Tom Charara v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tom Charara
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv08499
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
2 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Byrne J. Decker of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Decker, Byrne)
December 20, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, (Decker, Byrne)
December 20, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Counsel must comply with L.R 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
December 17, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Decker, Byrne)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL COMPLAINT #10 by Judge John F. Walter. The deadline for Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 30 days, up to and including December 17, 2021. (iv)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-08499 JFW(SKx). (rn)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Decker, Byrne)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer now due 12/17/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Attorney Byrne J Decker added to party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Decker, Byrne)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tom Charara, upon Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro - Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kassan, Alan)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (lh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tom Charara, (Kantor, Glenn)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tom Charara. (Kantor, Glenn)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tom Charara. (Kantor, Glenn)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32226480 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Tom Charara. (Attorney Glenn R Kantor added to party Tom Charara(pty:pla))(Kantor, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tom Charara v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Charara
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Represented By: Alan E Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Byrne J Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?