Jerry A. Guzzetta et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: JERRY A. GUZZETTA and LYNN GUZZETTA
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Claimant: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv09151
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
2 Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second, Third, and Sixth Claims in the First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint #48 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Patricia H. Jun)(Jun, Patricia)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Claims 2, 3 and 6 and to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. (Attorney Michael L Tracy added to party Jerry A. Guzzetta(pty:pla), Attorney Michael L Tracy added to party Lynn Guzzetta(pty:pla))(Tracy, Michael)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES [ECF NO. #51 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered the Stipulation and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS as follows: The Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates submitted by the Paities as Exhibit A to the Joint Stipulation is hereby adopted, with the following dates to govern the trial and pretrial deadlines in this action: The Jury Trial is set for 1/8/2024 at 8:30 am. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/20/2023 at 9:00 a.m. The last date to hear motions is 9/28/2023. The discovery cut-off is 7/6/2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Notice of Withdrawal of Stipulation to Continue, #52 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun)(Jun, Patricia)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 [WITHDRAWN AS OF 2-22-23] Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial and All Related Deadlines from July 24, 2023 to December 4, 2023 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet, #2 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun, #3 Proposed Order)(Jun, Patricia) Modified on 2/24/2023 (yl).
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial and All Related Deadlines from August 21, 2023 to January 8, 2024 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet, #2 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun, #3 Proposed Order)(Jun, Patricia)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Caitlin Jane Scott counsel for Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. Adding Caitlin Scott as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jerry Guzzetta and Lynn Guzzetta. (Attorney Caitlin Jane Scott added to party Jerry A. Guzzetta(pty:pla), Attorney Caitlin Jane Scott added to party Lynn Guzzetta(pty:pla))(Scott, Caitlin)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second, Third, and Sixth Claims in the First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint #48 is continued to the 06/15/2023 at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall take notice of this new date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second, Third, and Sixth Claims in the First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Patricia J. Hun, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proposed Order) (Jun, Patricia)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY SEVEN DAYS #46 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Stipulation is GRANTED. Defendant Ford Motor Company's deadline to respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended through January 19, 2023. (lom)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ford Motor Company answer now due 1/19/2023, re Amended Complaint/Petition #45 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun, #2 Proposed Order)(Jun, Patricia)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Ford Motor Company amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Law, Daniel)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jerry A. Guzzetta and Lynn Guzzetta. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Jerry A. Guzzetta(pty:pla), Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Lynn Guzzetta(pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi counsel for Plaintiff Jerry A. Guzzetta. Adding Rabiya Tirmizi as counsel of record for Jerry A. Guzzetta and Lynn Guzzetta for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Jerry A. Guzzetta and Lynn Guzzetta. (Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Jerry A. Guzzetta(pty:pla))(Tirmizi, Rabiya)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS [ECF NO. #30 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. For the foregoing reasons, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. The Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED as to the violations of CAL. CIV. CODE 1793.2(a)(3), (b), (d), breach of express warranty, breach of implied warranty, and fraudulent omission claims (Claims 16) WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; and 2. The Guzzetta Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a First Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order if they still desire to pursue any of the claims being dismissed with leave to amend. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court finds the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant DOES #30 appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the motion hearing set for DECEMBER 1, 2022, is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. No appearances are necessary on December 1, 2022. The Joint Request for Remote Appearance #39 is denied as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES [ECF NO. 38] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered the Parties Joint Stipulation to Continue the Trial and Pre- Trial Dates and Deadlines and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the Joint Stipulation to Continue the Trial and Pre-Trial Dates and Deadlines and ORDERS as follows: The fact discovery cut-off is 2/15/2023.,The last date to hear motions is 5/4/2023. