Miguel Gonzalez et al v. Carnival Corporation et al
Petitioner: Miguel Gonzalez and Carla Gonzalez
Respondent: Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC and Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv08261
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 22, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
October 22, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 4:21-cv-04682, from USDC Northern District of California, Oakland. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:21-cv-08261 AB (ADSx). (jtil)
October 19, 2021 Filing 46 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING #28 Motion to Remand and GRANTING #14 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 18, 2021. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 44 REPLY (re #28 MOTION to Remand ) to Defendants' Sur-Reply filed byCarla Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez. (Nelson, Gretchen) (Filed on 10/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING HEARING, DENYING #14 MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ANDPERMITTING SUR-REPLY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/5/21. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Christopher E. Coleman. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16451788.) filed by Carla Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez. (Coleman, Christopher) (Filed on 10/1/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 40 OBJECTIONS to re #36 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave To File Sur-Reply re #28 MOTION to Remand by Carla Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez. (Nelson, Gretchen) (Filed on 9/27/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/27/21. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2021 09:00 AM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Christopher M. Odell. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2021 09:00 AM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16426303.) filed by Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Odell, Christopher) (Filed on 9/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Filing 36 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave To File Sur-Reply re #28 MOTION to Remand filed by Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Responses due by 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Sur-reply, #2 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/22/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 34 STIPULATION re #12 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS JOINT REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF FILING DEADLINES FOR FED.R.CIV.P. 26 REPORT AND CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Carla Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) (Filed on 9/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY (re #28 MOTION to Remand ) filed byCarla Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) (Filed on 9/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY (re #14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCarnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 30 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #28 MOTION to Remand ) filed byCarnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Collin Steinke and Exhibits)(Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting AS MODIFIED #25 Third Stipulation To Modify Briefing Schedule. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Remand . Responses due by 9/3/2021. Replies due by 9/10/2021. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Dismiss . Replies due by 9/3/2021. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Remand filed by Carla Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2021 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 8/18/2021. Replies due by 8/25/2021. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) (Filed on 8/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCarla Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) (Filed on 8/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 26 Refund Status re #24 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 25 THIRD STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Motion to Transfer or Dismiss filed by Carla Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez, Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC and Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Alexander, Mary) (Filed on 8/3/2021) Modified on 8/4/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 24 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-16089997 by Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Duplicate Charge for Receipt No. 0971-1608997)(Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting granting as modified #22 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule for Motion to Transfer or Dismiss. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 8/4/2021. Replies due by 8/27/2021. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 22 SECOND STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR MOTION TO TRANSFER OR DISMISS; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Carla Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez, Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Chalos, Mark) (Filed on 7/20/2021) Modified on 7/21/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #20 STIPULATION to Modify Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Motion to Transfer or Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/21. Motions For Remand due by 7/21/2021. Responses due by 8/13/2021. Replies due by 8/27/2021. Motions set for 10/1/2021 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 7/21/2021. Replies due by 8/13/2021. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2021) Modified on 7/8/2021 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #18 Renotice motion hearing, Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Motion to Transfer or Dismiss; Proposed Order filed by Carla Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Carnival Corporation and Carnival Plc.. (Alexander, Mary) (Filed on 7/7/2021) Modified on 7/8/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2021 09:00 AM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret (as counsel for Plaintiffs) (Llinas Negret, Carlos) (Filed on 6/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 18 Renotice motion hearing re #14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Dismiss for August 13, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. filed byCarnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/29/21. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING DATE AND DIRECTING COUNSEL TO PROPERLY RE-NOTICE MOTION ON AN OPEN AND AVAILABLE DATE as to #14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case, MOTION to Dismiss (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 15 Declaration of Collin Steinke in Support of #14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/25/2021) Modified on 6/28/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case , MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2021 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 7/9/2021. Replies due by 7/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/24/21. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2021 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698#The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd... (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 21, 2021 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Edgar Roy Nield. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #:8 Notice of Appearance fi led by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 21, 2021 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Gabrielle De Santis Nield. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #:8 Notice of App earance filed by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 21, 2021 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Jeffrey Bradford Maltzman. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #:7 Notice of App earance filed by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle De Santis Nield (Nield, Gabrielle) (Filed on 6/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edgar Roy Nield (Nield, Edgar) (Filed on 6/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Bradford Maltzman (Maltzman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)[Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Carnival Corporation for Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/18/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC identifying Other Affiliate Micky Arison for Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC. (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/18/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan W. Hughes for Defendants Carnival Corporation, Carnival plc, and Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/18/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Marin with jury demand. Their case number is CIV 2100611. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16090018). Filed by Carnival PLC, Carnival Corporation, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/18/2021) Modified on 6/21/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/21/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miguel Gonzalez et al v. Carnival Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel Gonzalez
Represented By: Mary E Alexander
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Gretchen M Nelson
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carla Gonzalez
Represented By: Mary E Alexander
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Represented By: Christopher E. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Gretchen M Nelson
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Christopher M. Odell
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carnival PLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Odell
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
Represented By: Edgar Roy Nield
Represented By: Christopher M. Odell
Represented By: Gabrielle De Santis Nield
Represented By: Jeffrey Bradford Maltzman
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?