiff: Ed Hull
Defendant: Anna Mallios and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv06149
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (es)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ed Hullto Order to Show Cause, #8 (Wilson, Kyle)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Marc Friedlander, #3 Declaration of Anoush Hakimi, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Kyle W Wilson added to party Ed Hull(pty:pla)) (Wilson, Kyle)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (In Chambers): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: In the present case, it appears that one or more of these time periods has not been met. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before September 24, 2021, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for details.) (es)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ed Hull, upon Defendant Anna Mallios served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ANNA MALLIOS, an individual (Defendant) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Steven, Laura)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Anna Mallios. (et)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 CV11C Statement of Consent) (et)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ed Hull, (Shahriari, Peter)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull. (Shahriari, Peter)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ed Hull. (Shahriari, Peter)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31718769 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Ed Hull. (Attorney Peter Shahriari added to party Ed Hull(pty:pla))(Shahriari, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ed Hull v. Anna Mallios et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Hull
Represented By: Peter Shahriari
Represented By: Anoush Hakimi
Represented By: Kyle W Wilson
Represented By: Laura Anne Steven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Mallios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?