Gloribel Turcios et al v. CPE HR, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gloribel Turcios, Kamlesh Kumar and Yara Medina
Defendant: CPE HR, Inc., Windsor Cheviot Hills, LLC, Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, LLC, Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP, Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC, Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC, Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Hayward, LLC, Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC, Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC, Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC, Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC, Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC, Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC, Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC, Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC, Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC, Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC, Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC, Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach, Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego, Windsor Care Center National City, Inc., Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC, Windsor Westlake Healthcare, LLC and Does 1 to 200, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv08653
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),,,,,,,,,,, #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text; missing name of event In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 17, 2021 Filing 22 (Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Care Center National City, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Cheviot Hills, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Hayward, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor Westlake Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D Pate added to party Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC(pty:dft))(Pate, Matthew)
December 15, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 filed by Defendants Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Care Center National City, Inc., Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills, Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC, Windsor Cheviot Hills, LLC, Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC, Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP, Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC, Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC, Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC, Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles, Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Hayward, LLC, Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC, Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC, Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC, Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC, Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC, Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC, Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC, Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC, Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC, Windsor Westlake Healthcare, LLC, Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Wallin, Allison)
December 14, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (cause or other),,,,, #10 filed by DEFENDANT Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Care Center National City, Inc., Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills, Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC, Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC, Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP, Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC, Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC, Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC, Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles, Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC, Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC, Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC, Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC, Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC, Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC, Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC, Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC, Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC, Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Wallin, Allison)
December 13, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Care Center National City, Inc., Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills, Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC, Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC, Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP, Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC, Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC, Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC, Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles, Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC, Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC, Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC, Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC, Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC, Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC, Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC, Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC, Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC, Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison S. Wallin In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Allison S. Wallin, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Allison S. Wallin, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Allison S. Wallin, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Allison S. Wallin, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Allison S. Wallin, #7 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #8 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)) (Wallin, Allison)
November 30, 2021 Filing 18 Opposition Opposition of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) #10 filed by Plaintiffs Kamlesh Kumar, Yara Medina, Gloribel Turcios. (Patel, Pooja)
November 30, 2021 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,,, filed by Plaintiffs Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina(Patel, Pooja)
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Kamlesh Kumar, Yara Medina, Gloribel Turcios. Motion set for hearing on 4/4/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Danielle Montero, #3 Exhibit A to Montero Declaration) (Patel, Pooja)
November 23, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Danielle Elizabeth Montero counsel for Plaintiffs Kamlesh Kumar, Yara Medina, Gloribel Turcios. Kevin Joseph Farnan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff GLORIBEL TURCIOS, KAMLESH KUMAR and YARA MEDINA. (Montero, Danielle)
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Danielle Elizabeth Montero counsel for Plaintiffs Kamlesh Kumar, Yara Medina, Gloribel Turcios. Adding Danielle E. Montero as counsel of record for GLORIBEL TURCIOS, KAMLESH KUMAR and YARA MEDINA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs GLORIBEL TURCIOS, KAMLESH KUMAR and YARA MEDINA. (Attorney Danielle Elizabeth Montero added to party Kamlesh Kumar(pty:pla), Attorney Danielle Elizabeth Montero added to party Yara Medina(pty:pla), Attorney Danielle Elizabeth Montero added to party Gloribel Turcios(pty:pla))(Montero, Danielle)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (DKT. #10 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: Defendants have set the motion for a day the Court's calendar is full and, therefore, closed. Counsel are directed to refer to the Motion Calendar under this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court. Any future motion will be stricken for failing to set it on a date the Court is hearing motions. The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from March 21, 2022 to April 18, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DOCKET #10 AND #11-2 filed by DEFENDANT Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Care Center National City, Inc., Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills, Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC, Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC, Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP, Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC, Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC, Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC, Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles, Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC, Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC, Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC, Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC, Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC, Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC, Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC, Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC, Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC, Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wallin, Allison)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Allison S. Wallin In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) #10 filed by Defendants Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Care Center National City, Inc., Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills, Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC, Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC, Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP, Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC, Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC, Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC, Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles, Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC, Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC, Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC, Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC, Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC, Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC, Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC, Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC, Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC, Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6))(Wallin, Allison)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 WITHDRAWN, see docket entry no. 20 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Care Center National City, Inc., Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills, Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC, Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC, Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP, Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC, Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC, Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC, Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles, Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC, Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC, Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC, Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC, Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC, Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC, Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC, Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC, Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC, Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/21/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Wallin, Allison) Modified on 12/14/2021 (lom).