Vidala Aaronoff v. Curtis R. Olson et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Buchalter, P.C., Eric Kennedy, Ashley Milnes, Curtis R. Olson, Leonard Kyle Dykstra, Ryan Vogt-Lowell, Buchalter, PC, Lamdien Le, Slaughter, Reagan and Cole, LLP, Marlene Burris, Debra Rivera, Michael Convey, Emily Spear, Cindy Kim, Deputy Sheriff Offic Doe Koo and Does 1-40, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv09747
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Patricia Donahue
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #81 filed by Vidala Aaronoff. CCA # 23-55219. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed as to appellees Curtis R. Olson, Ryan Vogt-Lowell, Eric Kennedy, Ashley Milnes, and Buchalter, PC, only. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Costs and fees shall be allocated pursuant to the parties stipulation. A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court as to appellees Curtis R. Olson, Ryan Vogt-Lowell, Eric Kennedy, Ashley Milnes, and Buchalter, PC, only. The remainder of the briefing schedule for the remaining parties is unchanged. (mat)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #81 filed by Vidala Aaronoff. CCA # 23-55219. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed as to appellees Lamdien Le and Slaughter, Reagan and Cole, LLP, only. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Costs and fees shall be allocated pursuant to the parties' stipulation. A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court as to appellees Lamdien Le and Slaughter, Reagan and Cole, LLP, only. (mat)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #81 filed by Vidala Aaronoff. CCA # 23-55219. Appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The (9th CCA) Clerk will amend the docket to reflect this status. [See document for more details.](mat)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DENIED by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. RE: REQUESTS FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL #80 , #83 . The Court dismissed this case with prejudice and denied Plaintiff leave to proceed anonymously. Dkt. Nos. 75, 76. Plaintiff seeks to appeal this case and has filed requests for leave to file her notice of appeal under seal or for leave to file the notices anonymously. Dkt. Nos. 80, 83. The clerk has docketed versions of Plaintiffs notice of appeal using a fictitious name. Dkt. Nos. 81, 82. The Ninth Circuit has received the notices and begun appellate proceedings. See Dkt. Nos. 84, 85. This Court has already ruled on the question whether Plaintiff can file this case anonymously. To the extent Plaintiff seeks to proceed with her appeal using a fictitious name, that issue must be raised before the Ninth Circuit. Accordingly, Plaintiff's requests are DENIED without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mat)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #81 filed by Vidala Aaronoff. CCA # 23-55219. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The filing of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis will automatically stay the briefing schedule under Ninth Circuit Rule 27-11. The Clerk shall serve a Form 4 financial affidavit on appellant. If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal may be dismissed by the (9th CCA) Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. (Attachments: #1 Instructions for Form Motion for IFP, #2 Motion and Affidavit for Permission to Proceed in Forma Pauperis)(mat)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 23-55219 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #81 as to Plaintiff Vidala Aaronoff. (mat)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REDACTED CORRECTED FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff Vidala Aaronoff. (mat)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REDACTED CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by Plaintiff Vidala Aaronoff. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #81 Filed On: 3/6/23; Entered On: 3/8/23. (mat)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REDACTED NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. Appeal of Judgment, #79 Filed On: 2/2/23; Entered On: 2/3/23; In forma pauperis granted on 1/21/22, see item 19 (mat)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL, filed by PlaintiffJane Doe. (mat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2023: #1 Proposed Order for Leave to File Document Under Seal) (mat).