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/2/2023 at 1:00 PM. The Jury Trial id set for 8/21/2023 at 8:30 AM. (See document for further details) (yl)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Notice JOINT REQUEST FOR REMOTE APPEARANCE AT THE DECEMBER 1, 2022 HEARING FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Whang, Steven)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Dates and Deadlines from March 28, 2023 to August 21, 2023 filed by plaintiff Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES [DKT #__])(Whang, Steven)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES [ECF NO. 34] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (lom)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven Whang counsel for Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. Adding Steven Whang as counsel of record for Jerry A. Guzzetta and Lynn Guzzetta for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta and Lynn G. (Attorney Steven Whang added to party Jerry A. Guzzetta(pty:pla), Attorney Steven Whang added to party Lynn Guzzetta(pty:pla))(Whang, Steven)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Lien Filed on June 1, 2022 re: Notice of Lien #28 (Freed, Kenneth)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial from March 28, 2023 to June 27, 2023 filed by plaintiff Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES [DKT #__])(Dolin, Tionna)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, on its own motion, hereby continues the hearing on the pending Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #30 to December 1, 2022, at 10:00 am. The motion will be treated as fully briefed. Counsel shall take notice of this new date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #30 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Jun, Patricia)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #30 filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. (Law, Daniel)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant DOES. Motion set for hearing on 10/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. Jun, #2 Exhibit A to Decl. of P. Jun, #3 Exhibit B to Decl. of P. Jun, #4 Exhibit C to Decl. of P. Jun, #5 Exhibit D to Decl. of P. Jun, #6 Exhibit E to Decl. of P. Jun, #7 Proposed Order) (Attorney Patricia H. Jun added to party DOES(pty:dft)) (Jun, Patricia)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta and Lynn Guzzetta. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Lien Claimant Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.. (Freed, Kenneth)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Jerry A. Guzzetta and Lynn Guzzetta for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta and Lynn Guzzetta. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Jerry A. Guzzetta(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Lynn Guzzetta(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND [ECF NO. 14,21] AND GRANTING REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE [ECF NO. 15, 22, 23] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court hereby DENIES the Motion to Remand, GRANTS the Guzzetta Plaintiffs unopposed Request to take judicial notice of Exhibits AJ, and GRANTS Fords unopposed Request to take judicial notice of the parties Lease Agreement. denying #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court; denying #21 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court. (See document for further details) (rolm)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court finds the Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #14 and the Renewed Motion #21 appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the motion hearing set for March 31, 2022, is removed from the calendar and the motions are taken under submission. No appearances are necessary on March 31, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY in Support of Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. (Law, Daniel)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPPOSITION re: Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Mortenson)(Mortenson, Michael)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. (Law, Daniel)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. Motion set for hearing on 3/31/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Law In Support of Remand, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand) (Law, Daniel)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement Pursuant to Reassignment Order filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Please refer to the attached order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-005) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, this case is transferred from Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha to the calendar of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09151 MEMF(PVCx). (rn)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Jerry A. Guzzetta(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Lynn Guzzetta(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Jerry A. Guzzetta(pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Lynn Guzzetta(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #14 filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Law, Daniel)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiffs' Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand) (Law, Daniel)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, TRIAL REQUIREMENTS, AND CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2023 01:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 3/28/2023 08:30 AM; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 3/10/2023 at 01:00 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 02/03/2023. (tf)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the January 21, 2022, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7, filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Pretrial and trial Dates Worksheet)(Law, Daniel)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta, Lynn Guzzetta. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jerry A. Guzzetta and Lynn Guzzetta. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Jerry A. Guzzetta(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Lynn Guzzetta(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 1:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (pg)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (pg)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/2/2021, attached as Exhibit 2.(jtil)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jerry A. Guzzetta and Lynn Guzzetta in Los Angeles Superior Court on 11/22/2021, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, (Mortenson, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Mortenson, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV24263 Receipt No: ACACDC-32369784 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #7 Exhibit 6 to Decl. of M. Mortenson) (Attorney Michael Donn Mortenson added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY (pty:dft))(Mortenson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerry A. Guzzetta et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY A. GUZZETTA
Represented By: Kevin Y Jacobson
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Caitlin Jane Scott
Represented By: Michael L Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNN GUZZETTA
Represented By: Kevin Y Jacobson
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Caitlin Jane Scott
Represented By: Michael L Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Represented By: Patricia H Jun
Represented By: Craig A Taggart
Represented By: Patricia H. Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Represented By: Patricia H. Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?