Wag Acquisition, L.L.C. v. The Walt Disney Company et al
Plaintiff: Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company and Disney Streaming Services LLC
Consolidated Defendant: Hulu LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv08230
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
2 Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND CURRENT SCHEDULE #75 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Simultaneous Opening Markman Briefs shall be filed on or before August 12, 2022. The Simultaneous Responding Markman Briefs, Tutorials, and Presentation Materials shall be filed on or before August 26, 2022. The Markman Hearing is continued from September 12, 2022, at 8:30 a.m., to September 19, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. (See document for further details) (yl)
July 14, 2022 Filing 75 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Markman Briefing Schedule filed by Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, Hulu LLC, The Walt Disney Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PO for Joint Stipulation to Amend Current Schedule, #2 Declaration of Nandan Padmanabhan ISO the Joint Stipulation to Amend the Current Schedule)(Padmanabhan, Nandan)
June 22, 2022 Filing 74 AMENDED ANSWER DISNEYS FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, Hulu LLC, The Walt Disney Company. (Jay, Michael)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS FIRST AMENDED ANSWER (DKT. #71 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Based on a review of Defendant Disney's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Its First Amended Answer (Dkt. #71 ), sufficient good cause has been shown for the requested relief. Therefore, the Motion is GRANTED. Any amended answer shall be filed within ten days of the issuance of this Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hoa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY.
June 21, 2022 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Answer Disney's Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Its First Amended Answer #71 Disney's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Its First Amended Answer filed by Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company, Consol Defendant Hulu LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (First Amended Answer))(Jay, Michael)
June 21, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Answer Disney's Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Its First Amended Answer filed by Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, Hulu LLC, The Walt Disney Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/22/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Jay, Michael)
June 9, 2022 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael D. Jay counsel for Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company, Consol Defendant Hulu LLC. John Williams is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants The Walt Disney Company, Disney Streaming Services LLC and Hulu, LLC. (Jay, Michael)
May 19, 2022 Filing 69 REPORT of Agreed Upon Private Mediator - Joint filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. (White, William)
May 19, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE of Errata re: Docket Entry No. 67 filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. (White, William)
May 18, 2022 Filing 67 REPORT of Agreed Upon Private Mediator - Joint filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. (White, William)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THE PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT REPORT REGARDING AGREED UPON PRIVATE MEDIATOR (DKT. #65 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Based on a review of the parties Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for the Parties to File a Joint Report Regarding Agreed Upon Private Mediator (the Joint Report (Dkt. 65)), sufficient good cause has been shown for the requested relief. Therefore, the relief requested in the Joint Report is GRANTED. The parties shall file the joint report regarding the agreed upon private mediator, or in the alternative, the joint report regarding each party's nominees, on or before May 18, 2022.IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
May 10, 2022 Filing 65 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File JOINT REPORT REGARDING AGREED UPON PRIVATE MEDIATOR filed by Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, Hulu LLC, The Walt Disney Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nall, Jennifer)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES (DKT. #58 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court has reviewed the parties' March 25, 2022 Joint Report and sets the following deadlines: August 1, 2022 Last day to amend or add parties, the last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation is October 26, 2022, the post mediation status conference is set for November 7, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. (See document for further details) (yl)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to a private neutral based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than October 26, 2022. Post Mediation Status Conference set for 11/7/2022 11:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (tj)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick re Stipulation for Protective Order. #61 (See document for details) (vmun)
April 6, 2022 Filing 61 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C..(White, William)
April 6, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of Errata re: Docket Entry No. 59 filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. (White, William)
April 6, 2022 Filing 59 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C..(White, William)
March 25, 2022 Filing 58 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report ; estimated length of trial 8-10 days, filed by Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company, Consol Defendant Hulu LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates for Patent Cases))(Jay, Michael)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt granting #56 Non-Resident Attorney Anand Mohan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company, Consol Defendant Hulu LLC, designating Michael Jay as local counsel. (jp)
March 16, 2022 Filing 56 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anand Mohan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company, Consol Defendant Hulu LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/14/2022, Receipt No. 32940269) filed by Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, Hulu LLC, The Walt Disney Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PO to PHV) (Jay, Michael)
March 14, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anand Mohan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company, Consol Defendant Hulu LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32940269) #54 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): NY and NJ missing. (lt)
March 14, 2022 Filing 54 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anand Mohan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company, Consol Defendant Hulu LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32940269) filed by Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, Hulu LLC, The Walt Disney Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PO to PHV) (Jay, Michael)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES (DKT. #52 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. The cases numbered 2:21-cv-08230-JAK-E and 2:21-cv-08242-JAK-E are consolidated for all purposes, including trial. The case numbered 2:21-cv-08230-JAK-E shall be the lead case, and all future filings shall be made on that docket. The docket in the case numbered 2:21-cv-08242-JAK-E shall be closed. In light of the consolidation, the prior orders issued in the 2:21-cv-08230-JAK-E action (Dkt. #48 ) and the 2:21-cv-08242-JAK-E action (Dkt. 53) shall now be addressed in a single Joint Report filed by all parties in the consolidated action on or before March 25, 2022. (jp)
February 18, 2022 Filing 52 STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 2:21-cv-08242-JAK (Ex) filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, William)
February 1, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form #50 . The Notice to Filer of Deficiencies was incorrectly issued. The corporate disclosure statement has been efiled at docket entry no. 34. (lom)
February 1, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #47 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Counsel shall file the notice on or before 2/3/22. Failure to file the notice may result in the document being stricken. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
January 28, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company. NOTICE OF RELATED CASES [CIVIL L.R. 83-1.1.3] Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-08242-MCS-AFM (Nall, Jennifer)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/18/2022. (tj)
January 28, 2022 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed by Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company.(Jay, Michael)
December 14, 2021 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. upon Disney Streaming Services LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Eric N. Lieberman. (White, William)
December 14, 2021 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. upon The Walt Disney Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Janene Bassett. (White, William)
