Quincy Smith v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: QUINCY SMITH
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC, Lowe s Home Centers, LLC, Lowe s Companies, Inc. and Does 1 to 10, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv08135
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John F Walter
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 23 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO REMAND #21 by Judge John F. Walter. The Court orders that this case be remanded to the Superior Court for the State of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 21STCV28138, upon the terms set forth in that stipulation. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
December 6, 2021 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Backlar, Roger)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2022 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 7/8/2022 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/19/2022 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter.The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on November 15, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: February 7, 2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: February 11, 2022. (iv)
October 29, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers, LLC.. (Backlar, Roger)
October 25, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE RE: SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL (ECF NO. 1), filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conformed Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint as to Lowe's Companies, Inc.,)(Backlar, Roger)
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rickey Ivie counsel for Plaintiff Quincy Smith. Filed by Plaintiff Quincy Smith. (Ivie, Rickey)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Rickey Ivie lead counsel for plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Quincy Smith. (Ivie, Rickey)
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel, Stephanie Forman, filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers, LLC. (Forman, Stephanie)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers, LLC, RE: Filing and Service of Notice to Adverse Party and Court of Removal, served on October 18, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Backlar, Roger)
October 15, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers, LLC, of Documents 8 and 11, on counsel for plaintiff, served on October 15, 2021. (Backlar, Roger)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 15, 2021 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before November 1, 2021. (et)
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers, LLC, of Document Nos. 5, 6, and 7 on counsel for plaintiff, served on October 15, 2021. (Backlar, Roger)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 25, inclusive.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. [See document for details.] (et)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jp)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jp)
October 13, 2021 UNOFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Defendant Lowe's Company, Inc., Only filed by plaintiff Quincy Smith Lowe s Companies, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 1-4 OF EXHIBIT D TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
October 13, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL ELECTRONICALLY FILED COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff Quincy Smith against Defendants Lowe's Home Centerrs, LLC., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Does 1-25 with Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/29/2021, SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT 1-1 OF EXHIBITS A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
October 13, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL ELECTRONICALLY FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/12/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 1-5 OF EXHIBIT E TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC, identifying LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Forman, Stephanie)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC.. (Forman, Stephanie)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Forman, Stephanie)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV28138 Receipt No: ACACDC-32142345 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's S&C and Demand for Jury, #2 Exhibit B - Ntc of General Order, Notice of Assignment, and Notice of CMC, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Statement of Damages, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal as Lowe's Companies, Inc., #5 Exhibit E - Lowe's Answer to Complaint and Demand for Jury) (Attorney Stephanie Forman added to party LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC(pty:dft))(Forman, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quincy Smith v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUINCY SMITH
Represented By: Rickey Ivie
Represented By: Kristin Abdel Messih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe s Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Forman
Represented By: Roger Willner Backlar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe s Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?