Steven H. Alcaraz v. County of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Steven H. Alcaraz
Defendant: County of Los Angeles, Jim McDonnell and MCJ Medical Staff Private Medical Care Service
Case Number: 2:2021cv09288
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Re: Certified Trust Account Statement by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: The Court requests that prison officials at Sierra Conservation Center provide Plaintiff with a certified copy of his trust account statement and certificate of authorized officer. The Court hereby extends the deadline for Plaintiff to resubmit his Complaint, along with his IFP Request, certified trust account statement for the last six months and certificate of authorized officer to January 31, 2022. Granting #5 MOTION for Enlargement of Time. [See document for details.] (es)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Enlargement of Time of 30-Days Beyond the 30 Days Allotted by the District Court and Declaration filed by plaintiff Steven H. Alcaraz. (es)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES #2 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is: DENIED, with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. (iv)
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Steven H Alcaraz. (et)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants County of Los Angeles, MCJ Medical Staff Private Medical Care Service(Doctor(s), Physician(s) and Nurses, individual), MCJ Medical Staff Private Medical Care Service(Doctor(s), Physician(s) and Nurses, official capacity), Jim McDonnell pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue., filed by Plaintiff Steven H Alcaraz. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven H. Alcaraz v. County of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven H. Alcaraz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCJ Medical Staff Private Medical Care Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?