Beattie B. Ashmore et al v. Skip Dawson et al
Plaintiff: Beattie B. Ashmore
Defendant: Skip Dawson and S and S Holding Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv09010
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Filing 22 Writ of Execution issued against Skip Dawson re: Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution #21 . (bm)
September 19, 2022 Filing 21 Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Plaintiff Beattie B. Ashmore. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Execution)(Iezza, Nicolino)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court hereby orders that the request of Plaintiff Beattie B. Ashmore to substitute Lisa E Spiwak as attorney of record is hereby GRANTED.; granting #18 Request to Substitute Attorney. (aco)
August 11, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request Substitute Attorney (G-01). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
August 10, 2022 Filing 18 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iezza, Nicolino)
June 21, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent order granting Substitution of Attorney #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: submitted on an outdated form. The G-01 Substitution of Attorney with proposed order attachment should have been submitted (available on the court's website). Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests-Substitute Attorney (G-01). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
June 20, 2022 Filing 16 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Beattie B. Ashmore (Iezza, Nicolino)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT #2 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Defendant's motion to set aside judgment is DENIED. (iv)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE-IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Set Aside Judgment/MOTION to Vacate filed by Attorney for Defendants #2 - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing previously scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Andrew P Altholz counsel for Miscellaneous Norman J Kreisman. Changing address to Law Office of Norman J Kreisman 21700 Oxnard St Ste 1160 Woodland Hills CA 91367. Changing e-mail to norman4law@aol.com. Filed by Miscellaneous Norman J Kreisman. (Attorney Andrew P Altholz added to party Norman J Kreisman(pty:misc))(Altholz, Andrew)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER re DEFICIENCY IN ATTORNEY'S BUSINESS OR CONTACT INFORMATION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The contact information for attorney Norman J Kreisman is deficient in that no email address is listed on the Court's docket. If you are counsel of record in a case currently pending in this district and you need to update your business or contact information, you must file and serve Form G-06 ("Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information") in each of your pending cases. Doing so will satisfy your notice obligation under Local Rule 83-2.4. In addition, if you are a registered CM/ECF User, you must log in to your CM/ECF account and update your information directly in the CM/ECF System. See Local Rule 5-4.8.1. (bm)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #9 REQUEST to Substitute Attorney: Notice is hereby given that, subject to approval by the court, Beattie B. Ashmore, in his capacity, substitutes, as court appointed receiver for SCOTT A. KOHN, Future Income Payments LLC, JOSEPH P. HIP, KRAIG S. AIKEN, DAVID N. KENNEALLY and MELANIE JO SCHULZE-MILLER, Ethan J. Brown, as counsel of record in place of Lisa E. Spiwak. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (bm)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 SCHEDULING NOTICE - IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY re: MOTION to Set Aside Judgment/MOTION to Vacate #2 - The motion is set for hearing on 3/21/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Ethan J. Brown in place of attorney Lisa E. Spiwak filed by Plaintiff Beattie B. Ashmore. (Attorney Ethan J Brown added to party Beattie B. Ashmore(pty:pla)) (Brown, Ethan)
December 7, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned addressed to Norman J Kreisman re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #5 (mrgo)
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned addressed to Norman J Kreisman re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #4 (mrgo)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Nick Ireno Iezza counsel for Plaintiff Beattie B. Ashmore. Changing e-mail to lspiwak@sai-legal.com. Filed by Plaintiff Beattie B. Ashmore. (Attorney Nick Ireno Iezza added to party Beattie B. Ashmore(pty:pla))(Iezza, Nick)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re DEFICIENCY IN ATTORNEY'S BUSINESS OR CONTACT INFORMATION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The contact information for attorney Lisa E. Spiwak is deficient in that no email address is listed on the Court's docket. If you are counsel of record in a case currently pending in this district and you need to update your business or contact information, you must file and serve Form G-06 ("Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information") in each of your pending cases. (mrgo)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because subsequent filings have changed the nature of the case. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon are assigned to this new case number. All future documents must be filed under the new case number, which is 2:21-cv-09010 SVW (AFMx). The previous case number, 2:21-mc-01075-UA, is hereby terminated. (lh)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Judgment , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate filed by Attorney for Defendants Skip Dawson, S and S Holding Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Civ-30) (Attorney Andrew P Altholz added to party Skip Dawson(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew P Altholz added to party S and S Holding Company Inc (pty:dft)) (Altholz, Andrew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT received from USDC for the District of South Carolina, case number 6:20-cv-3600-BHH entered in the sending district on 6/24/2021. Entered in this district on 10/7/2021, filed by Plaintiff Beattie B. Ashmore. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beattie B. Ashmore et al v. Skip Dawson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beattie B. Ashmore
Represented By: Lisa E Spiwak
Represented By: Nicolino Iezza
Represented By: Ethan J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skip Dawson
Represented By: Andrew P Altholz
Represented By: Norman J Kreisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S and S Holding Company Inc
Represented By: Andrew P Altholz
Represented By: Norman J Kreisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?