Atascadero Mutual Water Company v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Atascadero Mutual Water Company
Defendant: 3M Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Corteva, Inc., DuPont De Nemours, Inc., Doe Defendants 1-100 inclusive and Doe Defendants
Case Number: 2:2021cv08875
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 24 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Viola Vetter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Atascadero Mutual Water Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 1/4/2022, Receipt No. 32563316) filed by PLAINTIFF Atascadero Mutual Water Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Praglin, Gary)
January 6, 2022 Filing 23 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kyle J. McGee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Atascadero Mutual Water Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 1/4/2022, Receipt No. 32563108) filed by PLAINTIFF Atascadero Mutual Water Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Praglin, Gary)
January 5, 2022 Filing 22 MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court strikes the APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kyle J. McGee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Atascadero Mutual Water #19 , and the APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Viola Vetter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Atascadero Mutual Water Company #20 , without prejudice to refiling in accordance with the Court's standing order (provided that the refiling is otherwise timely), for failure to comply with Local Rule 5-4.4.2 Submission of Word-Processing Versions of Proposed Orders. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
January 5, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kyle J. McGee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Atascadero Mutual Water Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32563108) #19 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Viola Vetter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Atascadero Mutual Water Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32563316) #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
January 4, 2022 Filing 20 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER CIVIL MINUTES OF 1/5/2022, SEE DOCKET NO. 22] First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Viola Vetter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Atascadero Mutual Water Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32563316) filed by PLAINTIFF Atascadero Mutual Water Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Praglin, Gary) Modified on 1/5/2022 (gk).
January 4, 2022 Filing 19 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER CIVIL MINUTES OF 1/5/2022, SEE DOCKET NO. 22] First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kyle J. McGee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Atascadero Mutual Water Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32563108) filed by PLAINTIFF Atascadero Mutual Water Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vitale, Theresa) Modified on 1/5/2022 (gk).
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Upon Stipulation #17 , the Court hereby ORDERS that the deadline for Defendants 3M Company, E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, Corteva, Inc., and DuPont de Nemours, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is continued to 2/4/2022. The Mandatory Scheduling Conference is continued to 2/25/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint 26(f) report by no later than 2/15/2022. (gk)
December 30, 2021 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 02/04/2022 filed by PLAINTIFF Atascadero Mutual Water Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Theresa Vitale added to party Atascadero Mutual Water Company(pty:pla))(Vitale, Theresa)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-08897 SVW(ASx) (rn)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., re Joint Request #13 : Pursuant to the Joint Request of the Parties and good cause appearing therefor, the Mandatory Scheduling Conference currently set for December 17, 2021 in this action is HEREBY CONTINUED to January 28, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6C. The parties shall file a Joint 26(f) report by no later than January 18, 2022. The parties should not expect a further continuance. (bm)
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Request to Continue #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests-Continue. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 Joint Request to Continue Rule 16 Conference filed by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #10 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's and Defendants' Joint Request to Continue Rule 16 Conference)(Rapp, Adam)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #10 served on November 19, 2021. (Queen, Daniel)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Chemours Company answer now due 1/8/2022; E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company answer now due 1/8/2022; 3M Company answer now due 1/8/2022; Corteva, Inc. answer now due 1/8/2022; DuPont De Nemours, Inc. answer now due 1/8/2022, filed by Defendants The Chemours Company; E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company.(Attorney Adam M Rapp added to party E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Adam M Rapp added to party The Chemours Company(pty:dft))(Rapp, Adam)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Scheduling Conference for 12/17/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. The parties shall file a joint Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/7/2021. (vcr)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. served on 11/15/21. (Queen, Daniel)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (jtil)
November 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Atascadero Mutual Water Company in San Luis Obispo Superior Court on 10/15/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Notice of Related Case(s) #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 served on 11/10/21. (Queen, Daniel)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant 3M Company. Related Case(s): 2:20-CV-08897, 8:21-CV-01029 and 5:21-CV-01156 (Queen, Daniel)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 3M Company, (Queen, Daniel)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Luis Obispo County Superior Court, case number 21CVP-0274 Receipt No: ACACDC-32310566 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Daniel David Queen added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Queen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atascadero Mutual Water Company v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atascadero Mutual Water Company
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Don A Ernst
Represented By: Gary A Praglin
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Kelly Christina Weil
Represented By: Julie L Fieber
Represented By: Kyle J. McGee
Represented By: Theresa Vitale
Represented By: Viola Vetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel David Queen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company
Represented By: Adam M Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: Adam M Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuPont De Nemours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?