Maria Elena Anaya v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Anaya
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv07255
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Filing 38 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric)
July 25, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gurpreet Sandhu on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Gurpreet Sandhu added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Sandhu, Gurpreet)
July 25, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Lambert, Sarah)
July 25, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric D Sentlinger on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Eric D Sentlinger added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Sentlinger, Eric)
July 25, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #32 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of FCA US LLC to substitute Spencer Hugret as attorney of record instead of Brian Hom is GRANTED. (iv)
July 20, 2022 Filing 32 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Spencer P. Hugret in place of attorney Briam M. Hom filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order G-01 Order) (Hom, Brian)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Notice of Appearance #28 , for the following reasons: Docket text and document conflict re: party name. (iv)
June 15, 2022 Filing 31 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 21STCV15168, acknowledged on 6/6/2022. (iv)
June 15, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict re: party name. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 14, 2022 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 1, 2022 Filing 27 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #18 is granted. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
April 26, 2022 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Maria Elena Anaya for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Maria Elena Anaya(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
January 28, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 14, 2022 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Remand Case #18 currently set for hearing on January 20, 2022, is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. Order to issue. The Request for Remote Appearance #22 is denied as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 14, 2022 Filing 22 REQUEST for Leave of Karin Kuemerle to Appear for Remote Appearance filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. Request set for hearing on 1/20/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karin Kuemerle in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Remote Appearance at the January 20, 2022 Hearing for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Remote Appearance at the January 20, 2022 Hearing for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Kuemerle, Karin)
January 6, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #18 filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objection to Frazier Declaration)(Law, Daniel)
December 30, 2021 Filing 20 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #18 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Frazier, Candace)
December 20, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #18 filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. (Kuemerle, Karin)
December 20, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. Motion set for hearing on 1/20/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Karin Kuemerle in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Kuemerle, Karin)
December 20, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Maria Elena Anaya for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Maria Elena Anaya(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
December 18, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for November 18, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on Tuesday, December 6, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. (iv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 - 4 Days, filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya.. (Law, Daniel)
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. Adding SIMI PETERSON as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Maria Elena Anaya(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 STATEMENT Declination to Proceed Before Magistrate filed by Defendant FCA US LLC (Haddad, Georges)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/18/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
September 9, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Maria Elena Anaya. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya. Filed in State Court on 4/21/21 Submitted with Declaration of Candace Frazier #4 (car)
September 9, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Maria Elena Anaya pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. Filed in State Court on 8/11/2021 Submitted with Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Candace Frazier #4 (car) (car)
September 9, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. Filed in State Court on 6/22/2021 Submitted with Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Candace Frazier #4 (car)(Attorney Candace Jin Frazier added to party Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram(pty:dft), Attorney Penelope M Deihl added to party Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram(pty:dft))(car)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant FCA US LLC identifying FCA US LLC as Corporate Parent. (Haddad, Georges)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Candace Frazier filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Haddad, Georges)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of James Sheridan filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Haddad, Georges)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Haddad, Georges)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Los Angeles-Stanley Mosk Courthouse, case number 21STCV15168 Receipt No: ACACDC-31956530 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Georges Andrew Haddad added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Haddad, Georges)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Elena Anaya v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Anaya
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Simi Peterson
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Georges Andrew Haddad
Represented By: Brian Ming Hom
Represented By: Candace Jin Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
Represented By: Candace Jin Frazier
Represented By: Penelope M Deihl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?