Estate of Katie Beatrice Landrum et al v. WDW Joint Venture et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Katie Beatrice Landrum, by and through its Successors-in-Interest Maurice Landrum, Jr., Kathy Johnson, Bridgrette Johnson, and Michelle Miller, Maurice Landrum, Jr., Kathy Johnson, Bridgrette Johnson, Estate of Katie Beatrice Landrum and Michelle Miller
Defendant: WDW Joint Venture, a California entity dba Downey Community Health Center, James Landrum, DOES 1 through 100, inclusive and WDW Joint Venture a California Entity doing business as Downey Community Health Center
Case Number: 2:2021cv07809
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST to Stay Order on Motion to Dismiss Case #16 (Defendants' Request for Automatic 30-Day Stay of Enforcement of Court's November 22, 2021 Order to Remand) filed by Defendant WDW Joint Venture. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Proposed Order (Re Defendant's Request for Automatic Stay)) (Kanno, Rita)
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case Number: 21STCV31088. (jp)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING as Moot Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #7 ) and REMANDING Case to State Court. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) See Order for specifics. (jp)
November 15, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint) #7 filed by Defendant WDW Joint Venture. (Kanno, Rita)
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint) #7 filed by Plaintiff Estate of Katie Beatrice Landrum. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Carr, Scott)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The Court on its own motion, continues the hearing on Defendant WDW Joint Venture's Motion to Dismiss Case (ECF No. #7 ) to November 29, 2021 at 1:30 p.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (jgr)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to the calendar of Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-07809 DSF(AGRx). (rn)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint) #7 filed by Defendant WDW Joint Venture. (Kanno, Rita)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Rita R. Kanno in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint) #7 filed by Defendant WDW Joint Venture. (Kanno, Rita)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed by Defendant WDW Joint Venture. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)) (Kanno, Rita)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
September 30, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, James Landrum, WDW Joint Venture. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Bridgrette Johnson, Estate of Katie Beatrice Landrum, Kathy Johnson, Maurice Landrum, Jr., Michelle Miller. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/23/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Action) filed by Defendant WDW Joint Venture, a California entity dba Downey Community Health Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34)(Kanno, Rita)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE (Defendant's Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court) filed by Defendant WDW Joint Venture, a California entity dba Downey Community Health Center. (Kanno, Rita)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant WDW Joint Venture, a California entity dba Downey Community Health Center, (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service Re Certificate of Interested Parties)(Kanno, Rita)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant WDW Joint Venture, a California entity dba Downey Community Health Center. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service Re Civil Cover Sheet)(Kanno, Rita)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV31088 Receipt No: ACACDC-32079426 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant WDW Joint Venture, a California entity dba Downey Community Health Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents) (Attorney Rita Rebecca Kanno added to party WDW Joint Venture, a California entity dba Downey Community Health Center(pty:dft))(Kanno, Rita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Katie Beatrice Landrum et al v. WDW Joint Venture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Katie Beatrice Landrum, by and through its Successors-in-Interest Maurice Landrum, Jr., Kathy Johnson, Bridgrette Johnson, and Michelle Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Landrum, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron Louis Osten
Represented By: Scott H Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Johnson
Represented By: Aaron Louis Osten
Represented By: Scott H Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgrette Johnson
Represented By: Aaron Louis Osten
Represented By: Scott H Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Katie Beatrice Landrum
Represented By: Aaron Louis Osten
Represented By: Scott H Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Miller
Represented By: Aaron Louis Osten
Represented By: Scott H Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WDW Joint Venture, a California entity dba Downey Community Health Center
Represented By: Rita Rebecca Kanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WDW Joint Venture a California Entity doing business as Downey Community Health Center
Represented By: Rita Rebecca Kanno
Represented By: Lann Gottesman McIntyre
Represented By: Rima M Badawiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?