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: It is hereby ordered, adjudged, and decreed that: (1) Plaintiff's claims against Buchalter, PC, Leonard Kyle Dykstra, Eric Kennedy, Ashley Milnes, Curtis R. Olson, and Ryan Vogt-Lowell are dismissed without prejudice; (2) Plaintiff's claims against Lamdien Le and Slaughter, Reagan & Cole,LLP are dismissed with prejudice based on the representation that the parties negotiated a settlement, Dkt. No. 65; (3) Plaintiff's claims against Marlene Burris, Michael Convey, Cindy Kim, William Koo, Debra Rivera, and Emily Spear are dismissed with prejudice. This is a Final Judgment. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 REPLY BRIEF of Vidala Aaronoff in the California Court of Appeal Second Appellate District, Division 2. (jgr)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Appellant Aaronoff's Opening Brief in the Court of Appeal of the State of California Second Appellate District, Division Two (jgr)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS ANT ANTI-SLAPP MOTION (Dkt. Nos. #38 , #39 , #40 , #43 ) by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (jgr)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Plaintiff is DENIED leave to proceed anonymously. The Clerk is ordered to adjust the docket and title of this action to reflect Plaintiff's name, Vidala Aaronoff. See order for details. (jgr)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXEMPTION FROM PACER FEES by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Plaintiff, who was approved to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) in this matter, filed a request to exempt her from paying PACER fees accrued since 10/1/2022 #73 . Plaintiff's request is GRANTED IN PART. Any PACER fees charged to Plaintiff for accessing documents filed in this action from 10/1/2022 through 1/30/2023 (to give Plaintiff the opportunity to download any filings in this case she has not already saved) are EXEMPT. Plaintiff's request is otherwise DENIED without prejudice. (gk)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (rolm)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DECLARATION in Response to Order to Show Cause #71 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(rolm)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing no later than January 9, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. why the Court should continue allowing her to proceed under the fictitious name Jane Doe. Failure to timely reply to this order to show cause will result in disclosure of her name. Plaintiff shall limit her response to addressing the narrow question presented in this Order to Show Cause and shall not use the response as an opportunity to argue the merits of any pending defense motion. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (jgr)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Request Oral Argument on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #39 , #40 , #38 , #43 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (jgr)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Defendant Buchalter, PC is directed to lodge Plaintiff Jane Doe's opening and reply briefs in the appeals of the state court cases identified at Dkt. No. #38 by emailing them to SB_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov no later than 5:00 p.m. on December 13, 2022. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Plaintiff has informally requested a continuance of the hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss set for December 16, 2022 and has represented that she has obtained the consent of all Defendants. The Court hereby VACATES the hearing set for December 16. The Court will set the matter for hearing at a later date, unless it elects to submit it for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the hearing on Defendants' motions to dismiss to 8:30 a.m. on December 16, 2022 in Courtroom 6C. Dkt. No. #38 , #39 , #40 , #43 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #38 filed by Defendants Marlene Burris, Michael Convey, Cindy Kim, Debra Rivera, Emily Spear. (Frazier-Krane, Lindsay)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to Lamdien T. Le and Slaughter, Reagan & Cole LLP's Special Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to CCP 425.16 [Dkt. No. 40] filed by Defendant Lamdien Le. (Newcomb, Jennifer)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #43 filed by Defendant Doe Koo. (Fuentes, Raymond)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CORRECTED RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Spear, Convey, Kim, Burris and Rivera #38 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (gk)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Spear, Convey, Kim, Burris and Rivera #59 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (gk)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RESPONSE to Defendant William Koo's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) #43 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (gk)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE to Request of Defendants Convey, Spear, Kim Burris and Rivera for Judicial Notice re #38 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (gk)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Spear, Convey, Kim, Burris and Rivera #38 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (gk)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE to Rule 12(b)(6) Motion of Defendants Buchalter, P.C.; Kennedy; and Milnes #39 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (gk)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RESPONSE to CCP Section 425.16 Motion of Defendants Slaughter, Reagan and Cole, LLP, and Lamdien Le #40 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (gk)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE #55 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court CONTINUES the hearing on Defendants' motions to dismiss to December 9, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6C. Plaintiff's oppositions are due by November 14, and Defendants' replies, if any, are due by November 21. In light of the extensive delay already allowed, the Court does not expect to grant any further extensions of Plaintiff's briefing deadlines. