Sandra B. Arana et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: SANDRA B. ARANA and RAUL ARANA
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, Sunrise Ford and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv08325
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
2 Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES [ECF NO. #35 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered the Stipulation and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS as follows: Jury Trial is set for 12/11/2023 at 8:30 a.m. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/22/2023 at 9:00 am. The discovery cut-off is 6/7/2023. The foregoing dates supersede and replace those included in the Civil Trial Order issued by this Court on August 4, 2022, and found at ECF No. 28. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
February 22, 2023 Filing 35 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial and All Related Deadlines from July 24, 2023 to December 4, 2023 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet, #2 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun, #3 Proposed Order)(Jun, Patricia)
January 17, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice (Other) #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict re: name of party. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 12, 2023 Filing 33 Notice Notice of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 12, 2022 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi counsel for Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. Adding Rabiya Tirmizi as counsel of record for Sandra B. Arana and Raul Arana for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Sandra B. Arana and Raul Arana. (Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Raul Arana(pty:pla), Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Sandra B. Arana (pty:pla))(Tirmizi, Rabiya)
November 4, 2022 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven Whang counsel for Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. Adding Steven Whang as counsel of record for Raul Arana and Sandra B. Arana for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Raul Arana and Sandra B. Arana. (Attorney Steven Whang added to party Raul Arana(pty:pla), Attorney Steven Whang added to party Sandra B. Arana (pty:pla))(Whang, Steven)
September 1, 2022 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. Adding Joy De Leon as counsel of record for Sandra Arana and Raul Arana for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Sandra Arana and Raul Arana. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 18, 2022 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. Adding Joy De Leon as counsel of record for Sandra Arana and Raul Arana for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Sandra Arana and Raul Arana. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Scheduling Order governing this action is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/28/2023 at 9:00 AM. The Jury Trial is set for 7/24/2023 at 8:30 AM. Discovery cut-off is 1/11/2023. Witness Lists and Motions in Limine are due by 5/31/2023. The last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/26/2023. (See document for further details) (yl)
July 13, 2022 Filing 27 STATEMENT Joint Scheduling Worksheet filed by Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
June 29, 2022 Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Text-Only Entry: The Court ORDERS the parties to submit a current copy of the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet attached to the Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference no later than fifteen (15) days after this ORDER. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference is available on Judge Frimpong's website. The Court will schedule Final Pretrial Conferences and Trials no earlier than August 2022. The parties are required to meet and confer regarding their availability prior to submitting this Joint worksheet. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 27, 2022 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo counsel for Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. Adding Matthew Pardo as counsel of record for Sandra B. Arana and Raul Arana for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Sandra B. Arana and Raul Arana. (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Raul Arana(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Sandra B. Arana (pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew)
June 27, 2022 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine J Haw counsel for Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. Adding Christine Haw as counsel of record for Sandra B. Arana and Raul Arana for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Sandra B. Arana and Raul Arana. (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Raul Arana(pty:pla), Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Sandra B. Arana (pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
June 21, 2022 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. Adding Nadine Alsaadi as counsel of record for Sandra Arana and Raul Arana for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Sandra Arana and Raul Arana. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 14, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Sandra B. Arana and Raul Arana. (Dolin, Tionna)
February 25, 2022 Filing 21 STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT PURSUANT TO REASSIGNMENT ORDER filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company re: Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings #20 . (Jun, Patricia)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Please refer to the Order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-019) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, this case is transferred from Judge Virginia A. Phillips to the calendar of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08325-MEMF-JDEx. (sn)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Last date for hearing motions to amend pleadings or add parties: 5/23/2022; Last date to conduct settlement conference (ADR #3): 5/16/2022; Initial Expert Disclosures: 6/27/2022; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 7/11/2022; All Discovery cutoff: 8/22/2022; Last date for hearing non-discovery motions: 10/3/2022; Pre-trial conference (hearing on motions in limine): 10/31/2022 at 2:30 p.m.; Trial date (jury trial, 3 days): 11/8/2022 at 8:30 a.m. (See document for further details) (yl)
January 28, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set on December 27, 2021 is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. No appearance by counsel will be necessary. The Court will issue such further orders as deemed appropriate. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 20, 2021 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 to 5 days, filed by Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana.. (Law, Daniel)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND #10 (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: For the reasons stated above, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand this action to the Los Angeles Superior Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
November 29, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #10 filed by Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections to Mortenson Declaration)(Law, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #10 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration)(Jun, Patricia)
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #10 filed by Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. (Kuemerle, Karin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiffs' Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana. Motion set for hearing on 12/13/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karin Kuemerle in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand) (Kuemerle, Karin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiffs Raul Arana, Sandra B. Arana (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Raul Arana(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Sandra B. Arana (pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
October 20, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ford Motor Company, Sunrise Ford. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Sandra B. Arana, Raul Arana. Filed in State Court on 5/27/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 10/21/2021 (car).
October 20, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Sandra B. Arana, Raul Arana pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Sunrise Ford Without prejudice. Filed in State Court on 9/20/2021 Submitted with Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
October 20, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Filed in State Court on 10/12/2021 Submitted with Attachment 5 Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney David M Keithly added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(car)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, (Mortenson, Michael)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Mortenson, Michael)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV20068 Receipt No: ACACDC-32189293 - Fee: $402, filed by DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #7 Exhibit 6 to Decl. of M. Mortenson) (Attorney Michael Donn Mortenson added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY (pty:dft))(Mortenson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandra B. Arana et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA B. ARANA
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Nadine Alsaadi
Represented By: Joy DeLeon
Represented By: Joy Moiselle De Leon
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAUL ARANA
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Nadine Alsaadi
Represented By: Joy DeLeon
Represented By: Joy Moiselle De Leon
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Represented By: Craig A Taggart
Represented By: Patricia H Jun
Represented By: David M Keithly
Represented By: Patricia H. Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?