Benito C. Valdez, Jr. et al v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps Division et al
Plaintiff: Benito C. Valdez, Jr. and Georgia Valdez
Defendant: CBS Corporation, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps Division, Aurora Pump Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Viacom Inc.,, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Crane Co., Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc., FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Greene Tweed and Co. Inc, Grinnell LLC, IMO Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, ITT LLC, Jenkins Bros., John Crane Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Soco West, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc., William Powell Company and Does 1-850 Inclusive
Petitioner: Electrolux Home Products, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv08863
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 18 Receipt of Acknowledgment of documents by Los Angeles Superior Court, case no. 21STCV36866. (lom)
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #11 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123 - not signed. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 19, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. Notice of Filing State Court Answer and Demand For Jury Trial (Gamboa, Eric)
November 19, 2021 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO REMAND ACTION TO SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA #13 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Benito C. Valdez, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO REMAND ACTION TO SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA)(Attorney Deborah R Rosenthal added to party Benito C. Valdez, Jr.(pty:pla))(Rosenthal, Deborah)
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc., identifying The Weir Group PLC. (Bergstrom, Emily)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc.. Adding Kurt T. Putnam as counsel of record for Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill. (Bergstrom, Emily)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc.. Adding Emily D. Bergstrom as counsel of record for Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill. (Bergstrom, Emily)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
November 18, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (Dated 11/2/2021) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #9 .) (iv)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James P Cunningham on behalf of Defendant Blackmer Pump Company (Attorney James P Cunningham added to party Blackmer Pump Company(pty:dft))(Cunningham, James)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc., identifying Copes-Vulcan, Inc.; Electrolux Holdings, Inc.; AB Electrolux. (Gage, Nicole)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
November 10, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps Division, Aurora Pump Company, Blackmer Pump Company, CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc., Does 1-850 Inclusive, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Greene Tweed and Co. Inc, Grinnell LLC, IMO Industries, Inc., ITT LLC, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Jenkins Bros., John Crane Inc., M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Soco West, Inc., The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc., William Powell Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Benito C. Valdez, Jr., Georgia Valdez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/6/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
November 10, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/5/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED B)(ghap)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV36866 with filing fee previously paid (402.00 paid on 11/10/2021, receipt number 32308606), filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Copes-Vulcan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Nicole Elisabet Gage added to party Electrolux Home Products, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Copes-Vulcan, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Gage, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benito C. Valdez, Jr. et al v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps Division et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benito C. Valdez, Jr.
Represented By: Crystal Gayle Foley
Represented By: Deborah R Rosenthal
Represented By: Benjamin D Goldstein
Represented By: Melissa C Schopfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Valdez
Represented By: Crystal Gayle Foley
Represented By: Benjamin D Goldstein
Represented By: Melissa C Schopfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Electrolux Home Products, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Lance D Wilson
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: James P Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed and Co. Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Bros.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Represented By: Kurt T Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-850 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?