Theophilus Tari Agedah et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Theophilus Tari Agedah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Quacy Thorne, Roney Clavel, Kouassi Kouame, Lucson Appolon, Charles Thomas, Mikhail Shapovalov, Paul White, Randolph Richards, Festus Musa, Fazili Chancelier, Jose Susannah, Henry Giovanni, Jose O. Membreno, Thomas Nganga and Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Seven Unknown Doe, United States, Perry, Chaplain Shoars, Heath Simon, P. Morin, Michael Coles, J. Collins, Oasis, Global Tel Link, Ronnie Sidney and Does I-X inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv07975
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Cormac J Carney
2 Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
3 Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I(hr)
November 5, 2021 Filing 19 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $402.00 from Jose Susannah. Re: Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 . Receipt number LA230223. (dl)
October 20, 2021 Filing 18 RETAILATORY (sic) CONSPIRACY TO VIOLATE CAT BY ATTEMPTS TO DEPRIVE OF CIVIL RIGHT TO PETITION ALIEN TORT ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1350 filed by Plaintiffs Theophilus Tari Agedah, Lucson Appolon, Fazili Chancelier, Roney Clavel, Henry Giovanni, Kouassi Kouame, Jose O. Membreno, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Festus Musa, Thomas Nganga, Randolph Richards, Mikhail Shapovalov, Jose Susannah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Charles Thomas, Quacy Thorne, Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, Paul White. (hr)
October 20, 2021 Filing 17 TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT SUBPEONA DUCES TECUM OF INDISPENSIBLE HIGH PARTIES TO PLAINTIFFS' ACTION filed by Plaintiffs Theophilus Tari Agedah, Lucson Appolon, Fazili Chancelier, Roney Clavel, Henry Giovanni, Kouassi Kouame, Jose O. Membreno, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Festus Musa, Thomas Nganga, Randolph Richards, Mikhail Shapovalov, Jose Susannah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Charles Thomas, Quacy Thorne, Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, Paul White. (hr)
October 20, 2021 Filing 16 TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION TO AMEND PLAINTIFFS TO THE ABOVE-ENTITLED ACTION (and the Motions attached thereto) filed by Plaintiffs Theophilus Tari Agedah, Lucson Appolon, Fazili Chancelier, Roney Clavel, Henry Giovanni, Kouassi Kouame, Jose O. Membreno, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Festus Musa, Thomas Nganga, Randolph Richards, Mikhail Shapovalov, Jose Susannah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Charles Thomas, Quacy Thorne, Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, Paul White. (hr)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 CAT EMERGENCY WRIT OF PROHIBITION filed by Plaintiffs Theophilus Tari Agedah, Lucson Appolon, Fazili Chancelier, Roney Clavel, Henry Giovanni, Kouassi Kouame, Jose O. Membreno, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Festus Musa, Thomas Nganga, Randolph Richards, Seven Unknown Doe, Mikhail Shapovalov, Jose Susannah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Charles Thomas, Quacy Thorne, Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, Paul White. (hr)
October 20, 2021 Filing 14 TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION TO JOIN INDISPENSIBLE HIGH PARTIES filed by Plaintiffs Theophilus Tari Agedah, Lucson Appolon, Fazili Chancelier, Roney Clavel, Henry Giovanni, Kouassi Kouame, Jose O. Membreno, Adhnanu Fahed Miri, Festus Musa, Thomas Nganga, Randolph Richards, Mikhail Shapovalov, Jose Susannah, Kwayee M. Tarty, Charles Thomas, Quacy Thorne, Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, Paul White. (hr)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:19-cv-01546-JGB(SHKx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07975-JGB-SHK. Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal(dta)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 5:18-cv-02604-JGB-SHKx (dta)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT SUB-CLASS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I, (car)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY OR PERMANENT INJUCTION ORDERING THE DEFENDANTS TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S FRAIHAT V. ICE ORDER filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR REQUESTING FOR THE APPOINMENT OF COUNSEL TO INSTITUTE ACTION FOR INCOMPETENT PLAINTIFFS filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR An Order allowing for the to filing Amicus Curiae Briefs in this Action filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 THE FRAIHAT 2 PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY GRIEVANCES filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT FRAIHAT 2 PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION OF INCOMPETENCE TO PROSECUTE THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S FRAIHAT V. ICE DECISION filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR SUB-CLASS CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S FRAIHART V. ICE DECISION filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) Modified on 10/6/2021 (car).
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 TORTURE VICTIM PROTECTION ACT CLASS ACTION LAWSUIT MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PUAPERIS TO PROSECUTE THIS ACTION (with class in forma pauperis affidavit attached) PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S FRAIHART V. ICE DECISION filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car) Modified on 10/6/2021 (car).
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, filed by Plaintiff Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theophilus Tari Agedah et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theophilus Tari Agedah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwayee M. Tarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adhnanu Fahed Miri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quacy Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roney Clavel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kouassi Kouame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucson Appolon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikhail Shapovalov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Festus Musa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fazili Chancelier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Susannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Giovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose O. Membreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Nganga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharaoh Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven Unknown Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Shoars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Tel Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Sidney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?