Securities and Exchange Commission v. VerdeGroup Investment Partners, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: VerdeGroup Investment Partners, Inc., Thomas Gaffney, Lisa Gordon, Tommy's Pizza Ventures, Inc., Cynthia Gaffney and Tommys Pizza Ventures, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv07663
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE [In Chambers] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing by not later than December 10, 2021 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The court will consider the filing of the following as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause, on or before the above date: the filing of a motion for entry of default judgment; Failure to respond to the court's order shall result in the dismissal of this action. The Court VACATES the Order to Show Cause, Dkt. No. 16, filed 11/03/2021. See order for more information. (shb)
November 17, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commissionto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #16 (Sew Hoy, Michael)
November 9, 2021 Filing 23 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to VerdeGroup Investment Partners, Inc., Thomas Gaffney, Lisa Gordon, Tommys Pizza Ventures, Inc., Relief Defendant, Cynthia Gaffney, Relief Defendant (bm)
November 8, 2021 Filing 22 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants/Relief Defendants Cynthia Gaffney, Thomas Gaffney, Lisa Gordon, Tommys Pizza Ventures, Inc., VerdeGroup Investment Partners, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Sew Hoy) (Sew Hoy, Michael)
November 4, 2021 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Relief Defendant Cynthia Gaffney Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Thomas Gaffney, co-resident/spouse of Cynthia Gaffney, at the usual place of abode of Ms. Gaffney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
November 4, 2021 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Relief Defendant Tommy's Pizza Ventures, Inc. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Thomas Gaffney, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
November 4, 2021 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Lisa Gordon Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, someone of suitable age and discretion who resides at Ms. Gordon's dwelling or usual place of abode in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
November 4, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cynthia Gaffney, Managing Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
November 4, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Thomas Gaffney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER [In Chambers]: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing by not later then November 17, 2021, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The court will consider the filing of the following as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause, on or before the above date: Answer by the Defendant(s) or Plaintiffs request for entry of default. See attached minute order for details. (lom)
October 28, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Request for Clerk to Enter Default Against Defendants VerdeGroup Investment Partners, Inc., Thomas Gaffney, Lisa Gordon, and Relief Defendants Tommy's Pizza Ventures, Inc. and Cynthia Gaffney #14 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. The proofs of service have redacted service addresses. A full address is required before the clerk can enter Default. Re-file the Proof of Service reflecting the full address of the place of service. The statute under which service was made is not indicated. As to Lisa Gordon, substituted service was made with a subsequent mail service on 10/6/2021; lacking due diligence; and the request is untimely. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (gk)
October 27, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants and Relief Defendants All Defendants filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Sew Hoy) (Sew Hoy, Michael)
October 14, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Lisa Gordon served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, co-resident/co-occupant of Lisa Gordon in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant VerdeGroup Investment Partners, Inc. served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cynthia Gaffney, Managing Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Relief Defendant Cynthia Gaffney served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Thomas Gaffney, co-resident and spouse of Cynthia Gaffney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Relief Defendant Tommys Pizza Ventures, Inc. served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Thomas Gaffney, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Thomas Gaffney served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Thomas Gaffney, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Cynthia Gaffney, Thomas Gaffney, Lisa Gordon, Tommys Pizza Ventures, Inc., VerdeGroup Investment Partners, Inc. (ghap)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Michael Raymond Sew Hoy added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Sew Hoy, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. VerdeGroup Investment Partners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Michael Raymond Sew Hoy
Represented By: Jacob A Regenstreif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VerdeGroup Investment Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy's Pizza Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommys Pizza Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?