Eric E. Gofnung et al v. BMW of North America, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv06328
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
2 Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
3 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Filing 100 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 10, 2023 Filing 99 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #96 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict; re party or parties name. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 9, 2023 Filing 98 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Ariel Harman-Holmes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 9, 2023 Filing 97 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Christine J. Haw is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 8, 2023 Filing 96 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Eric E. Gofnung for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL [ECF NO. 94] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered the Parties Joint Stipulation, and finding good cause therefore, hereby GRANTS the Joint Stipulation as follows:The trial date is continued to March 25,2024, at 8:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
July 28, 2023 Filing 94 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial from August 28, 2023 to March 25, 2024 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 93 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Michael)
July 24, 2023 Filing 93 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court vacates the Trial Setting Conference set for 08/16/2023 and trial scheduled for 08/28/2023. The parties are ordered to meet and confer and propose a new trial date by no later than Friday, July 28, at 5 pm, after consulting with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Should the parties still wish for the Court to hold a Trial Setting Conference, as opposed to a further Pretrial Conference once the trial date has been set, the parties shall submit a Joint Statement advising the Court of the need for such a Trial Setting Conference and enumerating the topics to be discussed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 5, 2023 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Excluding Defendant's February 8, 2022 Expert Report and Defendant's Expert's File from Trial due to Defendant's Failure to Timely Disclose those Documents #87 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Lee, Michael)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND REQUEST TO SET A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE [ECF NO. 90] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered the Parties Joint Stipulation to Continue the Trial and Request to Set a Trial Setting Conference and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the Joint Stipulation to Continue the Trial and Request to Set a Trial Setting Conference ORDERS as follows: The Trial Setting Conference is set for 8/16/2023 at 9:00 a.m. and the Trial is continued to 8/28/2023 at 8:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) Modified on 5/5/2023 (yl).
May 4, 2023 Filing 90 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Jury Trial from May 8, 2023 to to Set a Trial Setting Conference filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Request to Set Trial Setting Conference)(Scott, Caitlin)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE [ECF NOS. 49, 50] AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE [ECF NOS. 5258] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Before the Court are nine (9) motions in limine filed by Defendant BMW North America, LLC and Plaintiffs Eric Gofnung and Gofnung Chiropractic. For the reasons stated herein, the Court GRANTS the motions in part. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: Trial Procedure by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Trial is currently set for May 8, 2023. The Court held a pretrial conference on April 19, 2023. In accordance with the Court's orders, the parties filed a number of new and amended pretrial documents. This order sets forth the relevant trial procedures in this matter not previously addressed. Having reviewed the parties' submissions, the Court finds that seven (7) hours per side is sufficient for the trial in this case. The Court adopts the parties' submission regarding the wearing of masks. The Court will hold an Exhibit Conference on May 8, 2023 to discuss the objections noted to exhibits in the Joint Exhibit List. The Court has reviewed the Joint Proposed Jury Instructions, and will hold a preliminary Jury Instruction Conference as needed on May 8, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
May 3, 2023 Filing 87 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Excluding Defendant's February 8, 2022 Expert Report and Defendant's Expert's File from Trial due to Defendant's Failure to Timely Disclose those Documents filed by Plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Lunn, David)
May 3, 2023 Filing 86 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Deposition Transcripts re Pretrial Conference - Final - optional html form,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,, #84 (Villegas, Daniel)
May 3, 2023 Filing 85 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David W Lunn counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Adding David W. Lunn as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff ERICE. GOFNUNG and ERICE. GOFNUNG CHIROPRACTIC CO.. (Attorney David W Lunn added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney David W Lunn added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Lunn, David)
April 21, 2023 Filing 83 PROPOSED JOINT [PROPOSED] DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL VERDICT FORM AND PLAINTIFFS' GENERAL AND SPECIAL VERDICT FORMS JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiffs and Defendant Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. (Scott, Caitlin)
April 21, 2023 Filing 82 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC... (Villegas, Daniel)
April 21, 2023 Filing 81 JOINT Exhibit List filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC... (Villegas, Daniel)
April 21, 2023 Filing 80 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung.. (Scott, Caitlin)
April 21, 2023 Filing 79 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung.. (Scott, Caitlin)
April 21, 2023 Filing 78 Joint STIPULATION for U.S. District Court, Central District, Courtroom 8B Trial on May 8, 2023 filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC..(Villegas, Daniel)
April 20, 2023 Filing 77 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 5/5/2023 #74 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed orders SHALL NOT have counsels name, address, and phone number in the upper left corner. Please refer to the Judge's Procedure page at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-maame-ewusi-mensah-frimpong for counsel to review the Proposed Order Sample. A new proposed order must be re-submitted in accordance with the Judge's procedures and posted sample. (yl)
April 19, 2023 Filing 76 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung.. (Scott, Caitlin)
April 19, 2023 Filing 75 TRIAL BRIEF regarding Implied Warranty, Violation of 1793.2(b) and Damages filed by Plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung.. (Scott, Caitlin)
April 18, 2023 Filing 74 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 5/5/2023 filed by Plaintiff Attorney Eric E. Gofnung. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order) (Scott, Caitlin)
April 17, 2023 Filing 73 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael T. Lee counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. Adding Michael T. Lee as counsel of record for BMW of North America, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attorney Michael T. Lee added to party BMW of North America, LLC.(pty:dft))(Lee, Michael)
