In re in the matter of the Complaint of Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Plaintiff: Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Respondent: Angela Toledo Marin, Karen America Toledo Olivera, Kimberly Toledo Olivera and Sergio Martinez Valdez
In Re: the matter of the Complaint of Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Case Number: 2:2021cv07098
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #13 by claimants ANGELA TOLEDO MARIN, individually and asExecutor of the Estate of MARIO TOLEDO GARCIA; KAREN AMERICATOLEDO OLIVERA; KIMBERLY TOLEDO OLIVERA; and SERGIO MARTINEZVALDEZ. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Claim. Filer failed to add attorneys of record to all the claimants. Clerk has added attorneys of record on this case. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
October 27, 2021 Filing 13 CLAIMANTS CLAIMS PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL ADMIRALTY RULE F(4) re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #10 (Khashayar, Daryoosh)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPROVING SECURITY AND AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR VALUE AND COSTS #9 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That the Stipulation Regarding Security for Value and Costs of the FARLEY MOWAT, and the proposed Letter of Undertaking are approved, and the executed copy filed with this Court as Dkt. 9-1 shall be deemed to be security approved by this Court in accordance with Rule F(1) of the Supplemental Admiralty Rules. That since the owner of the FARLEY MOWAT has complied with Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(1), and therefore, 'all claims and proceedings against the owner or the owner's property with respect to the matter in question shall cease' in accordance with Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(3) and 46 U.S.C. 30511(c). (lom)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENIED AS MOOT RE AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR VALUE AND COSTS #7 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lom)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER In Chambers by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. On September 23, 2021, Plaintiff in Limitation filed an application for approval of a security and ad interim stipulation for value and costs (Appl., ECF No. 9), satisfying its obligations under Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(1). Accordingly, pursuant to Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(4), all persons asserting claims with respect to which the Complaint (ECF No. 1) seeks limitation, are admonished to file their respective claims with the Court and to serve on the attorneys for the Plaintiff a copy thereof on or before October 27, 2021. (lom)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Order for approval of security and ad interim stipulation for value and costs filed by Plaintiff in Limitation Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Understanding, #2 Proposed Order) (Schultz, Pamela)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-02553 ODW(KSx). Case transferred from Judge Virginia A. Phillips to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07098 ODW(KSx). Signed by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (rn)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for Order for Approval of Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Costs filed by Plaintiff in Limitation Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Schultz, Pamela)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Conservation Society (Schultz, Pamela)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Schultz, Pamela)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31921831 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff in Limitation Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trenkle Declaration) (Attorney Pamela L Schultz added to party Sea Shepherd Conservation Society(pty:pla))(Schultz, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re in the matter of the Complaint of Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Represented By: Pamela L Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: the matter of the Complaint of Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Angela Toledo Marin
Represented By: Ashkan Aminpour
Represented By: Chelsea Grover
Represented By: Daryoosh Khashayar
Represented By: Michael Anthony VanGalio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Karen America Toledo Olivera
Represented By: Ashkan Aminpour
Represented By: Chelsea Grover
Represented By: Daryoosh Khashayar
Represented By: Michael Anthony VanGalio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kimberly Toledo Olivera
Represented By: Ashkan Aminpour
Represented By: Chelsea Grover
Represented By: Daryoosh Khashayar
Represented By: Michael Anthony VanGalio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sergio Martinez Valdez
Represented By: Ashkan Aminpour
Represented By: Chelsea Grover
Represented By: Daryoosh Khashayar
Represented By: Michael Anthony VanGalio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?