Michael J. Holmes v. Barbara Ann Jackson
Plaintiff: Michael J. Holmes
Defendant: Barbara Ann Jackson
Case Number: 2:2021cv07329
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michael J. Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Order) (car)
November 5, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Michael J. Holmes. Appeal of Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #8 Filed On: 9/16/2021; Entered On: 09/16/2021; IFP Pending. (car)
November 1, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Vexatious Litigant Filing (CV-115) 21 . No image was attached to this entry due to a system error. This item was re-docketed as ECF No. 22. (mrgo)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 11/1/2021, SEE ECF No. 29] ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo) Modified on 11/1/2021 (mrgo).
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Percy Anderson, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (mrgo)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 VEXATIOUS LITIGANT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson, re Response #9 . For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes that Michael J. Holmes is a vexatious litigant. The Clerk of this Court is ordered not to accept for filing any Complaint or other initiating document submitted by Michael J. Holmes against a federal or state judicial officer or attorney located in California without Holmes first filing a Motion for Leave to File a Complaint and a Judge of this Court having granted Holmes leave to file such a Complaint or other initiating document. (SEE ATTACHED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo)
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 SHOW CAUSE WHY THE PLAINTIFF SHOULD NOT BE DECLARED A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT filed by Plaintiff Michael J. Holmes to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines, #8 . (mrgo)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause why he should not be declared a vexatious litigant and be prevented from commencing any new action in the Central District of California against a federal or state judicial officer or attorney located in California without first filing a Motion for Leave to File a Complaint and a Judge of this Court grants leave for Plaintiff to file such a Complaint. Plaintiff's response to this order to show cause shall be filed by no later than October 4, 2021. Failure to file a timely or adequate response by that date may result in Plaintiff being declared a vexatious litigant and subjected to the pre-filing order described above without further warning. (mrgo)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. (mrgo) Modified on 9/16/2021 (mrgo).
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Michael J. Holmes. (lh)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael J. Holmes, (lh)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Barbara Ann Jackson. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Michael J. Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Request) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael J. Holmes v. Barbara Ann Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ann Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?