Siamak Aliyarzadeh v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Siamak Aliyarzadeh
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv08039
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Receipt of Remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court on March 1, 2022 (lc)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California. (lom)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND (ECF NO. #21 ) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lom)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION (ECF No. #21 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. #21 ) and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion(s), noticed for hearing on January 24, 2022, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Opposition opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #21 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of opposition to plaintiffs' motion to remand)(Proudfoot, Matthew)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS (G-112a) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: In accordance with the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents (ECF Nos. #19 , #20 ), regarding Notice of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff (ECF No. #16 ), and Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (ECF Nos. #17 #18 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents are accepted as filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #21 filed by Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh. (Kuemerle, Karin)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karin Kuemerle in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand) (Kuemerle, Karin)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #17 , Notice of Appearance #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tionna Dolin on behalf of Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh (Dolin, Tionna)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Siamak Aliyarzadeh(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
December 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than August 8, 2022. (smo)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2022 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 11/1/2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. See document for additional pretrial dates and deadlines. (smo)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on December 6, 2021 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh.. (Peterson, Simi)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Simi Peterson on behalf of Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh (Attorney Simi Peterson added to party Siamak Aliyarzadeh(pty:pla))(Peterson, Simi)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Siamak Aliyarzadeh, (Proudfoot, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV22939 Receipt No: ACACDC-32124267 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Siamak Aliyarzadeh. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party Siamak Aliyarzadeh(pty:pla))(Proudfoot, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC, Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh. File in State Court on 6/21/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order NON-CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Siamak Aliyarzadeh pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Without prejudice. Submitted with Exhibit A to Declaration of Matthew M. Proudfoot #3 (car)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Filed in State Court on 7/16/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siamak Aliyarzadeh v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siamak Aliyarzadeh
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Simi Peterson
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Matthew M Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Robinson Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
Represented By: Matthew M Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?