Kimberly Snover et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Snover and Steven Snover
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Autonation Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Valencia and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv08553
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
2 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER/JUDGMENT RE: STIPULATION TO RESOLVE PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES, #56 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Plaintiffs KIMBERLY SNOVER and STEVEN SNOVER (Plaintiffs) and Defendant FCA US, LLCs have agreed FCA will pay $46,000 to resolve Plaintiffs attorneys fees, costs, and expenses. Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs pursuant to the terms of the parties Joint Stipulation. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
October 27, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form, #58 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Judgment)(Dolin, Tionna)
October 16, 2022 Filing 58 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #57 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Counsel is DIRECTED to L.R. 7-1. Furthermore, pursuant to L.R. 5-4.4.1, counsel is further DIRECTED to electronically lodge the proposed order, as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. Counsel is reminded to comply with L.R. 5-4.4.1 and L.R. 5-4.4.2. (iva)
October 14, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation for Costs #56 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
October 13, 2022 Filing 56 STIPULATION for Costs against Autonation Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Valencia, FCA US LLC filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover.(Shahian, Payam)
October 13, 2022 Filing 55 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Payam Shahian counsel for Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. Adding Payam Shahian as counsel of record for Kimberly Snover and Steven Snover for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover and Steven Snover. (Attorney Payam Shahian added to party Kimberly Snover(pty:pla), Attorney Payam Shahian added to party Steven Snover(pty:pla))(Shahian, Payam)
August 24, 2022 Filing 54 JUDGMENT PER FRCP 68 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Plaintiffs KIMBERLY SNOVER and STEVEN SNOVER (Plaintiffs) accepted Defendants FCA US, LLCs Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 68 on June 29, 2022, attached as Exhibit 1 to the Request of Entry of Judgment [Dkt. 35]. Accordingly, JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Plaintiffs pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68. (shb)
August 23, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order to Show Cause,,, #52 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment)(Dolin, Tionna)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURTS REQUEST by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS counsel for Plaintiffs Tionna Dolin; Ariel Harman-Holmes; and Daniel A. Law and counsel for Defendant Eric D. Sentlinger; Gurpreet Sandhu; Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert; and Spencer Peter Hugret to show cause why they should not each be sanctioned in the amount of $250 for their failure to comply with the Courts Request. Counsel is required to respond in writing on or before September 6, 2022, at 12:00 PM. Counsels failure to respond or file a satisfactory response may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: On July 29, 2022, the Court issued an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for the failure of counsel to file the Court-ordered case management statement [Dkt. 47]. On August 12, 2022, counsel filed their respective Declarations (the "Declarations") [Dkts. 48 & 49] in response to the Court's OSC. The Court accepts the Declarations and hereby orders the OSC DISCHARGED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 12, 2022 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Eric D. Sentlinger re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Order to Show Cause,,, #47 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric)
August 12, 2022 Filing 48 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snoverto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Order to Show Cause,,, #47 (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes:, (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURTS REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The Court ORDERS counsel for PlaintiffsTionna Dolin; Ariel Harman-Holmes; and Daniel A. Lawand counsel for DefendantEric D. Sentlinger; Gurpreet Sandhu; Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert; Spencer Peter Hugret; and Matthew M. Proudfootto show cause why they should not each be sanctioned in the amount of $250 for their failure to comply with the Courts Reassignment Order. Counsel is required to respond in writing on or before August 12, 2022, at 12:00 noon. Counsels failure to respond, or counsels filing of an unsatisfactory response, may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 46 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #38 by Deputy Clerk of Court. The document [Dkt. 36] is hereby STRICKEN. This document pertain to another matter (5:22-cv-00503-CAS-AGRx). (iva)
July 13, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #43 , Notice of Appearance #44 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
July 12, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gurpreet Sandhu on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Gurpreet Sandhu added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Sandhu, Gurpreet)
July 12, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Lambert, Sarah)
July 12, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric D Sentlinger on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Eric D Sentlinger added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Sentlinger, Eric)
July 12, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: GRANTING #37 Request to Substitute Attorney Spencer Hugret in place and instead of Attorney Matthew M. Proudfoot. Added attorney Spencer Peter Hugret for FCA US LLC. Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot terminated (shb)
July 7, 2022 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover and Steven Snover. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 6, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Judgment Entry #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: This document was filed in the incorrect case and should be filed in case 5:22cv00503-CAS In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
July 6, 2022 Filing 37 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Spencer Hugret in place of attorney Matthew M. Proudfoot filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Proudfoot, Matthew)
July 1, 2022 Filing 36 REQUEST for Judgment Entry filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 1, 2022 Filing 35 REQUEST for Judgment Entry filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Please refer to Order for complete details., (iva)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-117) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Sykes, Sunshine Suzanne, this case is transferred from Judge John F. Walter to the calendar of Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08553-SSS-ASx. (aco)
June 10, 2022 Filing 32 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Kimberly Snover and Steven Snover for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs' Kimberly Snover and Steven Snover. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Kimberly Snover(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Steven Snover(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
January 29, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 28, 2021 Filing 29 Text Entry Order: In light of the Courts ruling Denying Plaintiffs Motion to Remand filed 12/27/21, docket no. #28 , the Request for Telephone Appearance at Plaintiffs Motion to Remand is DENIED as moot #27 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND [filed 11/30/21; Docket No. #19 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiffs' Motion is DENIED. (iv)
December 27, 2021 Filing 27 REQUEST for Leave of Matthew M. Proudfoot to Appear for Motion of Remand via telephonic appearance filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Request set for hearing on 1/3/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Proudfoot, Matthew)
December 22, 2021 Filing 26 STATEMENT of of Decision Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #19 filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. (Law, Daniel)
December 22, 2021 Filing 25 STATEMENT of Decision filed by Defendant FCA US LLC re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #19 . (Proudfoot, Matthew)
December 20, 2021 Filing 24 OBJECTION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #19 filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. (Law, Daniel)
December 20, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #19 filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. (Law, Daniel)
December 15, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff's Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 13, 2021 Filing 21 DEFENDANTS FCA US LLC'S OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #19 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of plaintiff's' opposition to motion to remand)(Proudfoot, Matthew)
November 30, 2021 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #19 filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. (Kuemerle, Karin)
November 30, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiffs' Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. Motion set for hearing on 1/3/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand) (Kuemerle, Karin)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2022 at 8:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 10/28/2022 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 11/8/2022 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on December 6, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby:ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: June 2, 2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: June 10, 2022. (iv)
November 23, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. Adding Simi Peterson as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover and Steven Snover for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Snover and Steven Snover. (Law, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 - 5 days, filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover.. (Law, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 STATEMENT Following Local Rule 7-3 Conference re: Remand filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover Joint (Law, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover and Steven Snover for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Snover and Steven Snover. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Kimberly Snover(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Steven Snover(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Kimberly Snover(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Steven Snover(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for December 6, 2021 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before November 22, 2021. (iv)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08553-JFW-ASx. (aco)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
October 28, 2021 CONFORMED COPY ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Filed in State Court on 5/13/2021 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
October 28, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Autonation Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Valencia, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover. Filed in State Court on 4/8/2021 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
October 28, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Snover, Steven Snover pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Autonation Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Valencia. Submitted with Exhibit A to Declaration of Matthew M. Proudfoot #3 (car)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Proudfoot, Matthew)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV13467 Receipt No: ACACDC-32238023 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimberly Snover et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Snover
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Simi Peterson
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Snover
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Simi Peterson
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Matthew M Proudfoot
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Eric D Sentlinger
Represented By: Gurpreet Sandhu
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autonation Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?