Timothy Murphy v. Viad Corporation
Plaintiff: Timothy Patrick Murphy
Defendant: Viad Corporation, The Dial Corp., Greyhound Dial Corporation, Greyhound Corporation, Armour and Company and Baldwin-Lima-Hamilton Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv07839
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. See Order for details. (cch)
October 8, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Scott S. Holmes on behalf of Defendant Viad Corporation. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
October 8, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Peter B Langbord counsel for Defendant Viad Corporation. Adding Peter Bennett Langbord as counsel of record for Viad Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Viad Corporation. (Attorney Peter B Langbord added to party Viad Corporation(pty:dft))(Langbord, Peter)
October 6, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Scott S. Holmes. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 21 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:21-cv-10897-RHC-APP, from U.S. District Court Eastern District of Michigan (Port Huron). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:21-cv-07839 - VAP (MARx). (lh)
October 5, 2021 Filing 17 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Michigan Eastern
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part #12 Moiton to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and transferring case to the Central District of California. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
September 24, 2021 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 9/29/21 is Cancelled re #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response re #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Viad Corporation. (Holmes, Scott) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Timothy Patrick Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8) (RLou) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING on #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
July 29, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Notice of Hearing on Motion on Timothy Patrick Murphy at 41640 White Tail Lane, Canton, MI 48188. (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Viad Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Holmes, Scott) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER terminating without prejudice #6 Motion to Dismiss and Defendant's Response to the Amended Complaint is due by 7/29/2021. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
July 9, 2021 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 9/8/2021 is Cancelled re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative For Failure To State A Claim And Memorandum Of Law (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
July 9, 2021 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled, #11 Order on Motion to Dismiss on Timothy Patrick Murphy at 41640 White Tail Lane, Canton, MI 48188. (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Defendant Viad Corp's #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative For Failure To State A Claim, filed by Timothy Patrick Murphy. (RLou) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand filed by Timothy Patrick Murphy against Viad Corporation. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING on #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative For Failure To State A Claim And Memorandum Of Law. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative For Failure To State A Claim And Memorandum Of Law by Viad Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of J. Massimino, #3 Exhibit B - Unpublished Cases) (Holmes, Scott) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Viad Corporation (Holmes, Scott) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S. Holmes on behalf of Viad Corporation. (Holmes, Scott) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Viad Corporation* (JOwe) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
April 26, 2021 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 402.00 by Timothy Patrick Murphy - Receipt No. DET135443 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Timothy Patrick Murphy against Viad Corporation (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Deficiency directed to Timothy Patrick Murphy: Initiating document filed without any form of payment or Application for In Forma Pauperis. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/5/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timothy Murphy v. Viad Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Represented By: Peter B Langbord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dial Corp.
Represented By: Peter B Langbord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Dial Corporation
Represented By: Peter B Langbord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Corporation
Represented By: Peter B Langbord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armour and Company
Represented By: Peter B Langbord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldwin-Lima-Hamilton Corporation
Represented By: Peter B Langbord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?