Securities and Exchange Commission v. Punch TV Studios Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Punch TV Studios Inc. and Joseph Collins
Case Number: 2:2021cv07787
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
2 Judge: Alka Sagar
3 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Punch TV Studios Inc. answer now due 12/1/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by DEFENDANT Punch TV Studios Inc..(Rahmati, Lahdan)
November 18, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lahdan S. Rahmati counsel for Defendants Joseph Collins, Punch TV Studios Inc.. Adding Lahdan S. Rahmati as counsel of record for Punch TV Studios, Inc., and Joseph Collins for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Punch TV Studios, Inc., and Joseph Collins. (Attorney Lahdan S. Rahmati added to party Joseph Collins(pty:dft), Attorney Lahdan S. Rahmati added to party Punch TV Studios Inc.(pty:dft))(Rahmati, Lahdan)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, re Proof of Service (subsequent documents),, #10 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents),, #11 served on 10/18/2021 and 10/27/2021. (Longo, Amy)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #5 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34), #8 , Summons Request #6 , Summons Issued #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #3 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on 10/27/2021. (Longo, Amy)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #5 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34), #8 , Summons Request #6 , Summons Issued #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #3 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on 10/18/2021. (Longo, Amy)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-00654 AB(ASx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07787 AB(ASx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (rn)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Joseph Collins, Punch TV Studios Inc. (iv)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by PLAINTIFF Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by PLAINTIFF Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Amy J. Longo added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Longo, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Punch TV Studios Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Lucee S Kirka
Represented By: Amy J. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Punch TV Studios Inc.
Represented By: Lahdan S Rahmati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Collins
Represented By: Lahdan S Rahmati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?