Helen Kramer v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Helen Kramer
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv09711
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Helen Kramer, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 1/7/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to R Childress. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Illegible. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Gilinger, Lisa)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. [See document for details.] (et)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. [See document for further details.] (et)
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (et)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (et)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Helen Kramer. (Gilinger, Lisa)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Helen Kramer. (Gilinger, Lisa)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Helen Kramer, (Gilinger, Lisa)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Helen Kramer. (Gilinger, Lisa)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Helen Kramer. (Attorney Lisa C Gilinger added to party Helen Kramer(pty:pla))(Gilinger, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helen Kramer v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Kramer
Represented By: Lisa C Gilinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?