Michael Karmon et al v. California Institute of Technology et al
Plaintiff: Eyerly Michael, Michael Karmon, Galit Rubin and Adina Kraus
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC, California Institute of Technology, Fisher Scientific Company LLC, Metalclad Insulation Corporation and Does 1-300, inclusive
Petitioner: Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv08910
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Attorney for Defendant California Institute of Technology.(Budica, Stephen)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING NOTICE - IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC; #17 MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs; and #25 MOTION to Strike The Declaration of John C. Heubeck filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC - The motions are submitted. Order to issue. The hearing scheduled for 1/10/2022 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 6, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC. Request for John T. Williams to Attend 1.10.2022 Hearing by Zoom (Pietrykowski, Michael)
January 5, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE filed by defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC's Request to Appear by Phone (Zoom) (Carpenter, Erin)
January 5, 2022 Filing 38 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike The Declaration of John C. Heubeck #25 filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC. (Pietrykowski, Michael)
January 4, 2022 Filing 37 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Strike The Declaration of John C. Heubeck #25 - The motion hearing previously scheduled for 01/24/2022 at 1:30 p.m. has been rescheduled to 1/10/2022 at 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING NOTICE - IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The stipulation #29 , and the request to withdraw the ex parte application #33 are GRANTED. The Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction #7 set for 1/4/2022, is reset to 1/10/2022 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 29, 2021 Filing 35 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike The Declaration of John C. Heubeck #25 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Karmon, Adina Kraus, Galit Rubin. (Eyerly, Michael)
December 28, 2021 Filing 34 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen Eugene Budica on behalf of Defendant California Institute of Technology (Budica, Stephen)
December 28, 2021 Filing 33 REQUEST to Withdraw EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on to January 10, 2022 #28 filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC. (Pietrykowski, Michael)
December 27, 2021 Filing 32 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen Eugene Budica on behalf of Defendant California Institute of Technology (Attorney Stephen Eugene Budica added to party California Institute of Technology(pty:dft))(Budica, Stephen)
December 27, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #17 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Karmon, Adina Kraus, Galit Rubin. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Waiver and Notice of Disclaimer of Claims, #2 Proof of Service)(Eyerly, Michael)
December 27, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY in Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #7 filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC. (Pietrykowski, Michael)
December 23, 2021 Filing 29 STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion to Strike The Declaration of John C. Heubeck filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pietrykowski, Michael)
December 23, 2021 Filing 28 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on to January 10, 2022 filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Pietrykowski, Michael)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Morrison APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC, designating Michael J. Pietrykowski as local counsel. (mrgo)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney John T. Williams APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC, designating Michael J. Pietrykowski as local counsel. (mrgo)
December 20, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike The Declaration of John C. Heubeck filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pietrykowski, Michael)
December 20, 2021 Filing 24 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #17 filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC. (Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Fisher Scientific Company LLC(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
December 20, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Submission of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC. (Pietrykowski, Michael)
December 20, 2021 Filing 22 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #7 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Karmon, Adina Kraus, Galit Rubin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John C. Heubeck in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss)(Eyerly, Michael)
December 17, 2021 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Morrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32499949) filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Pietrykowski, Michael)
December 17, 2021 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John T. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32499609) filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Pietrykowski, Michael)
December 16, 2021 Filing 19 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #7 - Hearing on the motion is rescheduled to 1/10/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
December 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Michael Karmon, Adina Kraus, Galit Rubin. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Eyerly, Michael)
December 13, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Erin M Carpenter counsel for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Adding Paul A. Calfo as counsel of record for Metalclad Insulation LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Carpenter, Erin)
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Erin M Carpenter counsel for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Adding Bradford J. DeJardin as counsel of record for Metalclad Insulation LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Carpenter, Erin)
December 13, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Erin M Carpenter counsel for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Adding Erin Carpenter as counsel of record for Metalclad Insulation LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Carpenter, Erin)
December 13, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE filed by defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Notice of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Carpenter, Erin)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Case transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-08910 SVW(MRWx). (rn)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/3/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. In light of the transfer of this action to the calendar of the Honorable Fernando M. Olguin, the hearing on the Motion to Dismiss Case #7 is reset to 1/13/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08910 FMO(MRWx). (rn)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit D to Motion to Dismiss, #5 Proposed Order) (Pietrykowski, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
November 12, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants California Institute of Technology, Does, Fisher Scientific Company LLC, Metalclad Insulation LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Adina Kraus, Galit Rubin, Michael Karmon. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/2/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 12, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Adina Kraus, Galit Rubin, Michael Karmon, upon Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kennegi Duval, Records, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/14/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 12, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Adina Kraus, Galit Rubin, Michael Karmon, upon Defendant California Institute of Technology served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, CT Corp Clerk in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/15/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 12, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/10/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (Attorney Bradford J DeJardin added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Erin M Carpenter added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Angelo Calfo added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(lh)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. identifying Fisher Scientific International L.L.C. as Corporate Parent. (Pietrykowski, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.. (Pietrykowski, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior, case number 21STCV32564 Receipt No: ACACDC-32315347 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Michael J Pietrykowski added to party Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.(pty:bkmov))(Pietrykowski, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Karmon et al v. California Institute of Technology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eyerly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Karmon
Represented By: Michael C Eyerly
Represented By: Eric L Brown
Represented By: Patrick A DeBlase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galit Rubin
Represented By: Eric L Brown
Represented By: Michael C Eyerly
Represented By: Patrick A DeBlase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adina Kraus
Represented By: Eric L Brown
Represented By: Michael C Eyerly
Represented By: Patrick A DeBlase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael J Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Paul Angelo Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Institute of Technology
Represented By: Patrick E Stockalper
Represented By: Stephen Eugene Budica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher Scientific Company LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: John T. Williams
Represented By: Michael J. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Paul Angelo Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-300, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?