Bernadette Perry v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Bernadette Perry
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv08614
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Bernadette Perry, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 11/3/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS, #2 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Feld, Benjamin)
November 20, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT Consent to Proceed with Magistrate filed by Plaintiff Bernadette Perry (Feld, Benjamin)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Wiesbrock, Stacy)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order Re Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (nbo)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (ghap)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Bernadette Perry. (Feld, Benjamin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bernadette Perry, (Feld, Benjamin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bernadette Perry. (Feld, Benjamin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32251504 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Bernadette Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appeals Council Denial, #2 Exhibit SSA Unfavorable Decision) (Attorney Benjamin Paul Feld added to party Bernadette Perry(pty:pla))(Feld, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernadette Perry v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Perry
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Feld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Stacy Wiesbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?