Board of Directors of The Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan v. Tiger Rising, LLC
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of The Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan, Board of Directors of The Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan and Board of Directors of The Motion Pictures Industry Health Plan
Defendant: Tiger Rising, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv07459
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Tiger Rising, LLC. (jp)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Tiger Rising, LLC filed by Plaintiff Board of Directors of The Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan, Board of Directors of The Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan, Board of Directors of The Motion Pictures Industry Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kathryn J. Halford) (Halford, Kathryn)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Board of Directors of The Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan, Board of Directors of The Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan, Board of Directors of The Motion Pictures Industry Health Plan, upon Defendant Tiger Rising, LLC served on 10/9/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Allen Langley Cheney, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Halford, Kathryn)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (ghap)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Tiger Rising, LLC. (ghap)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN, (Levy, Harrison)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN. (Levy, Harrison)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN. (Levy, Harrison)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Harrison A. Levy added to party BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN(pty:pla))(Levy, Harrison)
September 17, 2021 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-32005231 for $402 filing fee. (Levy, Harrison)
September 17, 2021 (Levy, Harrison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Directors of The Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan v. Tiger Rising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of The Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan
Represented By: Harrison A. Levy
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Represented By: Harrison A Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of The Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan
Represented By: Harrison A. Levy
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Represented By: Harrison A Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of The Motion Pictures Industry Health Plan
Represented By: Harrison A. Levy
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Represented By: Harrison A Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Rising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?