Hector Pacheco v. Ralph Diaz
Petitioner: Hector Pacheco
Respondent: Ralph Diaz
Case Number: 2:2021cv07951
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 . If Plaintiff still wishes to pursue this action, he is granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order within which to file a First Amended Complaint. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Civil Rights Complaint Form, #2 Blank Notice of Dismissal Form) (hr)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $70.66 initial partial filing fee from plaintiff Hector Pacheco on 11/09/2021, receipt number LA230352, re: Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) #10 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dl)
October 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of address Changing pro se address to SATF/B.1.13.2, P.O. Box 5248, Corcoran, CA 93212. Filed by Petitioner Hector Pacheco. (jp)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #6 MOTION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). Further ORDER an Initial Partial Filing Fee of $70.66 to be paid. (see document for further details) (hr)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/1/2021 TRANSFERRING this matter to the USDC for the Central District of California. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/8/2021.]
October 4, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Hector Pacheco. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/8/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Hector Pacheco. (Benson, A.) Modified on 4/22/2021 (Plummer, M). [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/8/2021.] Modified on 10/8/2021 (jtil). Modified on 10/8/2021 (jtil).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/20/2021 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $402.00. The Clerk shall send plaintiff an ifp application. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/8/2021.]
March 22, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order and ifp application served on Hector Pacheco. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/8/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-2508-KJM-DB PC. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/8/2021.]
January 21, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Hector Pacheco. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/8/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/8/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/8/2021.]
December 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Hector Pacheco. (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/8/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Ralph Diaz by Hector Pacheco. (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hector Pacheco v. Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hector Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?