James Brusca v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Plaintiff: James Brusca
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Vista Ford Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv06347
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
2 Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2023 Filing 48 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, #45 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Jun, Patricia)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES [ECF NO. #46 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The jury trial is set for 10/16/2023 at 8:30 am. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/27/2023 at 9:00 am. The discovery cut-off is 4/12/2023. The last date to conduct settlement conference is 7/19/2023. (See document for further details) (yl)
February 8, 2023 Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial and All Related Deadlines from June 12, 2023 to October 16, 2023 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun, #2 Exhibit A Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet, #3 Proposed Order)(Jun, Patricia)
January 19, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims in Plaintiff's Complaint, Or In the Alternative , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Judgment, #4 Separate Statement, #5 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Proposed Order) (Jun, Patricia)
December 22, 2022 Filing 44 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine J Haw counsel for Plaintiff James Brusca. Adding Christine J. Haw as counsel of record for James Brusca for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff James Brusca. (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party James Brusca(pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
December 14, 2022 Filing 43 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Caitlin Jane Scott counsel for Plaintiff James Brusca. Adding Caitlin J. Scott as counsel of record for James Brusca for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff James Brusca. (Attorney Caitlin Jane Scott added to party James Brusca(pty:pla))(Scott, Caitlin)
August 5, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #40 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 4, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tionna Dolin on behalf of Plaintiff James Brusca (Dolin, Tionna)
June 23, 2022 Filing 39 STATEMENT First Amended Joint Case Management filed by Plaintiff James Brusca (Dolin, Tionna)
June 14, 2022 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff James Brusca. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff James Brusca. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for James Brusca for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 25, 2022 Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REPORT of Amended Joint Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 25, 2022 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff James Brusca. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for James Brusca for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff James Brusca. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party James Brusca(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah FrimpongIn light of the foregoing, the Court hereby DENIES the Motion to Remand, GRANTS Bruscas unopposed Request to Take Judicial Notice of Exhibits AJ, and GRANTS Fords unopposed Request to Take Judicial Notice of the parties Lease Agreement. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status reportto include a current copy of the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet attached to the Courts Order Setting Scheduling Conferencewithin thirty (30) days of this Order.7 The parties are required to meet and confer regarding their availability prior to submitting this joint status report. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
March 22, 2022 Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court finds the Pltf's Motion to Remand to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #14 and the Re-Noticed Motion #29 appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the motion hearing set for MARCH 24, 2022, is removed from the calendar and the motions are taken under submission. No appearances are necessary on March 24, 2022. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 10, 2022 Filing 32 REPLY in support Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #29 filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Evidentiary Objections to Mortenson Dec (Dkt. No. 31-1))(Law, Daniel)
March 3, 2022 Filing 31 OPPOSITION re: Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #29 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet of M. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Mortenson)(Mortenson, Michael)
February 24, 2022 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #29 filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. (Law, Daniel)
February 24, 2022 Filing 29 Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. Motion set for hearing on 3/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Law In Support of Remand, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand) (Law, Daniel)
February 24, 2022 Filing 28 STATEMENT Case Management Statement Pursuant to Reassignment Order filed by Plaintiff James Brusca (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Please refer to the attached order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-008) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, this case is transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr to the calendar of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-06347-MEMF-GJSx. (vp)
January 28, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff James Brusca. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Dkt. No. 22 is STRICKEN. Plaintiff is directed to the "Important Notices" section on Judge Birotte's webpage for information on telephonic appearances. SO ORDERED. (cb)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND #14 and SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The hearing regarding Plaintiff's Motion and the Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from January 28, 2022 to March 11, 2022, at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 25, 2022 Filing 22 [STRICKEN] REQUEST for Leave of Karin Kuemerle to Appear for Remote Appearance filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. Request set for hearing on 1/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karin Kuemerle in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Appearance at the January 28, 2022 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Appearance at the January 28, 2022 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Kuemerle, Karin) Modified on 1/27/2022 (cb).
January 14, 2022 Filing 21 OBJECTIONS in Support re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #14 filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. (Law, Daniel)
January 14, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #14 filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. (Law, Daniel)
January 7, 2022 Filing 19 Opposition in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #14 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration)(Jun, Patricia)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Scheduling Conference set for January 7, 2022 to February 18, 2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 30, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiff James Brusca (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party James Brusca(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
December 23, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff James Brusca.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet)(Law, Daniel)
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #14 filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. (Law, Daniel)
December 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Remand) (Law, Daniel)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court ORDERS that the Stipulation #12 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 1/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr., and all associated and related deadlines are continued accordingly. (gk)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from October 29, 2021 to at least sixty (60) days from October 29, 2021 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #9 filed by Plaintiff James Brusca. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Joint Stipulation to Continue October 29, 2021 Scheduling Conference, #2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue October 29, 2021 Scheduling Conference)(Law, Daniel)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff James Brusca, identifying James Brusca. (Law, Daniel)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiff James Brusca (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party James Brusca(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-06347 AB(GJSx). (rn)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
August 5, 2021 COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff James Brusca as to defendant Vista Ford Inc. (filed in state court 7/1/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 7) (esa)
August 5, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Ford Motor Company, Vista Ford Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff James Brusca. (filed in state court 4/23/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
August 5, 2021 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (filed in state court 8/3/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 17)(esa)
August 5, 2021 COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff James Brusca, upon Defendant Vista Ford Inc. served on 5/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Salina Doe, Receptionist and by mailing in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 5/11/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 20) (esa)
August 5, 2021 COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff James Brusca, upon Defendant Ford Motor Company served on 5/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 5/11/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 19) (esa)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, identifying Ford Motor Company. (Mortenson, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Mortenson, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 21STCV15504 Receipt No: ACACDC-31757634 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #18 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #19 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #20 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #21 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #22 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #23 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #24 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson) (Attorney Michael Donn Mortenson added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Mortenson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Brusca v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brusca
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Caitlin Jane Scott
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Represented By: Craig A Taggart
Represented By: Patricia H Jun
Represented By: Patricia H. Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Ford Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?