Bobbie Smith v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bobbie Smith
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Glendale Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ellis Family Stores and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv06948
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
2 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2022 Filing 56 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $0.00 in favor of Bobbie Smith and against FCA US LLC Glendale Dodge. See CM/ECF Document #54 re Stipulation RE:APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs #48 (rmo)
July 26, 2022 Filing 55 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason Patrick Clark counsel for Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. Jason Patrick Clark is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. (Clark, Jason)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO RESOLVE COSTS AND EXPENSES & REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT #50 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The court has considered the parties Joint Stipulation to Resolve Costs and Expenses, and hereby enters judgment in the amount of $40,000, payable to Plaintiffs counsel, Strategic Legal Practices, APC., within 60 days. IT IS SO ORDERED (rolm)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING NOTICE-IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff #46 - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing previously scheduled for 06/27/2022 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 23, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation for Attorney Fees #50 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clark, Jason)
June 22, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Attorney Fees #50 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Missing formal proposed order which should have been submitted as a separate attachment to the stipulation. Other error(s) with document(s): As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as a Separate Attachment thereto. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
June 21, 2022 Filing 50 Joint STIPULATION for Attorney Fees in the amount of $$40,000 filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith.(Dolin, Tionna)
June 7, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #45 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 6, 2022 Filing 48 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant FCA US LLC filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jason Clark in Support of Plaintiff's Application for the Bill of Costs) (Clark, Jason)
June 6, 2022 Filing 47 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #46 filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. (Clark, Jason)
June 6, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiff Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jason Clark in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses, #3 Declaration Declaration of Payam Shahian in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses) (Clark, Jason)
June 6, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jason Patrick Clark on behalf of Plaintiff Bobbie Smith (Attorney Jason Patrick Clark added to party Bobbie Smith(pty:pla))(Clark, Jason)
May 26, 2022 Filing 44 JUDGMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $71,500.00 against Defendant FCA US LLC, as set out in the Fed. R. Civ. P. 68 Offer. Related to: REQUEST for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) #43 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (bm)
May 18, 2022 Filing 43 REQUEST for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT) (Attorney Eliana Amirian added to party Bobbie Smith(pty:pla)) (Amirian, Eliana)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The pretrial conference and trial dates are vacated because the parties have indicated this case has settled. The parties shall file their notice of settlement by May 18, 2022, and any and all dismissal paperwork by June 18, 2022. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 11, 2022 Filing 41 REQUEST for Leave of Daniel Law to Appear for Remote Appearance at the May 18, 2022 Pretrial Conference Hearing filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. Request set for hearing on 5/18/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Remote Appearance at the May 18, 2022 Pretrial Conference, #2 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Remote Appearance at the May 18, 2022 Pretrial Conference Hearing) (Law, Daniel)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings #21 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's implied warranty claim is not time-barred and therefore is not dismissed. However, Plaintiff's fraud claim is barred by the economic loss rule and is dismissed. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
January 29, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FEBRUARY 14, 2022 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND FEBRUARY 22, 2022 TRIAL by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Continue, #33 . The hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled: (Jury Trial reset for 5/24/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Pretrial Conference reset for 5/18/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.) (mrgo)
January 7, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Continue, #33 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to Continue February 14, 2022 Pretrial Conference and February 22, 2022 Trial)(Law, Daniel)
January 6, 2022 Filing 36 REQUEST for Leave of Tionna Dolin to Appear for Remote filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. Request set for hearing on 1/10/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Law, Daniel)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING NOTICE - IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Dismissing Count V and VI of the Complaint filed by Defendant #21 - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing scheduled for 1/10/2022 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 5, 2022 Filing 34 REQUEST to Grant Leave of M. Skanes to Appear Remotely filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Skanes in Support of Defendant's Request for Remote Appearance, #2 Proposed Order for Defendant's Request for Remote Appearance) (Skanes, Mark)
December 30, 2021 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial Conference and Trial from February 14, 2022 and February 22, 2022 to 120 days filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to Continue February 14, 2022 Pretrial Conference and February 22, 2022 Trial)(Dolin, Tionna)
December 27, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Dismissing Count V and VI of the Complaint #21 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Skanes, Mark)
December 20, 2021 Filing 31 Opposition In Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Dismissing Count V and VI of the Complaint #21 filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 20, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 15, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff (Dolin, Tionna)
November 29, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine J Haw on behalf of Plaintiff Bobbie Smith (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Bobbie Smith(pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
November 29, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo on behalf of Plaintiff Bobbie Smith (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Bobbie Smith(pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND #17 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: denying #17 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court. Defendant has adequately met its burden to show that the amount in controversy is satisfied herein. For these reasons, Plaintiff's motion is DENIED. (See minute order for details) (mrgo)
November 11, 2021 Filing 25 Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Dismissing Count V and VI of the Complaint #21 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of FCA US LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Skanes, Mark)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING NOTICE - IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Remand Case to of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiff #17 - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 10, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Dismissing Count V and VI of the Complaint #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Local Rule 11-8 Memorandum/brief exceeding 10 pages shall contain table of contents. Other error(s) with document(s): Docket Entry No. 21 is a Memorandum instead of the Motion. Docket Entry No. 22 is the Motion, but the wrong event was used. Correct event for the Motion is: Motions and Related Filings > Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions, etc. > Judgment on the Pleadings. Correct event for Memorandum is: Motions and Related Filings > Responses/Replies, etc. > Memorandum in Support of Motion. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
November 9, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Defendant FCA US LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
November 9, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Dismissing Count V and VI of the Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Skanes in Support of Defendant FCA US LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Proposed Order for FCA US LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) (Skanes, Mark)
November 1, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #17 filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. (Law, Daniel)
October 25, 2021 Filing 19 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #17 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
October 15, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #17 filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. (Law, Daniel)
October 15, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. Motion set for hearing on 11/15/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Law, Daniel)
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiff Bobbie Smith (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Bobbie Smith(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - The initial status conference previously scheduled for 10/18/2021 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. Jury trial is set for 02/22/2022 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference on 02/14/2022 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Status Conference set for 10/18/2021 03:00 PM. See order for complete details. (jre)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NEW CASE ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (jre)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-06948 SVW(JCx). (rn)
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #4 served on August 27, 2021. (Skanes, Mark)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Jonathan T. Martinez as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Michael J. Gregg as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Mark W. Skanes as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA North America Holdings LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.). (Skanes, Mark)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21GDCV00546 Receipt No: ACACDC-31889266 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Skanes in Support of FCA US LLC's Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Attorney Mark W Skanes added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Skanes, Mark)
August 27, 2021 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants FCA US LLC, Glendale Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ellis Family Stores., Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Bobbie Smith. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/21/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobbie Smith v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Smith
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Represented By: Michael J Gregg
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendale Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ellis Family Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?