Sargiz Shamouni v. Subaru of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sargiz Shamouni
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc., Ladin Hyundai Subaru and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Petitioner: Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv09273
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 4, 2022 Filing 34 Receipt of Acknowledgment of documents by Los Angeles Superior Court, case no. 20STCV44433. (lom)
February 8, 2022 Filing 33 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case number: 20STCV44433. (jp)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [DE #20 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: SOA has failed to establish the jurisdictional amount by a preponderance of evidence. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (See attached Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp)
January 29, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 , calendared for hearing on January 31, 2022, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The court will review the matter without hearing any further arguments in person or on paper. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 18, 2022 Filing 29 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 filed by Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Law, Daniel)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Reply (Motion related) #25 , #26 , #27 , for the following reasons: (1) Document submitted in the wrong case; (2) Documents 25-26 are a state court case; Document 27 contains single-spaced text, LR 11-3.6. Counsel may correctly file the reply not later than 3:00 pm on January 18, 2022. (jp)
January 14, 2022 Filing 27 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 1/18/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #28 ] - REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 filed by Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Law, Daniel). Modified on 1/18/2022 (jp).
January 14, 2022 Filing 26 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 1/18/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #28 ] - REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 filed by Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Law, Daniel). Modified on 1/18/2022 (jp).
January 14, 2022 Filing 25 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 1/18/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #28 ] - REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 filed by Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Law, Daniel). Modified on 1/18/2022 (jp).
January 10, 2022 Filing 24 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc.. Exhibit C to Dec. of K Ruggerello as to MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #22 . (Ruggerello, Ryan)
January 10, 2022 Filing 23 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan P Ruggerello on behalf of Defendant Subaru of America, Inc. (Ruggerello, Ryan)
January 10, 2022 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion for Remand filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K Ruggerello, #2 Exhibit A Sales Contract, #3 Exhibit B Response to Special Interrogatories)(Ruggerello, Ryan)
January 3, 2022 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 filed by Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. (Law, Daniel)
January 3, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. Motion set for hearing on 1/31/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Karin Kuemerle In Support of Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Karin Kuemerle, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Karin Kuemerle, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Law, Daniel)
January 3, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni (Law, Daniel)
January 3, 2022 Filing 18 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni, identifying Sargiz Shamouni. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Sargiz Shamouni(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #14 , for the following reasons: (1) No Certification of Interested Parties and/or no copies; (2) Memorandum of Points and Authorities contains single-spaced text. LR 11-3.6. (jp)
December 29, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange filed by Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
December 29, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #14 filed by Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. (Kuemerle, Karin)
December 29, 2021 Filing 14 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 1/3/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #17 ] - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange filed by Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. Motion set for hearing on 1/31/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Karin Kuemerle in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Kuemerle, Karin). Modified on 1/3/2022 (jp).
December 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Sargiz Shamouni(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/28/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2022 at 9:00 am. (jgr)
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 APPENDIX filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc.. Re: State Court Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Ruggerello, Ryan)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc..(Ruggerello, Ryan)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (pg)
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh)
November 29, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Ladin Hyundai Subaru, Subaru of America, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Sargiz Shamouni. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/19/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation, identifying Subaru Corporation. (Ruggerello, Ryan)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Kristan Ruggerello re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Movant Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ruggerello, Ryan)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation.. (Ruggerello, Ryan)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation. (Ruggerello, Ryan)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV44433 Receipt No: ACACDC-32396629 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation. (Attorney Ryan P Ruggerello added to party Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation(pty:bkmov))(Ruggerello, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sargiz Shamouni v. Subaru of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation
Represented By: Ryan P Ruggerello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sargiz Shamouni
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan P Ruggerello
Represented By: Julie A Goerlinger
Represented By: Kristan Louise Ruggerello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladin Hyundai Subaru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?