Pete Contreras v. Christopher A. Wray et al
Plaintiff: Peter Contreras and Pete Contreras
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray, Kristi Koons Johnson, Bernard Melekian, Victor Obasohan, Jennifer Rasiah, Joe Pulido, Federal Bureau of Investigation, John Does, DOES 1-10, Santiago Vega, City of Los Angeles and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv09797
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Filing 74 JUDGMENT by Judge James V. Selna, Pursuant to the Order Accepting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed with prejudice. Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations, #73 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge James V. Selna for NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #58 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file A Second Amended Complaint #33 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Early Discovery #65 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, [FRCP 15(a) #41 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration #69 IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants' motions to dismiss are granted with prejudice. 2. Plaintiff's motions for leave to amend, a stay, discovery, and reconsideration are denied. 3. Judgment be entered consistent with this order. 4. The clerk serve this Order and the Judgment on all counsel or parties of record. (es)
December 5, 2022 Filing 72 Plaintiff OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued), #71 Request for DNA Analysis of Two IED's, Evaluation of Twenty Sets of Finger Prints and Face Recognition on Photos of Undercover FBI Agents filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras.(es) Modified on 12/7/2022 (es).
November 15, 2022 Filing 71 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #58 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file A Second Amended Complaint #33 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Early Discovery #65 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, [FRCP 15(a) #41 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 , Complaint - (Referred), #1 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration #69 IT IS RECOMMENDED that theDistrict Judge accept this Report and Recommendation; grant Defendant Rasiah's motion to dismiss; grant Defendants FBI and United States of America's motion to dismiss; deny Plaintiff's motions for leave to amend, a stay, discovery, and reconsideration; and direct that judgment be entered for Defendants and against Plaintiff, dismissing this action with prejudice. (es)
November 15, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Objections to R&R due by 12/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment.Report and Recommendation) (es)
September 13, 2022 Filing 69 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FOR AN ORDER IN REM FOR TESTING BY A THIRD-PARTY INDEPENDENT LABORATORY TO ANALYZE TWO IMPROVISED EXPLOSIVE DEVICES AND TWENTY SEPARATE FINGER PRINT SAMPLES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by plaintiff Pete Contreras. Motion set for hearing on 10/13/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (es)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge James V. Selna for Report and Recommendation (Issued), #47 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Report and Recommendation is accepted. 2. Defendant Pulido's motion to dismiss is granted, and the claims against him are dismissed with prejudice. 3. Defendants Obasohan, Vega, the City of Los Angeles, and Melekian are dismissed from this lawsuit for failure to serve and to prosecute. 4. The clerk should serve this Order on all counsel or parties of record. (es)
August 25, 2022 Filing 67 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #58 filed by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States of America. (Barragan, Matthew)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order re Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Stay and for Early Discovery by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: See Order for details. (es)
August 11, 2022 Filing 65 MOTION FOR STAY AND FOR EARLY DISCOVERY filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras. (et)
August 2, 2022 Filing 64 SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS OR TO PERMIT INSPECTION OF PREMISES IN A CIVIL ACTION issued as to Adriana Lopez. (es)
August 2, 2022 Filing 63 SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL CASE issued as to Emilio Deluna. (es)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO OPPOSE FEDERAL DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, re Stipulation for Order #61 . Note: Changes Made By The Court. IT IS ORDERED that the time for Plaintiff to Oppose Federal Defendants Motion to Dismiss FAC shall be extended to August 12, 2022. Any reply is due 14 days after the opposition is filed. The matter will then stand submitted for decision; the hearing date was previously vacated. (es)
July 20, 2022 Filing 60 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The hearings set for July 28, 2022 on docket entries 33 and 41 are ordered off calendar and will be reset if necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bem) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 18, 2022 Filing 61 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Oppose Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint; Declaration of Pete Contreras; and [Proposed] Order filed by plaintiff Pete Contreras.(es)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendants United States of America and FBI's Motion to Dismiss and Taking Hearing Off Calendar by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: Plaintiff must file and serve any opposition no later than 21 days from the date of this order, and Defendants may file and serve a reply within 14 days of filing of the opposition. The matter will stand submitted for decision without oral argument on the due date for the reply unless the Magistrate Judge orders otherwise. The hearing noticed for August 11 is therefore ORDERED OFF CALENDAR. re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #58 . (es)
July 8, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Federal Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 8/11/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Barragan, Matthew)
July 8, 2022 Filing 57 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Federal Defendants Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in her official capacity), Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity), Christopher A. Wray(Directory of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in his official capacity), Christopher A. Wray(Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity), re Stipulation to Dismiss Party,,,, #56 served on 7/8/2022. (Barragan, Matthew)
July 7, 2022 Filing 56 STIPULATION to Dismiss Federal Defendants Christopher A. Wray(Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity), Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in her official capacity), Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity), Christopher A. Wray(Directory of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in his official capacity) filed by Federal Defendants Christopher A. Wray(Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity), Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in her official capacity), Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity), Christopher A. Wray(Directory of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in his official capacity). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #54 by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. IT IS ORDERED that the time for Federal Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint shall be extended to July 8, 2022. (es)
July 6, 2022 Filing 54 Fourth STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 7/8/2022 re Amended Complaint, #8 filed by Federal Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in her official capacity), Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity), United States of America, Christopher A. Wray(Directory of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in his official capacity), Christopher A. Wray(Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew)
June 28, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Objection to Dismiss the Complaint Due to Stipulation With Defendant's Council to amend 2nd Amended Complaint and File 3rd Amended Complaint, #50 was re-docketed as document No. #52 due to missing pages. (es)
June 27, 2022 Filing 52 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Objection to Dismiss the Complaint Due to Stipulation With Defendant's Council to Amend 2nd Amended Complaint and File 3rd Amended Complaint re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(es)
June 27, 2022 Filing 51 Plaintiff's DECLARATION In Support of Objection to Dismiss the Complaint Due to Stipulation With Defendant's Counsel to Amend 2nd Amended Complaint and File 3rd Amended complaint re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras. (es)
June 27, 2022 Filing 50 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED 06/28/22 DUE TO MISSING PAGES SEE DKT. #53 ] Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Objection to Dismiss the Complaint Due to Stipulation With Defendant's Council to amend 2nd Amended Complaint and File 3rd Amended Complaint re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras. (es) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2022: #1 Proposed Order) (es). Modified on 6/28/2022 (es).