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (jgr)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motions (Dkt. Nos. #38 , #39 , #40 , #43 ) filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (jgr)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew J. Waxler counsel for Defendant Slaughter, Reagan and Cole, LLP. Robert Scott Silver is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Slaughter, Reagan & Cole LLP. (Waxler, Andrew)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew J. Waxler counsel for Defendant Slaughter, Reagan and Cole, LLP. Adding Jennifer E. Newcomb as counsel of record for Lamdien T. Le; Slaughter, Reagan & Cole LLP for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Slaughter Reagan & Cole LLP. (Waxler, Andrew)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Change of address by Raymond J Fuentes attorney for Defendant Doe Koo. Changing attorneys address to 700 N. Central Avenue, Suite 470, Glendale, CA. 91203. Filed by Defendant Doe Koo. (Fuentes, Raymond)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTES OF Status Conference and Plaintiff's Counsel's Request to Withdraw held before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's counsel, G. Scott Sobel's request to withdraw as counsel #49 for the reasons indicated on the record, and Mr. Sobel is relieved from his duties in this matter. Plaintiff is therefore responsible for prosecuting her case pro se until such time as she obtains new counsel. Mr. Sobels prior requests for extensions to accommodate his medical situation #34 , #36 are therefore DENIED as moot. To allow Plaintiff a reasonable opportunity to retain new counsel, the Court STAYS this matter for 60 days, until 9/20/2022. Plaintiff, either through new counsel or pro se, shall file her oppositions to the pending motions to dismiss #38 , #39 , #40 , #43 no later than 10/21/2022. Defendants' replies, if any, are due no later than 11/4/2022. The Court SETS the pending motions to dismiss for an in-person hearing on 11/18/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (gk)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court will address Mr. Sobel's request to withdraw and Plaintiff's request for more time to obtain new representation #49 at the 7/22/2022 hearing. In addition to Mr. Sobel, Plaintiff is ORDERED to appear at the hearing at 8:30 AM on 7/22/2022. Consistent with the accommodation provided to counsel, Plaintiff may appear either remotely or in person at the hearing. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REQUEST of G. Scott Sobel to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Sobel, G)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTES OF Status Conference and Order for Plaintiff to Respond and for Hearing before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.: The Court will allow the amendment, and the Second Amended Complaint #37 is DEEMED FILED. The motions at Dkt Nos. #5 , #8 , #11 , #21 to dismiss or strike the prior pleadings are DENIED as moot. Before determining an appropriate briefing schedule for the remaining motions or issuing a case management order, the Court must first determine whether Plaintiff's counsel, Mr. Sobel, is able effectively to represent her, either at present or after a reasonable continuance. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a written response no later than 7/13/2022, indicating whether Mr. Sobel intends to proceed with his representation of Plaintiff and, if so, what reasonable scheduling accommodations he requests that will allow him to provide effective representation. The parties are further ORDERED to appear at a hearing on 7/22/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr., so that the Court can resolve the matter of Plaintiff's representation and any required scheduling accommodations. Upon further reflection, the Court defers setting a mandatory scheduling conference or briefing deadlines for the pending motions until after the July 22 hearing. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (gk)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE DESIGNATING LEAD ATTORNEY filed by defendants Marlene Burris(in her judicial officer capacity as a court reporter), Michael Convey(as an individual), Cindy Kim(in her judicial officer capacity as Court Clerk and Judicial Assistant), Debra Rivera(in her judicial officer capacity as a court reporter), Emily Spear(as an individual). (Overton, Sarah)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court intends to enter a case management order but first must determine whether Plaintiffs most recent amended pleading should be allowed and whether Plaintiffs counsel is able to represent her effectively at present or after a reasonable delay to accommodate his medical issues. Accordingly, the Court SETS an in-person Status Conference on 7/8/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #43 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. On 6/28/2022, the reference to a magistrate judge under G.O. 05-07 was vacated. The filer set this matter before Magistrate Judge Donahue on 8/9/2022 at 10:00 AM, and should have been set before Judge Blumenfeld. Judge Blumenfeld hears civil motions on Fridays at 8:30 AM. Please review the court's website for available dates. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Doe Koo(an individual). Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fuentes, Raymond)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the "NOTICE TO COUNSEL" portion of the form was not completed. Completed form is attached. Re: Vacating Reference to Magistrate Judge (CV-114), #41 (Attachments: #1 CV114) (aco) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/28/2022) (aco).
