D.E.F. et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: D.E.F., a minor, Marina Ysaac, Marina Ysaac Jr. and D. E. F.
Defendant: City of Los Angeles, DOES 1-50, Inclusive, and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv06686
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING D.E.F. STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue #11 . (Scheduling Conference continued to 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re Stipulation to Continue #11 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Order)(Furman, Joel)
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Continue #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 First STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 20, 2021 to December 30, 2021 filed by Plaintiff D. E. F.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Furman, Joel)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.(Bojorquez, Christian)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES City of Los Angeles, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on August 24, 2021. (Bojorquez, Christian)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/23/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car)
August 18, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants City of Los Angeles, Does 1-50, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs D. E. F., Marina Ysaac Jr., Marina Ysaac. Filed in State Court on 6/9/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles, (Bojorquez, Christian)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Bojorquez, Christian)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV21622 Receipt No: ACACDC-31830574 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court - Plaintiff's Complaint - redacted, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court - Summons - redacted, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet - redacted, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location - redacted, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court - Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case - NO redactions, #6 Exhibit 6 - State Court - Standing Order re Personal Injury Procedures, Central District - NO redactions, #7 Exhibit 7 - State Court - Certficate of Mailing - redacted, #8 Exhibit 8 - Summons on City of Los Angeles - redacted) (Attorney Christian R Bojorquez added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Bojorquez, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.E.F. et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.E.F., a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Ysaac
Represented By: Joel Micah Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Ysaac Jr.
Represented By: Joel Micah Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. E. F.
Represented By: Joel Micah Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Christian R Bojorquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50, Inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?