Bedros Balian et al v. First National Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Bedros Balian and Hilda Jimenez
Defendant: First National Insurance Company of America, Does 1-50, Doe, Mainstream Insurance Services LLC and Does 2-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv07523
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #16 by Judge John F. Walter. The request of First National Insurance Company of America to substitute Nicholas J. Boos as attorney of record instead of Rina Carmel and David J. Billings is GRANTED. (iv)
November 4, 2021 Filing 16 Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Defendant First National Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carmel, Rina)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2022 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 9/9/2022 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 9/20/2022 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on October 25, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: May 2, 2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: May 6, 2022. (iv)
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant First National Insurance Company of America.. (Carmel, Rina)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) filed by Defendant First National Insurance Company of America.(Carmel, Rina)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Rina Carmel re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 filed by Defendant First National Insurance Company of America. (Carmel, Rina)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for October 25, 2021 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before October 12, 2021. (iv)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 50, inclusive.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant First National Insurance Company of America, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 09-21-2021. (Carmel, Rina)
September 20, 2021 NON CONFORM COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Safeco Insurance, A Liberty Mutual Company, Does 1-50, inclusive, Mainstream Insurance Services LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiffs Bedros Balian, Hilda Jimenez. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C PAGE 30)(ghap)
September 20, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Safeco Insurance, A Liberty Mutual Company, Mainstream Insurance Services LLC, Does 1 through 50, Inclusive, filed by plaintiffs Bedros Balian, Hilda Jimenez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/19/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A PAGE 11) (ghap)
September 20, 2021 NON CONFORMED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, First National Insurance Company of America amending Amended Complaint,, filed by plaintiffs Bedros Balian, Hilda Jimenez. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT F PAGE 49)(ghap)
September 20, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT amending Complaint - (Discovery), plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be First National Insurance Company of America, filed by plaintiffs Bedros Balian, Hilda Jimenez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/19/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT D PAGE 45) (ghap)
September 20, 2021 NON CONFORM COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Mainstream Insurance Services LLC Without prejudice, filed by plaintiffs Bedros Balian, Hilda Jimenez. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT G PAGE 89) (ghap)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant First National Insurance Company of America, identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc.; LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc.; Liberty Mutual Group Inc.; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc.; Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation; Safeco Corporation; Safeco Insurance Company of America; Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Carmel, Rina)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant First National Insurance Company of America. (Carmel, Rina)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV02120 Receipt No: ACACDC-32013199 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant First National Insurance Company of America. (Attorney Rina Carmel added to party First National Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Carmel, Rina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedros Balian et al v. First National Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bedros Balian
Represented By: Levon Zartarian
Represented By: Jeffrey V Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Jimenez
Represented By: Levon Zartarian
Represented By: Jeffrey V Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Rina Carmel
Represented By: David J Billings
Represented By: Nicholas J Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Represented By: Rina Carmel
Represented By: David J Billings
Represented By: Nicholas J Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainstream Insurance Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?