December 14, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. correcting Waiver of Service Executed as to USA, #29 , Waiver of Service Executed as to USA #28 Notice of Errata Re Docket Entries for Defendants Deadline to Respond to Complaint Per Waivers of Service of Summons (White, William)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #41 Non-Resident Attorney John Williams APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company, designating Michael D. Jay as local counsel. (lom)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #40 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer L. Nall APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company, designating Michael D. Jay as local counsel. (lom)
December 13, 2021 Filing 41 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2021, Receipt No. 32424457) filed by Defendant Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to PHV) (Jay, Michael)
December 13, 2021 Filing 40 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer L. Nall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2021, Receipt No. 32422613) filed by Defendant Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to PHV) (Jay, Michael)
December 8, 2021 Filing 39 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer L. Nall to Appear Pro Hac Vice #30 ; APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice #32 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The application(s) are stricken. Counsel shall correct each deficiency and re-file by December 15, 2021. (tj)
December 7, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32424457) #32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. (lt)
December 7, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer L. Nall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32422613) #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. (lt)
December 6, 2021 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nandan R Padmanabhan counsel for Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company. Adding Nandan Padmanabhan as counsel of record for THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY and DISNEY STREAMING SERVICES LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY and DISNEY STREAMING SERVICES LLC. (Attorney Nandan R Padmanabhan added to party Disney Streaming Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nandan R Padmanabhan added to party The Walt Disney Company(pty:dft))(Padmanabhan, Nandan)
December 6, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #33 , Notice of Appearance, #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 3, 2021 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE of DEFENDANTS FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company (Mehta, Erin)
December 3, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael D. Jay on behalf of Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company (Jay, Michael)
December 3, 2021 Filing 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32424457) filed by Defendant Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company. (Jay, Michael)
December 3, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erin Greenfield Mehta on behalf of Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company (Attorney Erin Greenfield Mehta added to party Disney Streaming Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Greenfield Mehta added to party The Walt Disney Company(pty:dft))(Mehta, Erin)
December 3, 2021 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer L. Nall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32422613) filed by Defendant Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company. (Attorney Michael D. Jay added to party Disney Streaming Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D. Jay added to party The Walt Disney Company(pty:dft)) (Jay, Michael)
December 2, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. upon Disney Streaming Services LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/1/2021, answer due 3/1/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Eric N. Lieberman. (White, William)
December 2, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. upon The Walt Disney Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/1/2021, answer due 3/1/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Janene Bassett. (White, William)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #19 , #24 Non-Resident Attorney Ari J Jaffess APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C., designating William A White as local counsel. (jp)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #18 , #22 Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Abramson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C., designating William A White as local counsel. (jp)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #17 , #23 Non-Resident Attorney David G Liston APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C., designating William A White as local counsel. (jp)
October 26, 2021 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ari J. Jaffess to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/25/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-32209446) filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, William)
October 26, 2021 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David G. Liston to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/25/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-32209194) filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, William)
October 26, 2021 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/25/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-32209397) filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, William)
October 25, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David G. Liston to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/25/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-32209194) #17 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ari J. Jaffess to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32209446) #19 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32209397) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Alex G Patchen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C., designating William A White as local counsel. (jp)
October 25, 2021 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ari J. Jaffess to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32209446) filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, William)
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32209397) filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, William)
October 25, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David G. Liston to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/25/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-32209194) filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, William)
October 20, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alex G. Patchen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32186512) filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (White, William)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:21-cv-08230 JAK(Ex). (rn)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Alexa G. Patchen. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ari J. Jaffess. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David G. Liston. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Abramson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Disney Streaming Services LLC, The Walt Disney Company. (lh)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Wag Acquisition, L.L.C., a New Jersey limited liability company. (White, William)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C., a New Jersey limited liability company, identifying WAG Acquisition, L.L.C., William Grywalski, Harry Emerson, Frome Wye Limited, Ernest Buff, Liston Abramson LLP, Harold Price, Robert Landmesser. (White, William)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C., a New Jersey limited liability company. (White, William)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C., a New Jersey limited liability company. (White, William)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 10/18/2021, receipt number ACACDC-32167801), filed by Plaintiff Wag Acquisition, L.L.C., a New Jersey limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F) (Attorney William A White added to party Wag Acquisition, L.L.C., a New Jersey limited liability company(pty:pla))(White, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wag Acquisition, L.L.C. v. The Walt Disney Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wag Acquisition, L.L.C.
Represented By: William A White
Represented By: William A. White
Represented By: Alex G. Patchen
Represented By: Ari J. Jaffess
Represented By: David G. Liston
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Represented By: Erin Greenfield Mehta
Represented By: Jennifer L. Nall
Represented By: John C. Williams
Represented By: Michael D. Jay
Represented By: Nandan R. Padmanabhan
Represented By: Anand Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Streaming Services LLC
Represented By: Erin Greenfield Mehta
Represented By: Jennifer L. Nall
Represented By: John C. Williams
Represented By: Michael D. Jay
Represented By: Nandan R. Padmanabhan
Represented By: Anand Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Hulu LLC
Represented By: Anand Mohan
Represented By: Erin Greenfield Mehta
Represented By: Jennifer L. Nall
Represented By: John C. Williams
Represented By: Michael D. Jay
Represented By: Nandan R. Padmanabhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?