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/14/2022. (tj)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because the incorrect case type was used at case opening. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo are assigned to this new case number. All future documents must be filed under the new case number, which is 2:21-cv-08653-JAK (PVCx). The previous case number, 2:21-mc-01089, is hereby terminated. (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of RECEIPT and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Hayward, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CPE HR, Inc., Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, LLC, Does, Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Care Center National City, Inc., Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills, Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC, Windsor Cheviot Hills, LLC, Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC, Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP, Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC, Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC, Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC, Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles, Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Hayward, LLC, Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC, Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC, Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC, Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC, Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC, Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC, Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC, Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC, Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC, Windsor Westlake Healthcare, LLC., filed by Plaintiffs Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/30/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Care Center National City, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Westlake Healthcare, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Cheviot Hills, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kamlesh Kumar, Gloribel Turcios, Yara Medina, upon Defendant Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Care Center National City, Inc., Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills, Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC, Windsor Cheviot Hills, LLC, Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC, Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP, Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC, Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC, Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC, Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles, Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Hayward, LLC, Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC, Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC, Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC, Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC, Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC, Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC, Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC, Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC, Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC, Windsor Westlake Healthcare, LLC, Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,,,,,,,,,, #2 (Wallin, Allison)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Care Center National City, Inc., Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills, Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC, Windsor Cheviot Hills, LLC, Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC, Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP, Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC, Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC, Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC, Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles, Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Hayward, LLC, Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC, Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC, Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC, Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC, Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC, Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC, Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC, Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC, Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC, Windsor Westlake Healthcare, LLC, Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC, identifying WINDSOR CHEVIOT HILLS, LLC; WINDSOR CARE CENTER OF CHEVIOT HILLS; WINDSOR CONVALESCENT AND REHABILITATION CENTER OF CONCORD, LLC; WINDSOR COUNTRY DRIVE CARE CENTER, LLP; WINDSOR EL CAMINO CARE CENTER, LLC; WINDSOR ELK GROVE CARE AND REHABILITATION, LLC; WINDSOR ELM HAVEN CARE CENTER, LLC; WINDSOR CONVALESCENT AND REHABILITATION CENTER OF FREMONT, LLC; WINDSOR GARDENS HEALTHCARE CENTER OF HAYWARD, LLC; WINDSOR HAYWARD ESTATES, LLC; WINDSOR HAMPTON CARE CENTER, LLC; WINDSOR MONTEREY CARE CENTER, LLC; WINDSOR SACRAMENTO ESTATES, LLC; WINDSOR THE RIDGE REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC; WINDSOR CONVALESCENT AND REHABILITATION CENTER OF SALINAS, LLC; WINDSOR SKYLINE CARE CENTER, LLC; WINDSOR ROSEWOOD CARE CENTER, LLC; WINDSOR VALLEJO CARE CENTER, LLC; WINDSOR CARE CENTER OF PETALUMA, LLC; WINDSOR HEALTHCARE GOLDEN PALMS, LLC; WINDSOR TWIN PALMS HEALTHCARE CENTER, LLC; WINDSOR ARVIN HEALTHCARE, LLC; WINDSOR BAKERSFIELD HEALTHCARE, LLC; WINDSOR CYPRESS GARDENS HEALTHCARE LLC; WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF LONG BEACH; WINDSOR CONVALESCENT CENTER OF NORTH LONG BEACH; WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES; WINDSOR GARDENS CONVALESCENT CENTER OF SAN DIEGO; WINDSOR CARE CENTER NATIONAL CITY, INC.; WINDSOR TERRACE HEALTHCARE, LLC; WINDSOR COURT ASSISTED LIVING, LLC; WINDSOR WESTLAKE HEALTHCARE, LLC. (Wallin, Allison)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California County of Los Angeles, case number 21STCV28197 Receipt No: ACACDC-32245540 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego, Windsor Care Center National City, Inc., Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC, Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach, Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC, Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC, Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC, Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC, Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC, Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles, Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC, Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC, Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC, Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC, Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Hayward, LLC, Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach, Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills, Windsor Westlake Healthcare, LLC, Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC, Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC, Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP, Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC, Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC, Windsor Cheviot Hills, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Declaration Declaration of Hanita Hofman in Support of Notice of Removal of Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 185 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1331, 1441 and 1446, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Hanita Hofman, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Hanita Hofman, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Care Center National City, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Cheviot Hills, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Hayward, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor Westlake Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC(pty:dft))(Wallin, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gloribel Turcios et al v. CPE HR, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloribel Turcios
Represented By: Pooja Virendra Patel
Represented By: Joseph Lavi
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Farnan
Represented By: Vincent Charles Granberry
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Montero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamlesh Kumar
Represented By: Pooja Virendra Patel
Represented By: Joseph Lavi
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Farnan
Represented By: Vincent Charles Granberry
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Montero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yara Medina
Represented By: Pooja Virendra Patel
Represented By: Joseph Lavi
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Farnan
Represented By: Vincent Charles Granberry
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Montero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPE HR, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Cheviot Hills, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Care Center of Cheviot Hills
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Concord, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Country Drive Care Center, LLP
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor El Camino Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Elk Grove Care and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Elm Haven Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Fremont, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Gardens Healthcare Center of Hayward, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Hayward Estates, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Hampton Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Monterey Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Sacramento Estates, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor the Ridge Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Convalescent and Rehabilitation Center of Salinas, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Skyline Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Rosewood Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Vallejo Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Care Center of Petaluma, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Healthcare Golden Palms, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Twin Palms Healthcare Center, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Arvin Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Bakersfield Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Cypress Gardens Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of Long Beach
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Convalescent Center of North Long Beach
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Gardens Convalescent Hospital of Los Angeles
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Gardens Convalescent Center of San Diego
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Care Center National City, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Terrace Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Court Assisted Living, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Westlake Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Lauren J Katunich
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Matthew D Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 200, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?