April 17, 2023 Filing 72 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered Plaintiff's Request #71 and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the Request and ORDERS Plaintiff is permitted to appear via Zoom at the Final Pretrial Conference set on April 19, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The Zoom link is found on the Court's website: https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-maame-ewusi-mensah-frimpong.Prior to the hearing, the parties must consult the Guidelines for Zoom Courtroom Proceedings found on the Court's website. Failure to comply with the Guidelines may result in future requests for Zoom appearances being denied. If Defendants also wish to appear via Zoom, the Court requests that they provide email notice prior to the hearing at MEMF_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov, by no later than Tuesday, April 18, 2023, at 10:00 am. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 14, 2023 Filing 71 REQUEST for Leave of Plaintiff to Appear for Zoom filed by Plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Request set for hearing on 4/19/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Scott, Caitlin)
April 12, 2023 Filing 70 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Testimony By Plaintiffs' Expert #50 filed by Plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition transcript)(Scott, Caitlin)
April 12, 2023 Filing 69 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence Or Argument Regarding Damages #49 filed by Plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung. (Attachments: #1 Declaration declaration of caitlin scott, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2)(Scott, Caitlin)
April 7, 2023 Filing 68 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Scott, Caitlin)
April 5, 2023 Filing 67 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC... (Villegas, Daniel)
April 5, 2023 Filing 66 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Villegas, Daniel)
April 5, 2023 Filing 65 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC... (Villegas, Daniel)
April 5, 2023 Filing 64 STATEMENT Joint Statement of the Case filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Scott, Caitlin)
April 5, 2023 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Sixth MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #6 to Exclude PROHIBIT EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT COMPONENTS REPAIRED AFTER A SINGLE ATTEMPT ARE NOT COUNTED UNDER THE SONG-BEVERLY ACT #57 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Villegas, Daniel)
April 5, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. (Scott, Caitlin)
April 5, 2023 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Fifth MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #5 to Prevent PROHIBIT EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT COMPONENTS REPAIRED AFTER A SINGLE ATTEMPT ARE NOT COUNTED UNDER THE SONG-BEVERLY ACT MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #5 to Preclude PROHIBIT EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT COMPONENTS REPAIRED AFTER A SINGLE ATTEMPT ARE NOT COUNTED UNDER THE SONG-BEVERLY ACT #56 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Villegas, Daniel)
April 5, 2023 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Third MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #3 to Exclude reference to Plaintiffs' financing #54 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Villegas, Daniel)
April 5, 2023 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine # 1 to Exclude to exclude reference to arbitration #52 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Villegas, Daniel)
March 22, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Seventh MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #7 to Exclude to exclude evidence or argument regarding settlement negotiations filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Caitlin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Sixth MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #6 to Exclude PROHIBIT EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT COMPONENTS REPAIRED AFTER A SINGLE ATTEMPT ARE NOT COUNTED UNDER THE SONG-BEVERLY ACT filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Caitlin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Fifth MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #5 to Prevent PROHIBIT EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT COMPONENTS REPAIRED AFTER A SINGLE ATTEMPT ARE NOT COUNTED UNDER THE SONG-BEVERLY ACT , MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #5 to Preclude PROHIBIT EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT COMPONENTS REPAIRED AFTER A SINGLE ATTEMPT ARE NOT COUNTED UNDER THE SONG-BEVERLY ACT ( Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong.) filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Caitlin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Fourth MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #4 to Exclude exclude reference to attorney advertising filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Caitlin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Third MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #3 to Exclude reference to Plaintiffs' financing filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Caitlin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Second MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine # 2 to Exclude Reference to Attorneys' Fees filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Caitlin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine # 1 to Exclude to exclude reference to arbitration filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Caitlin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 51 Plaintiffs MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung. (Scott, Caitlin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Testimony By Plaintiffs' Expert filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Villegas, Daniel)
March 22, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence Or Argument Regarding Damages filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Villegas, Daniel)
March 22, 2023 Filing 48 Witness List filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung.. (Scott, Caitlin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Daniel R. Villegas re Separate Trial Documents filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Villegas, Daniel)
March 22, 2023 Filing 46 Plaintiffs' Proposed Exhibit List filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung.. (Scott, Caitlin)
March 22, 2023 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Villegas, Daniel)
March 22, 2023 Filing 44 STATUS REPORT re Settlement filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Villegas, Daniel)
March 22, 2023 Filing 43 Proposed Exhibit List filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC... (Villegas, Daniel)
March 22, 2023 Filing 42 Witness List filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC... (Villegas, Daniel)
March 13, 2023 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Caitlin Jane Scott counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Adding Caitlin J. Scott as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff ERIC E. GOFNUNG and ERIC E. GOFNUNG CHIROPRACTIC CO.. (Attorney Caitlin Jane Scott added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Caitlin Jane Scott added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Scott, Caitlin)
July 26, 2022 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Kareem Shereef Aref is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The final pretrial conference is set for 4/19/2023 09:00 AM. The Jury Trial is set for 5/8/2023 at 8:30 AM. (See document for further details) (yl)
June 14, 2022 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 13, 2022 Filing 37 STATUS REPORT : Joint Status Report re Settlement filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Stefatos, Andrew)
