Division of Labor Standards Enforcement v. Save Mart Supermarkets et al
Plaintiff: Division of Labor Standards Enforcement
Defendant: Save Mart Supermarkets, The Save Mart Companies, Inc. and DOES 1-50,
Case Number: 2:2021cv07402
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 21 The hearing on the MOTION TO COMPEL #13 ; and MOTION TO REMAND #15 , scheduled for November 15, 2021 at 1:30 P.M., are hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matters stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 1, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #13 filed by Defendants Save Mart Supermarkets, The Save Mart Companies, Inc.. (Beckwith, Amanda)
November 1, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Barbara Superior Court #15 Reply to opposition filed by Plaintiff Division of Labor Standards Enforcement. (Otani, Kay)
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Barbara Superior Court #15 filed by Defendants Save Mart Supermarkets, The Save Mart Companies, Inc.. (Beckwith, Amanda)
October 25, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #13 Opposition filed by Plaintiff Division of Labor Standards Enforcement. (Otani, Kay)
October 18, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants Save Mart Supermarkets and The Save Mart Companies, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #13 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Save Mart Supermarkets and The Save Mart Companies, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration)(Beckwith, Amanda)
October 18, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Barbara Superior Court filed by plaintiff Division of Labor Standards Enforcement. Motion set for hearing on 11/15/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Otani, Kay)
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #13 filed by Defendants Save Mart Supermarkets, The Save Mart Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C part 1, #4 Exhibit C part 2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Beckwith, Amanda)
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Save Mart Supermarkets, The Save Mart Companies, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/15/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Beckwith, Amanda)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On September 21, 2021, the parties filed a Joint Stipulation to extend the time for Defendant to file a responsive pleading by not more than 30 days, purportedly pursuant to LocalRule 8-3 #11 . It is not clear whether Local Rule 8-3 is applicable when, as here, the defendant removed the case nearly a month after the plaintiff served the Complaint with a state court summons and the parties filed their stipulation a week after removal. Therefore, to the extent a Court order is required, the Court GRANTS the parties' stipulation. Defendants shall respond to theComplaint by October 22, 2021. (lc)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Save Mart Companies, Inc. answer now due 10/22/2021; Save Mart Supermarkets answer now due 10/22/2021, filed by Defendants The Save Mart Companies, Inc.; Save Mart Supermarkets.(Attorney Brooke Sikora Purcell added to party Save Mart Supermarkets(pty:dft), Attorney Brooke Sikora Purcell added to party The Save Mart Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Purcell, Brooke)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Save Mart Supermarkets, The Save Mart Companies, Inc., re Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #8 Amended Certificate of Service served on 9/17/2021. (Beckwith, Amanda)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. See minute order for details. (lom)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Save Mart Supermarkets, The Save Mart Companies, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 09/16/2021. (Beckwith, Amanda)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
September 15, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Division of Labor Standards Enforcement in Santa Barbara Superior Court on 7/30/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Save Mart Supermarkets, The Save Mart Companies, Inc. (Beckwith, Amanda)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Save Mart Supermarkets, The Save Mart Companies, Inc.. (Beckwith, Amanda)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Barbara, case number 21CV03151 Receipt No: ACACDC-31990849 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant The Save Mart Companies, Inc., Save Mart Supermarkets. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Amanda E Beckwith added to party Save Mart Supermarkets(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda E Beckwith added to party The Save Mart Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Beckwith, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Division of Labor Standards Enforcement v. Save Mart Supermarkets et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Division of Labor Standards Enforcement
Represented By: Kay K Otani
Represented By: David Maxim Balter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save Mart Supermarkets
Represented By: Amanda E Beckwith
Represented By: Brooke Sikora Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Save Mart Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda E Beckwith
Represented By: Brooke Sikora Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?