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #48 by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. IT IS ORDERED that the time for Federal Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint shall be extended to July 6, 2022. (es)
June 22, 2022 Filing 48 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 7/6/2022 re Amended Complaint, #8 filed by Federal Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in her official capacity), Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity), United States of America, Christopher A. Wray(Directory of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in his official capacity), Christopher A. Wray(Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew)
June 15, 2022 Filing 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 , Complaint - (Referred), #1 IT IS RECOMMENDED that the District Judge accept this Report and Recommendation; grant Defendant Pulido's motion to dismiss and direct that judgment be entered dismissing the claims against him with prejudice; and dismiss Obasohan, Vega, the City of Los Angeles, and Melekian from this lawsuit for failure to serve and to prosecute unless Plaintiff shows good cause. (es)
June 15, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment.R&R) (es)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #32 by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. IT IS ORDERED that the time for Federal Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint shall be extended to June 22, 2022. (es)
June 13, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE OF LODGING (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras(shb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHOIRIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, [FRCP 15(a) #41 filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras. (shb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 42 DECLARATION OF PETE CONTRERAS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, [FRCP 15(a) #41 filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras. (shb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, [FRCP 15(a) filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras. Motion set for hearing on July 28, 2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (shb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 40 PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JENNIFER RASIAH'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PERMIT LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO REMOVE JENNIFER RASIAH AS A DEFENDANT filed by PLAINTIFF Pete Contreras (shb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 39 PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT JENNIFER RASIAH;S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PERMIT LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT TO REMOVE JENNIFER RASIAH AS A DEFENDANT filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras. (shb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE OF LODGING [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFANDANT JENNIFER RASIAH'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PERMIT LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO REMIVE JENNIFER RASIAH AS A DEFENDANT filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #37 (shb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 37 PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT JENNIFER RASIAH NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND PERMIT LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT TO REMOVE JENNIFER RASIAH AS A DEFENDANT filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras. (shb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 36 DECLARATION of PETE CONTRERAS in support of MOTION for Leave to file A Second Amended Complaint #33 filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras. (shb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, #33 filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras. (shb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file A Second Amended Complaint #33 (shb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file A Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Pete Contreras. Motion set for hearing on July 28, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (shb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 32 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Christopher A. Wray(Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity) answer now due 6/22/2022; Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in her official capacity) answer now due 6/22/2022; Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity) answer now due 6/22/2022; Christopher A. Wray(Directory of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in his official capacity) answer now due 6/22/2022; United States of America answer now due 6/22/2022; Federal Bureau of Investigation answer now due 6/22/2022, re Amended Complaint, #8 filed by Federal Defendants Christopher A. Wray(Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity); Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in her official capacity); Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity); Christopher A. Wray(Directory of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in his official capacity); United States of America; Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Barragan, Matthew)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant Jennifer Rasiah's Motion to Dismiss and Taking Hearing Off Calendar by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: Plaintiff must file and serve any opposition no later than 21 days from the date of this order, and Defendant may file and serve a reply within 14 days of filing of the opposition. The matter will stand submitted for decision without oral argument on the due dat e for the reply unless the Magistrate Judge orders otherwise. re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 . See Order for details. (es)
May 20, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
May 19, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Jennifer Rasiah. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendant Jennifer Rasiah's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of John W. Fagerholm, Esq., in Support of Defendant Jennifer Rasiah's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Jennifer Rasiah's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint) (Attorney John W Fagerholm added to party Jennifer Rasiah(pty:dft)) (Fagerholm, John)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #27 by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, IT IS ORDERED that the time for Federal Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint shall be extended to June 13, 2022. (es)
