In Re Trust of Hazel N. Winchester, Established November 24, 2004 et al
Petitioner: Shelia Mitchell
Respondent: William Bernard Winchester, Ronald McCoy, Lantzman Investments, Inc., United Security Financial Corporation, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, Lawyers Title Insurance Corporation, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Mid America Mortgage, Inc., Department of Housing and Urban Development, DOES 1 through 5, DOES 6 through 10, inclusive; and All Persons Unknown
Case Number: 2:2021cv06461
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY In Opposition To NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District #9 filed by Respondent Mid America Mortgage, Inc.. (Salas, Daniel)
September 28, 2021 Filing 17 OBJECTION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR REMAND AND PARTIAL JOINDER IN HUD'S OPPOSITION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District #9 filed by Respondent Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR REMAND AND PARTIAL JOINDER IN HUD'S OPPOSITION)(Attorney Mary Ann Rousso added to party Fidelity National Title Insurance Company(pty:res))(Rousso, Mary)
September 27, 2021 Filing 16 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District #9 filed by Respondent Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jasmin Yang)(Yang, Jasmin)
September 17, 2021 Filing 15 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District #9 filed by Respondent Mid America Mortgage, Inc.. (Attorney Daniel Ray Salas added to party Mid America Mortgage, Inc.(pty:res))(Salas, Daniel)
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court has received and reviewed the parties Amended Joint Rule 26(f) Report (ECF No. #12 ). The matter is set for a scheduling conference on September 16, 2021. Further, the Petitioner has filed a Motion to Remand which is currently scheduled for October 18, 2021. In light of the above, the Court continues the scheduling conference to October 18. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Thursday's 09/16/2021 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Amended ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Respondent Department of Housing and Urban Development.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jasmin Yang)(Yang, Jasmin)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Respondent Department of Housing and Urban Development.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jasmin Yang)(Yang, Jasmin)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): A proposed order shall be submitted as a separate attachment to the Motion or to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District filed by Petitioner Shelia Mitchell. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice) (Anderson, Michael)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Respondent Department of Housing and Urban Development, served on August 13, 2021. (Yang, Jasmin)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/9/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
August 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PETITION filed by Petitioner Shelia Mitchell in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/10/2018 attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) Modified on 8/12/2021 (jtil).
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Respondent Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Yang, Jasmin)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 18STPB04469 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Respondent Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Docket Part 1 of 8, #2 Exhibit 1 State Court Docket Part 2 of 8, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket Part 3 of 8, #4 Exhibit State Court Docket Part 4 of 8, #5 Exhibit State Court Docket Part 5 of 8, #6 Exhibit State Court Docket Part 6 of 8, #7 Exhibit 1 State Court Docket Part 7 of 8, #8 Exhibit 1 State Court Docket Part 8 of 8) (Attorney Jasmin Yang added to party Department of Housing and Urban Development(pty:res))(Yang, Jasmin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Trust of Hazel N. Winchester, Established November 24, 2004 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shelia Mitchell
Represented By: Andrei Serpik
Represented By: Michael Dale Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Bernard Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lantzman Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United Security Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lawyers Title Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary Ann Rousso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mid America Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Bobby B Ashrafi
Represented By: Charles C Cavanagh
Represented By: Daniel Ray Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Jasmin Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DOES 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DOES 6 through 10, inclusive;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: All Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?