United States of America v. Monel Herscovici
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Monel Herscovici
Case Number: 2:2021cv06150
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-06150 CAS(ASx). (rn)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Greene, Gavin)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Monel Herscovici. (et)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV11C Statement of Consent) (et)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Greene, Gavin)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Greene, Gavin)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney Gavin L Greene added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Greene, Gavin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Monel Herscovici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Gavin L Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monel Herscovici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?