May 16, 2022 Filing 27 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Christopher A. Wray(Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity) answer now due 6/13/2022; Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in her official capacity) answer now due 6/13/2022; Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity) answer now due 6/13/2022; Christopher A. Wray(Directory of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in his official capacity) answer now due 6/13/2022; United States of America answer now due 6/13/2022; Federal Bureau of Investigation answer now due 6/13/2022, re Amended Complaint, #8 filed by Federal Defendants Christopher A. Wray(Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity); Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in her official capacity); Kristi Koons Johnson(Assistant Director of the Los Angeles Office of Federal Bureau of Investigation, individual capacity); Christopher A. Wray(Directory of the Federal Bureau of Investigation in his official capacity); United States of America; Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party Kristi Koons Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party Kristi Koons Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party United States of America(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party Christopher A. Wray(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party Christopher A. Wray(pty:dft))(Barragan, Matthew)
May 10, 2022 Filing 26 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 filed by Defendant Joe Pulido. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fedalen, Michael)
April 26, 2022 Filing 22 PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT JOSE PULIDO'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PERMIT LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT TO REMOVE JOE PULIDO AS A DEFENDANT #17 filed by Plaintiff Peter Contreras. (es)
April 26, 2022 Filing 21 PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JOE PULIDO'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PERMIT LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO REMOVE JOE PULIDO AS A DEFENDANT in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 filed by Plaintiff Peter Contreras. (es)
April 26, 2022 Filing 20 PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT JOE PULIDO'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PERMIT LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT TO REMOVE JOE PULIDO AS A DEFENDANT #17 filed by Plaintiff Peter Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(es)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant Joe Pulido's Motion to Dismiss and Taking Hearing Off Calendar by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: On April 7, 2022, Defendant Joe Pulido moved to dismiss the Complaint, setting the motion for hearing before Judge Selna on May 16. Plaintiff must file and serve any opposition no later than 21 days from the date of this order, and Defendant may file and serve a reply within 14 days of filing of the opposition. The matter will stand submitted for decision without oral argument on the due date for the reply unless the Magistrate Judge orders otherwise. After briefing she will issue a Report and Recommendation to Judge Selna, who will ultimately decide the motion based on the briefing and the report. The hearing noticed for May 16 is therefore ORDERED OFF CALENDAR. re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 . (es)
April 8, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): The Motion is noticed before the District Judge when it should be noticed before the Magistrate Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
April 7, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Joe Pulido. Motion set for hearing on 5/16/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Fedalen, Michael)
April 7, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Joe Pulido, (Attorney Michael James Fedalen added to party Joe Pulido(pty:dft))(Fedalen, Michael)
April 4, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peter Contreras, upon Defendant City of Los Angeles c/o City Attorney served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kimberly Kennedy, who is designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of City of Los Angeles c/o City Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (es)
April 4, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peter Contreras, upon Defendant Kristi Koons Johnson served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. Service of the Summons and First Amended Complaint were executed upon John Doe, authorized to accept service on behalf of Kristi Koons Johnson in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (es)
April 4, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peter Contreras, upon Defendant Jennifer Rasiah served on 3/22/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christie Palani -Co-occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (es)
March 28, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND 1st Amended Complaint Executed by Plaintiff Peter Contreras, upon Defendant Kristi Koons Johnson served on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022; Christopher A. Wray served on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (et)
March 28, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND 1st AMENDED COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Peter Contreras, upon Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (et)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peter Contreras, upon Defendant Joe Pulido served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (et)
March 22, 2022 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peter Contreras, upon Defendant Bernard Melekian served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bernard Melekian in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (es)
March 16, 2022 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) DOES, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Kristi Koons Johnson, Bernard Melekian, Victor Obasohan, Joe Pulido, Jennifer Rasiah, Christopher A. Wray, Santiago Vega amending Complaint - (Referred), #1 , filed by plaintiff Peter Contreras(es)
March 16, 2022 Filing 7 21/60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant(s) Federal Bureau of Investigation, Kristi Koons Johnson, Bernard Melekian, Victor Obasohan, Joe Pulido, Jennifer Rasiah, Christopher A. Wray, Santiago Vega (es) Modified on 3/17/2022 (es).
March 16, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Local Rule 7.1-1)(es)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order re Service of Complaint by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: re: Complaint - (Referred), #1 . [See order for details.] (es)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 21/60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, Kristi Koons Johnson, Bernard Melekian, Victor Obasohan, Joe Pulido, Jennifer Rasiah, Christopher A. Wray. (jtil)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Peter Contreras. (jtil)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Peter Contreras against Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, Kristi Koons Johnson, Bernard Melekian, Victor Obasohan, Joe Pulido, Jennifer Rasiah and Christopher A. Wray Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth.(Filing fee $402 Paid) (Attachments: #1 CV71) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pete Contreras v. Christopher A. Wray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Koons Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Melekian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Obasohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Rasiah
Represented By: Michael Danton Richardson
Represented By: John W Fagerholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Pulido
Represented By: Michael James Fedalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santiago Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?