Audio-Technica Corporation et al v. Music Tribe Commercial NV Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Audio-Technica Corporation and Audio-Technica U.S., Inc.
Defendant: Music Tribe Commercial NV Inc., Music Tribe Global Brands LTD. and Music Tribe Commercial MY Sdn. Bhd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv09009
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Order DISMISSING Music Tribe Commercial NV Inc. and Music Tribe Brands Ltd. On January 5, 2022, Plaintiffs filed the First Amended Complaint #25 . Plaintiffs now name Music Tribe Commercial MY Sdn. Bhd. as the Defendant in this action. Music Tribe Commercial NV Inc. and Music Tribe Brands Ltd., the entities that Plaintiffs first sued, are no longer named as Defendants. Accordingly, Music Tribe Commercial NV Inc. and Music Tribe Brands Ltd. are DISMISSED from the action. (lc)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Music Tribe Commercial MY Sdn. Bhd. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Azlin, Kristina)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court received and reviewed the parties Joint Stipulation Regarding Filing of First Amended Complaint #21 , and copies of the proposed First Amended Complaint #23 . The Court finds that the justice is furthered by amendment and accordingly GRANTS the parties' stipulation. Plaintiffs shall file a clean, separate copy of the First Amended Complaint within three (3) Court days of the date of this Order. (lc)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Notice of Lodging First Amended Complaint re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #22 , Miscellaneous Document, #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Notice Ex. 2 Redline)(Azlin, Kristina)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER to File Copy of Proposed First Amended Complain. The parties to this action stipulate to allowing Plaintiff to file a First Amended Complaint in order to remove certain parties from, and add certain parties to, this action #21 . Central District Local Rule 15-1 requires parties who move or stipulate for leave to amend a pleading to attach the proposed amended pleading to the motion or stipulation. The parties did not do so in this case. Therefore, the parties are ORDERED to file a copy of the Proposed First Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Failure to do so will result in denial of the stipulation. (lc)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DISMISSAL OF PARTIES filed by Plaintiffs Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order REGARDING FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DISMISSAL OF PARTIES)(Azlin, Kristina)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony J. Fuga to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc. designating Kristina S. Azlin as local counsel #19 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony J. Fuga to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32461584) filed by Plaintiff(s) Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Azlin, Kristina)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Music Tribe Commercial NV Inc. answer now due 1/12/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Music Tribe Commercial NV Inc..(Attorney Brian K. Brookey added to party Music Tribe Commercial NV Inc.(pty:dft))(Brookey, Brian)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: ORDER DENYING WITHOUT Application of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony J. Fuga MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc. #13 . The Application is DENIED without prejudice to re-filing. Inthe Central District, it remains a requirement for pro hac vice applications that both the out-of-state attorney and local counsel sign the Application in physical ink on a piece of paper and then scan the piece of paper. Moreover, counsel is directed to include the entire case number on all subsequent filings, including the initials of the District Court Judge and the Magistrate Judge, as shown at the top of this Minute Order. Failure comply with this directive may result in the striking of a noncompliant document. Terming Attorney Anthony J. Fuga. (lc)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony J. Fuga to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32384413) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. (lt)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc., upon Defendant Music Tribe Commercial NV Inc. served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Azlin, Kristina)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. case number incorrect2:21-cv-09009-ODW-ASx In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony J. Fuga to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32384413) filed by Plaintiff Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Azlin, Kristina)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc.. (Azlin, Kristina)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Music Tribe Commercial NV Inc., Music Tribe Global Brands LTD. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant Music Tribe Global Brands LTD) (lh)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Anthony J. Fuga. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc.. (Azlin, Kristina)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff's Attorney All Plaintiffs, identifying Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc.. (Azlin, Kristina)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff's Attorney Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Azlin, Kristina)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32340475 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff's Attorney Audio-Technica Corporation, Audio-Technica U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Kristina Starr Azlin added to party Audio-Technica Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Kristina Starr Azlin added to party Audio-Technica U.S., Inc.(pty:pla))(Azlin, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Audio-Technica Corporation et al v. Music Tribe Commercial NV Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audio-Technica Corporation
Represented By: Kristina Starr Azlin
Represented By: Alex N Hadduck
Represented By: Anthony J. Fuga
Represented By: Alex N. Hadduck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audio-Technica U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Kristina Starr Azlin
Represented By: Alex N Hadduck
Represented By: Anthony J. Fuga
Represented By: Alex N. Hadduck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Music Tribe Commercial NV Inc.
Represented By: Brian K. Brookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Music Tribe Global Brands LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Music Tribe Commercial MY Sdn. Bhd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?