April 26, 2022 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 1, 2022 Filing 35 STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement Addendum - Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung re: Statement #32 . (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 18, 2022 Filing 34 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court ORDERS the parties to submit a current copy of the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet attached to the Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference no later than fifteen (15) days after this ORDER. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference is available on Judge Frimpong's website. The Court will schedule Final Pretrial Conferences and Trials no earlier than August 2022. The parties are required to meet and confer regarding their availability prior to submitting this Joint worksheet. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 7, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nadine Alsaadi on behalf of Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Attorney Nadine Alsaadi added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Nadine Alsaadi added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Alsaadi, Nadine)
February 25, 2022 Filing 32 STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement Pursuant to Reassignment Order filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 14, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo on behalf of Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew)
February 14, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kareem Shereef Aref on behalf of Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Aref, Kareem)
February 14, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine J Haw on behalf of Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
February 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, Please refer to the attached order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-009) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, this case is transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr to the calendar of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-06328-MEMF-JCx. (vp)
February 7, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 29, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr)
December 18, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Harjap Singh Malik is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 18, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Gregory Sogoyan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The DOE defendants remaining after 2/14/2022 are dismissed by operation of this Order and without further notice. The Court vacates the mandatory scheduling conference set for 12/17/2021 and issues this case management order. The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) report #19 and sets the pretrial and trial dates noted in the table below based on an evaluation of the complexity of the case. Jury Trial set for 7/25/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 7/15/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties (Hearing Deadline) 2/14/2022. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 4/15/2022. Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 4/22/2022. Non-Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 4/22/2022. Settlement Conference Deadline 5/6/2022. Post-Settlement Status Conference set for 5/20/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Status Report due by 5/13/2022. Trial Filings (First Set) Deadline 6/26/2022. Trial Filings (Second Set) Deadline 7/1/2022. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
December 13, 2021 Filing 20 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for hearing on 12/17/2021. If the Court determines a hearing necessary one will be set at a later date. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 8, 2021 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung.. (Kuemerle, Karin)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for 12/17/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. The parties shall file a joint Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/7/2021. (vcr)
November 15, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Simi Peterson on behalf of Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Attorney Simi Peterson added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Simi Peterson added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Peterson, Simi)
October 13, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Harjap Singh Malik on behalf of Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung (Attorney Harjap Singh Malik added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Harjap Singh Malik added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Malik, Harjap)
August 31, 2021 Filing 15 Notice and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC., identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Stefatos, Andrew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: On 8/30/2021, the Clerk's office issued a Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #13 regarding the Defendant's Answer #12 , because of non-compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1. The document is accepted as filed. However, Defendant is ordered to submit a Notice of Interested Parties in the form and manner set forth in Local Rule 7.1-1 no later than 8/31/2021. Failure to do so may result in the Court striking Defendant's Answer. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC..(Attorney Andrew K Stefatos added to party BMW of North America, LLC.(pty:dft))(Stefatos, Andrew)
August 14, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon the filing of the complaint for civil cases assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory Sogoyan counsel for Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. Adding Gregory Sogoyan as counsel of record for Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs' Eric E. Gofnung and Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Attorney Gregory Sogoyan added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory Sogoyan added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Sogoyan, Gregory)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-06328 SB(JCx). (rn)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (esa)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs' Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. (Law, Daniel)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs' Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung, (Law, Daniel)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co., Eric E. Gofnung. (Law, Daniel)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31754864 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs' Eric E. Gofnung, Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Warranty)) (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Eric E. Gofnung(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric E. Gofnung et al v. BMW of North America, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric E. Gofnung
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Gregory Sogoyan
Represented By: Harjap Singh Malik
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Simi Peterson
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Kareem Shereef Aref
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Nadine Alsaadi
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Caitlin Jane Scott
Represented By: David W Lunn
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric E. Gofnung Chiropractic Co.
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Gregory Sogoyan
Represented By: Harjap Singh Malik
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Simi Peterson
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Kareem Shereef Aref
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Nadine Alsaadi
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Caitlin Jane Scott
Represented By: David W Lunn
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC.
Represented By: Kate S Lehrman
Represented By: Andrew K Stefatos
Represented By: Daniel R Villegas
Represented By: Michael T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?