Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P. v. V.I.P. Marketing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P.
Defendant: V.I.P. Marketing, Inc., Christopher Martin, Jesse Martin and Martin Produce, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv07949
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P., upon Defendant Martin Produce, Inc. served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe (Office Clerk) - designated by law to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Amendola, Mark)
November 15, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P., upon Defendant Jesse Martin served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe (Office Clerk) authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons returned. (Amendola, Mark)
November 15, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P., upon Defendant Christopher Martin served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe (Office Clerk)-authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons returned. (Amendola, Mark)
November 15, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P., upon Defendant V.I.P. Marketing, Inc. served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe-designated by law to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Amendola, Mark)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Mark A. Amendola APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Phillips Mushroom Farms, LP., designating Robert D Lipscomb as local counsel. (lom)
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark A. Amendola to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32200241) filed by plaintiff Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Courts where applicant is admitted, #2 Proposed Order Proposed order on application) (Lipscomb, Robert)
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Robert Lipscomb as lead trial counsel filed by Plaintiff Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P.. (Lipscomb, Robert)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter (et)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Docket Entry No. 9 was inadvertently docketed without attachments. Please disregard Docket Entry No. 9 and refer to Docket Entry No. 10. Re: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 9 (lh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Christopher Martin, Jesse Martin, Martin Produce, Inc., V.I.P. Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant Christopher Martin, #2 Summons as to Defendant Jesse Martin, #3 Summons as to Defendant Martin Produce, Inc.) (lh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Christopher Martin, Jesse Martin, Martin Produce, Inc., V.I.P. Marketing, Inc. (lh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Lipscomb, Robert)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P., identifying Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P.; V.I.P. Marketing, Inc.; Martin Produce, Inc.; Christopher Martin; Jesse Martin; Robert Lipscomb; Martyn and Associates, LPA. (Lipscomb, Robert)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Lipscomb, Robert)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P.. (Lipscomb, Robert)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32103452 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Account) (Attorney Robert D Lipscomb added to party Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P.(pty:pla))(Lipscomb, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P. v. V.I.P. Marketing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillips Mushroom Farms, L.P.
Represented By: Robert D Lipscomb
Represented By: Mark A. Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V.I.P. Marketing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?