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 06/28/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 42] ORDER VACATING REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Reference to the above case to United States Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahuepursuant to General Order 05-07 is hereby vacated. All further proceedings in this action shall be before the District Judge assigned. The case is referred to the same Magistrate Judge for discovery. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-09747-SB-PDx. (aco) Modified on 6/28/2022 (aco).
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint Pursuant to CCP 425.16 filed by Defendant Lamdien Le(in his capacity as an officer of the court). Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice) (Attorney Andrew J. Waxler added to party Lamdien Le(pty:dft)) (Waxler, Andrew)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants, Eric Kennedy and Ashley Milnes, Buchalter, PC. Motion set for hearing on 7/19/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (Fisher, Michael)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Marlene Burris(in her judicial officer capacity as a court reporter), Michael Convey(in his official capacity as Justice of the Superior Court of Los Angeles County), Cindy Kim(in her judicial officer capacity as Court Clerk and Judicial Assistant), Debra Rivera(in her judicial officer capacity as a court reporter), Emily Spear(in her official capacity as Justice of the Superior Court of Los Angeles County and as Deputy District of Attorney of Los Angeles). Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Frazier-Krane, Lindsay)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 [SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed as] first AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Michael Convey(as an individual) amending Amended Complaint,,,,,, filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe(Sobel, G) Modified on 7/11/2022 (gk).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Motions to Dismiss/Strike filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Request) (Sobel, G)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST MOTION for Consideration of ADA Request for Accommodation #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Counsel filed a State Court form instead of filing a Request for Extension of Time and Proposed Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REQUEST MOTION for Consideration of ADA Request for Accommodation filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Sobel, G)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Mail Returned addressed to Jane Doe 9461 Charleville Boulevard No. 259 Beverly Hills CA 90212 re Order on Request to Substitute Attorney #32 (es)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: Granting #28 Request to Substitute Attorney G Scott Sobel Retained counsel as attorney of record instead of Jane Doe, pro per. (es)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Granting Plaintiff's Third Request for an Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike [Dkt. No. 27.] by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: For good cause shown, Plaintiff's request for an extension of time is granted. The Court is not inclined to grant another extension absent good cause. By this Order, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: 1. Plaintiff shall file her oppositions to the Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike [Dkt. Nos. 5, 8, 11, 21] by June 13, 2022; and 2. Defendants' optional replies shall be filed by June 20, 2022. After that date, the Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike will be deemed submitted. Granting #27 REQUEST for Extension of Time. [See Order for further details.] (es)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of address by Andrew J. Waxler attorney for Defendant Slaughter, Reagan and Cole, LLP. Changing attorneys address to 21515 Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 450, Torrance, CA 90503. Filed by Defendant Slaughter, Reagan and Cole, LLP. (Attorney Andrew J. Waxler added to party Slaughter, Reagan and Cole, LLP(pty:dft))(Waxler, Andrew)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Jane Doe, re REQUEST for Extension of Time to File #27 , REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY OF COUNSEL #28 served on 5/10/22. (es)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (es)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REQUEST for Extension filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (es)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Granting Plaintiff's Second Request for an Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike [Dkt. No. 24.] by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: By this Order, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: 1. Plaintiff shall file her oppositions to the Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike [Dkt. Nos. #5 , #8 , #11 , #21 ] by May 13, 2022; and 2. Defendants' optional replies shall be filed by May 20, 2022. After that date, the Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike will be deemed submitted. Granting #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. [See Order for details.] (es)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Jane Doe, re REQUEST for Extension #24 served on 3/16/22. (es)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST for Extension filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (es)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) Order Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendant William Koo's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint [Dkt. No. #21 ] by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: The hearing date is vacated. The Motion to Dismiss will be considered on the papers filed by the parties, absent further Court order. By this Order, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: 1. Plaintiff shall file her response to the Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 21] by March 29, 2022; and 2. Defendant's optional reply shall be filed by April 5, 2022. After that date, the Motion to Dismiss will be deemed submitted. (es)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Doe Koo(an individual), identifying Plaintiff Jane Doe, County of Los Angeles, Deputy/Bailiff William Koo. (Attorney Raymond J Fuentes added to party Doe Koo(pty:dft))(Fuentes, Raymond)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Doe Koo(his official Deputy Sheriff capacity ) filed by Defendant Doe Koo(his official Deputy Sheriff capacity ). Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Raymond J Fuentes added to party Doe Koo(pty:dft)) (Fuentes, Raymond)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike [Dkt. No. 17.] by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: By this Order, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: 1. Plaintiff shall file her oppositions to the Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike [Dkt. Nos. #5 , #8 , #11 ] by March 23, 2022; and 2. Defendants' optional replies shall be filed by March 30, 2022. After that date, the Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike will be deemed submitted. Granting #17 REQUEST for Extension of Time. (es)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Granting #16 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (es)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Jane Doe, re REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #5 ; #17 #8 served on 1/20/22. (es)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #5 ; Opposition to Motion to Strike #8 ; Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #11 filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (es)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (es)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) Order Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint [Dkt. No. 11.] by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: Defendants set a hearing for February 15, 2022 before the Honorable Patricia Donahue. The hearing date is vacated. The Motion to Dismiss will be considered on the papers filed by the parties, absent further Court order. By this Order, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: 1. Plaintiff shall file her response to the Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 11] by February 10, 2022; and 2. Defendants' optional reply shall be filed by February 17, 2022. After that date, the Motion to Dismiss will be deemed submitted. re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 (es)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Marlene Burris, Michael Convey, Cindy Kim, Debra Rivera, Emily Spear. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 (Frazier-Krane, Lindsay)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lindsay N Frazier-Krane counsel for Defendants Marlene Burris, Michael Convey, Cindy Kim, Debra Rivera, Emily Spear. Adding Lindsay N. Frazier-Krane as counsel of record for Defendants for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Convey, Spear, Kim, Burris and Rivera. (Attorney Lindsay N Frazier-Krane added to party Marlene Burris(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay N Frazier-Krane added to party Michael Convey(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay N Frazier-Krane added to party Cindy Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay N Frazier-Krane added to party Debra Rivera(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsay N Frazier-Krane added to party Emily Spear(pty:dft))(Frazier-Krane, Lindsay)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Defendants Marlene Burris, Michael Convey, Cindy Kim, Debra Rivera, Emily Spear. (Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Marlene Burris(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Cindy Kim(pty:dft))(Overton, Sarah)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Marlene Burris(an individual), Michael Convey(as an individual), Cindy Kim(an individual), Debra Rivera(in her judicial officer capacity as a court reporter), Emily Spear(as an individual). Motion set for hearing on 2/15/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Marlene Burris(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Michael Convey(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Cindy Kim(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Debra Rivera(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Emily Spear(pty:dft)) (Overton, Sarah)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew J Waxler counsel for Defendant Lamdien Le. Adding Robert Scott Silver as counsel of record for Defendants Lamdien Le and Slaughter, Reagan & Cole, LLP for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Defendant. (Waxler, Andrew)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) Order Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Special Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint [Dkt. No. #8 .] by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: The hearing date is vacated. The Motion to Strike will be considered on the papers filed by the parties, absent further Court order. By this Order, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: 1. Plaintiff shall file her Opposition to the Motion to Strike by February 1, 2022; and 2. Defendants' optional reply shall be filed by February 8, 2022. After that date, the motion to strike will be deemed submitted. re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #8 [See document for further details.] (es)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Lamdien Le(an individual). Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2022 at 08:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. (Attachments: #1 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Declaration Declaration of Lamdien Le In Support of anti-SLAPP Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Dec of Le - Transcript of Proceedings, #4 Declaration Declaration of Guillermo Partida In Support of anti-SLAPP Motion, #5 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of anti-SLAPP Motion, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A to RJN - Complaint for Damages 12-9-16, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B to RJN - Operative FAC 8-29-18) (Attorney Andrew J Waxler added to party Lamdien Le(pty:dft)) (Waxler, Andrew)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) Order Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint [Dkt. No. 5.] by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: The hearing date is vacated. By this Order, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: 1. Plaintiff shall file her response to the Motion to Dismiss by January 25, 2022; 2. Defendants' optional reply shall be filed by February 1, 2022. After that date, the Motion to Dismiss will be deemed submitted. re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #5 (es)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Eric Kennedy, Ashley Milnes, Buchalter, PC. Motion set for hearing on 2/15/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (Fisher, Michael)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Buchalter, PC, Marlene Burris(in her judicial officer capacity as a court reporter), Marlene Burris(an individual), Michael Convey(as an individual), Michael Convey(in his official capacity as Justice of the Superior Court of Los Angeles County), Does, Leonard Kyle Dykstra, Eric Kennedy(an individual), Eric Kennedy(and in his capacity as an officer of the court), Cindy Kim(in her judicial officer capacity as Court Clerk and Judicial Assistant), Cindy Kim(an individual), Doe Koo(an individual), Doe Koo(his official Deputy Sheriff capacity ), Lamdien Le(an individual), Lamdien Le(in his capacity as an officer of the court), Ashley Milnes(in his capacity as an officer of the court), Ashley Milnes(an individual), Curtis R. Olson, Debra Rivera(in her judicial officer capacity as a court reporter), Debra Rivera(an individual), Slaughter, Reagan and Cole, LLP, Emily Spear(as an individual), Emily Spear(in her official capacity as Justice of the Superior Court of Los Angeles County and as Deputy District of Attorney of Los Angeles), Ryan Vogt-Lowell amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/15/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Buchalter, P.C., Eric Kennedy, Ashley Milnes, (Fisher, Michael)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Buchalter, P.C., Eric Kennedy, Ashley Milnes. (Fisher, Michael)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19stcv41255 Receipt No: ACACDC-32495413 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ashley Milnes, Eric Kennedy, Buchalter, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Filed First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-State Filed Summons First Amended Complaint) (Attorney Michael B Fisher added to party Buchalter, P.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael B Fisher added to party Eric Kennedy(pty:dft), Attorney Michael B Fisher added to party Ashley Milnes(pty:dft))(Fisher, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vidala Aaronoff v. Curtis R. Olson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: G Scott Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buchalter, P.C.
Represented By: Michael B Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Kennedy
Represented By: Michael B Fisher
Represented By: Anita Barooni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Milnes
Represented By: Michael B Fisher
Represented By: Anita Barooni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis R. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Kyle Dykstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Vogt-Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buchalter, PC
Represented By: Michael B Fisher
Represented By: Anita Barooni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamdien Le
Represented By: Robert Scott Silver
Represented By: Andrew J Waxler
Represented By: Andrew J. Waxler
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slaughter, Reagan and Cole, LLP
Represented By: Robert Scott Silver
Represented By: Andrew J. Waxler
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Burris
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Represented By: Lindsay N Frazier-Krane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Rivera
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Represented By: Lindsay N Frazier-Krane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Convey
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Represented By: Lindsay N Frazier-Krane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Spear
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Represented By: Lindsay N Frazier-Krane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Kim
Represented By: Sarah L Overton
Represented By: Lindsay N Frazier-Krane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Offic Doe Koo
Represented By: Raymond J Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-40, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?