Janice Fox v. Ultimate Action, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Janice Fox
Defendant: Ultimate Action, LLC, Supreme Studios, LLC, TF Properties #2, LLC, TF Properties #3, LLC, Theodore Fox, Barry Fox, DOES 1 through 50 and ROES
Case Number: 2:2021cv06422
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) #30 . Inadvertently, incorrect document (Order) was attached to this docket entry. Transmittal document to be re-docketed. (lom)
September 29, 2021 Filing 31 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (lom)
September 29, 2021 Filing 30 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (lom)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Having reviewed the parties' joint status report and considered the parties' arguments therein, the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(3) and REMANDS the action to the Los Angeles Superior Court without ruling on the Second Motion toDismiss. IT IS SO ORDERED. Case remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case number 21STCV18183. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (lom)
September 24, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's 12th Cause of Action for an Accounting Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #24 filed by Defendant Ultimate Action, LLC. (Heck, Christopher)
September 24, 2021 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT filed by Defendant Ultimate Action, LLC. (Heck, Christopher)
September 17, 2021 Filing 26 Opposition opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's 12th Cause of Action for an Accounting Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #24 filed by Plaintiff Janice Fox. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc S. Strecker, #2 Exhibit 1)(Strecker, Marc)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR 30-DAY EXTENSION TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #20 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Defendants Ultimate Action, LLC; Supreme Studios, LLC; TF Properties #2, LLC; TF Properties #3, LLC; and Theodore Fox's answer due 10/13/2021. Defendants Ultimate Action, LLC, Supreme Studios, LLC, TF Properties #2, LLC and TF Properties #3, LLCs special motion to strike pursuant to Cal. Code Civil Proc. 425.16 shall be filed by October 13, 2021. (lc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's 12th Cause of Action for an Accounting Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Supreme Studios, LLC, TF Properties #2, LLC, TF Properties #3, LLC, Ultimate Action, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Johnny White, #2 Certificate of Service) (Heck, Christopher)
September 8, 2021 Filing 23 Opposition opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/8/2021 re Amended Complaint/Petition #15 #20 filed by Plaintiff Janice Fox. (Strecker, Marc)
September 7, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Supplement to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: SEE BELOW UNDER OTHER. pdf document is the proposed order, not a supplement. Other error(s) with document(s): As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as Separate Attachment thereto. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
September 3, 2021 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/8/2021 re Amended Complaint/Petition #15 #20 filed by Defendants Theodore Fox, Supreme Studios, LLC, TF Properties #2, LLC, TF Properties #3, LLC, Ultimate Action, LLC. (Heck, Christopher)
September 3, 2021 Filing 20 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/8/2021 re Amended Complaint/Petition #15 filed by Defendants Theodore Fox, Supreme Studios, LLC, TF Properties #2, LLC, TF Properties #3, LLC, Ultimate Action, LLC. (Heck, Christopher)
September 1, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: ORDER FOR THE PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND #9 AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS #7 AS MOOT. Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint, Dkt. 15, removing the 11 th cause of action from the operative complaint. The court, therefore, ORDERS the parties to meet and confer by September 21, 2021, regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and to fi le a joint status report regarding whether Defendants intend to continue opposing the motion or a stipulation to remand the action by September 24, 2021. The court VACATES the September 17, 2021 hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, Dkt. 9. Defendants Ultimate Action, LLC; Supreme Studios, LLC; TF Properties #2, LLC; and TF Properties #3, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, Dkt. 7, is DENIED as MOOT. (lc)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (vv)
August 27, 2021 Filing 17 Objections to Evidence opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss 11th cause of action (Civil RICO) and 13th cause of action (Accounting) in the Complaint and dismissing defendants from the action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #7 filed by Plaintiff Janice Fox. (Strecker, Marc)
August 27, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss 11th cause of action (Civil RICO) and 13th cause of action (Accounting) in the Complaint and dismissing defendants from the action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #7 filed by Plaintiff Janice Fox. (Strecker, Marc)
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Janice Fox (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to First Amended Complaint)(Strecker, Marc)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 JOINDER filed by Defendant Theodore Fox joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 . (Heck, Christopher)
August 27, 2021 Filing 13 OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 filed by Defendants Theodore Fox, Supreme Studios, LLC, TF Properties #2, LLC, TF Properties #3, LLC, Ultimate Action, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Schulman, #2 Declaration of Shauna Casey, #3 Declaration of Michael Wolf, #4 Declaration of Johnny White, #5 Declaration of Ted Fox, #6 Declaration of Christopher J. Heck, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8)(Heck, Christopher)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss 11th cause of action (Civil RICO) and 13th cause of action (Accounting) in the Complaint and dismissing defendants from the action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #7 , Complaint - (Discovery), Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 , Errata, #11 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Request for Judicial Notice, #8 e-mailed to kaufler@earthlink.net bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.7.1 Connection refused - OXSUS0001_403 - https://postmaster-oxsus.vadesecure.com/#OXSUS0001_403. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Supreme Studios, LLC, TF Properties #2, LLC, TF Properties #3, LLC, Ultimate Action, LLC. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss 11th cause of action (Civil RICO) and 13th cause of action (Accounting) in the Complaint and dismissing defendants from the action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #7 (White, Johnny)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (vv)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Janice Fox. Motion set for hearing on 9/17/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc S. Strecker, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Strecker, Marc)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss 11th cause of action (Civil RICO) and 13th cause of action (Accounting) in the Complaint and dismissing defendants from the action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #7 filed by Defendants Supreme Studios, LLC, TF Properties #2, LLC, TF Properties #3, LLC, Ultimate Action, LLC. (Heck, Christopher)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss 11th cause of action (Civil RICO) and 13th cause of action (Accounting) in the Complaint and dismissing defendants from the action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by defendants Supreme Studios, LLC, TF Properties #2, LLC, TF Properties #3, LLC, Ultimate Action, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Gary M. Gitlin, #2 Declaration Declaration of Johnny White, #3 Declaration Declaration of Ted Fox, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10) (Heck, Christopher)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
August 9, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Janice Fox in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/14/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Theodore Fox, Supreme Studios, LLC, TF Properties #2, LLC, TF Properties #3, LLC, Ultimate Action, LLC, identifying Janice Fox; Theodore Fox; Ultimate Action, LLC; Supreme Studios, LLC; TF Properties #2, LLC; TF Properties #3, LLC; and Barry Fox. (Heck, Christopher)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Theodore Fox, Supreme Studios, LLC, TF Properties #2, LLC, TF Properties #3, LLC, Ultimate Action, LLC. (Heck, Christopher)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21STCV18183, case number 21STCV18183 Receipt No: ACACDC-31774021 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Ultimate Action, LLC, TF Properties #3, LLC, TF Properties #2, LLC, Supreme Studios, LLC, Theodore Fox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Informatin Package, #4 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location, #5 Exhibit Notice of Case Assignment (Unlimited Case), #6 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit Notice of Case Management Conference) (Attorney Christopher J Heck added to party Theodore Fox(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J Heck added to party Supreme Studios, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J Heck added to party TF Properties #2, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J Heck added to party TF Properties #3, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J Heck added to party Ultimate Action, LLC(pty:dft))(Heck, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janice Fox v. Ultimate Action, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Fox
Represented By: Marc S. Strecker
Represented By: Philip Kaufler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultimate Action, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Heck
Represented By: Johnny White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreme Studios, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Heck
Represented By: Johnny White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TF Properties #2, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Heck
Represented By: Johnny White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TF Properties #3, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Heck
Represented By: Johnny White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Fox
Represented By: Christopher J Heck
Represented By: Johnny White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?