Komaravel Assaippillai v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Komaravel Assaippillai
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv09715
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV21-9715 KK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
February 7, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF Komaravel Assaippillai. (Panutich, Alex)
February 7, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Komaravel Assaippillai, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 1/26/2022, answer due 4/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C.VELOZ. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to CLERK. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to CIVIL PROCESS CLERK. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Ver Planck, Mark)
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Lynn M Harada added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Harada, Lynn)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (see document for details) (hr)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (hr)
January 4, 2022 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-32564228 for $402 filing fee. (Panutich, Alex)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Denying #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Reasons: Inadequate showing of indigency. Plaintiff has $100,000 in a savings account. (gk)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by PLAINTIFF Komaravel Assaippillai. (Panutich, Alex)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Komaravel Assaippillai, (Panutich, Alex)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by PLAINTIFF Komaravel Assaippillai. (Panutich, Alex)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Komaravel Assaippillai. (Panutich, Alex)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by PLAINTIFF Komaravel Assaippillai. (Attorney Alex Panutich added to party Komaravel Assaippillai(pty:pla))(Panutich, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Komaravel Assaippillai v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Komaravel Assaippillai
Represented By: Alex Panutich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Lynn M Harada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?