Dyllon MacDougall et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Dyllon MacDougall and Natosha Yost
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv07082
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (jtil)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 61 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 09/02/2021 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:21-cv-11478 from USDC Eastern District of Michigan, Detroit. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814 AB (PVCx). (jtil)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Michigan Eastern
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Transfer to the Central District of California for MDL 2814 (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-61) to Central District of California for MDL # 2814. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-61) for MDL # 2814. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (Joint Rule 26 Report due 9/27/21) (LSau) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ford Motor Company (Porter, Tracey) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (Porter, Tracey) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Ford Motor Company* (TTho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8512587 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Chester, Anthony) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyllon MacDougall et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyllon MacDougall
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natosha Yost
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Tracey L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?